Utah District Court
Judge:Robert J Shelby
Case #: 1:24-cv-00161
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Other Contract
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2024
Terminated:Oct 03, 2024
Case in other court:First District Court of Box Elder County, 240100098
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 2:45 AM MDT
Defendant
Gibson By Radius
Represented By
Alan C. Bradshaw
Manning Curtis Bradshaw & Bednar PLLC
contact info
Carson Fuller
Manning Curtis Bradshaw & Bednar PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Apartnet High Speed Internet
Represented By
Brian Scott Allen
Skoubye Nielson & Johansen
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Thursday, October 10, 2024
11 11 misc Receipt Thu 10/10 4:10 PM
RECEIPT re:10 Notice of Transmittal remanding the case to First District Court of Box Elder County. (kpf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, October 03, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Transmittal Thu 10/03 9:15 AM
NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL that case has been transferred to First District Court of Box Elder County given state court case number 240100098. Remand packet consists of: Remand Order, Docket Sheet and Remand Letter sent via Mail. (mh)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Thu 10/03 9:03 AM
ORDER REMANDING CASE - The court directs the Clerk of Court to REMAND this case to the First District Court, Box Elder County, State of Utah. Case Closed. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/2/2024. (mh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
8 8 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Wed 10/02 11:47 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re7 Order to Show Cause filed by Gibson By Radius. (Fuller, Carson)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
7 7 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 09/26 10:42 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Defendant must show cause within fourteen (14) days why the court should not remand this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 9/26/2024. (mh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
6 6 misc Rule 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Atty) Wed 09/25 5:33 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Gibson By Radius identifying RADCO - Gibson by Radius, LP as Corporate Parent. (Bradshaw, Alan)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Dismiss Wed 09/25 5:28 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Gibson By Radius.(Bradshaw, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Iva Sherman
4 4 NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. For the benefit of the public and the bar, the District of Utah offers judicial settlement conference as an alternative for dispute resolution assistance in all civil cases and bankruptcy adversary proceedings. The court offers this alternative because, when compared with litigation, it can resolve a dispute faster, at less expense, and with solutions that are better able to meet the parties' needs and interests. Parties may file a stipulated motion for judicial settlement conference. A form[LINK:motion] is available on the court's website. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Apartnet High Speed Internet, Defendant Gibson By Radius. (kec)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Wed 09/25 4:12 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiff Apartnet High Speed Internet, Defendant Gibson By Radius. (Notice generated by Clerk's office) Form due by 10/16/2024. (kec)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Removal (Atty) Wed 09/25 4:06 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 1st District Court Box Elder County, case number 240100098, (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5195089) filed by Gibson By Radius. (Fuller, Carson)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 misc Remark - New Case Wed 09/25 3:30 PM
Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Defendant Gibson By Radius is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and civil cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 405 by the end of the business day. NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (kec)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Availability of Judicial Settlement Conference Wed 09/25 4:13 PM
NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. For the benefit of the public and the bar, the District of Utah offers judicial settlement conference as an alternative for dispute resolution assistance in all civil cases and bankruptcy adversary proceedings. The court offers this alternative because, when compared with litigation, it can resolve a dispute faster, at less expense, and with solutions that are better able to meet the parties' needs and interests. Parties may file a stipulated motion for judicial settlement conference. A form[LINK:motion] is available on the court's website. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Apartnet High Speed Internet, Defendant Gibson By Radius. (kec)
Related: [-]