New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Louis A Scarcella
Case #: 8:24-bk-73697
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
28 W. 36 HERALD PROPERTIES, LLC
11 Sunrise Plz
Valley Stream, NY 11580-6170
Represented By
Charles Wertman
Law Offices Of Charles Wertman P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Thu 05/08 11:27 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance: Charles Wertman, Stan Yang, Michael Yellin. Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 07/10/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (DianeCorsini)
Related: [-] 5 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Monday, May 05, 2025
35 35 order Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim Mon 05/05 10:23 AM
Order Granting Motion To Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim and Manner of Notice Thereof. Proofs of Claims due by 6/2/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 6/2/2025. Related [+] Signed on 5/5/2025. (dhc)
Related: [-] 33
Friday, April 25, 2025
34 34 61 pgs plan Disclosure Statement Fri 04/25 3:06 PM
Disclosure Statement Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 28 W 36th Street Sole Member LLC, 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC, 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties, LLC, 32 W. 39th Street Sole Member LLC Related [+]. (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
33 33 motion Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Wed 04/09 7:14 PM
Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 28 W 36th Street Sole Member LLC, 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC, 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties, LLC, 32 W. 39th Street Sole Member LLC. (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" A_Proposed Bar Date Order w_POC 410 Form
32 32 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 04/09 12:25 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 04/09 12:22 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 02/28/2025 Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Tue 04/08 11:58 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance: Charles Wertman, Michael Yellin, Stan Yang, David Goldwasser. Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 05/08/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (DianeCorsini)
Related: [-] 5 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) Tue 04/08 11:59 AM
Hearing Held; Appearance: Charles Wertman, Michael Yellin, Stan Yang, David Goldwasser. Proposed Order to be submitted for review Related [+] (DianeCorsini)
Related: [-] 19 Application to Employ filed by 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC
Monday, April 07, 2025
30 30 3 pgs motion Employ (Application) Mon 04/07 1:03 PM
Application to Employ Lar-Dan Affidavit Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC Related [+]. (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-] 20 Application to Employ filed by Debtor 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC,29 Application to Employ filed by Debtor 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC
Sunday, April 06, 2025
29 29 3 pgs motion Employ (Application) Sun 04/06 10:32 PM
Application to Employ "Lar-Dan" Affidavit Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC Related [+]. (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-] 19 Application to Employ filed by Debtor 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC,20 Application to Employ filed by Debtor 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC
Saturday, March 08, 2025
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Consolidation and Amend Caption Sun 03/09 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Consolidation and Amend Caption Notice Date 03/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
27 27 order Joint Administration Thu 03/06 9:51 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration on Lead Case: 24-73697 28 W. Herald Properties, LLC with Member Cases: 24-73698 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties, LLC; 32 W. 39th Street Sole Member, LLC; 24-74848 28 W. 36th Street Sole Member, LLC Related [+] Signed on 3/6/2025. (dhc)
Related: [-] 13
court Entry Thu 03/06 11:45 AM
An order has been entered in this case directing the joint administration, for procedural purposes only, of the chapter 11 cases of 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC, 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties, LLC, 32 W. 39th Street Sole Member, LLC, and 28 W. 36th Street Sole Member, LLC. The docket in chapter 11 case of 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC, Case No. 24-73697 (las), should be consulted for all matters affecting these jointly administered cases. (dhc)
Related: [-]
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Thu 03/06 11:54 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; - Appearance: Charles Wertman, Stan Yang, Michael Yellin, David Goldwasser, Ted Donovan. 'Hearing scheduled for 04/08/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY Related [+] (dhc)
Related: [-] 5 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Thu 03/06 11:54 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; - Appearance: Charles Wertman, Stan Yang, Michael Yellin, David Goldwasser, Ted Donovan. 'Hearing scheduled for 04/08/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY Related [+] (dhc)
Related: [-] 19 Application to Employ Filed by Debtor 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
26 26 misc Letter Wed 02/26 3:25 PM
Letter Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 02/26 2:50 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 01/31/2025 Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Letter Wed 02/26 10:53 AM
Letter Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned BK) Wed 02/26 4:31 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 03/06/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (DianeCorsini)
Related: [-] 5 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Document BK & AP) Wed 02/26 4:31 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/06/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (DianeCorsini)
Related: [-] 19 Application to Employ filed by 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC
Monday, February 24, 2025
23 23 misc Affidavit Mon 02/24 8:56 PM
Affidavit Re: Lar Dan Affidavit Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC Related [+] (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-] 19 Application to Employ filed by Debtor 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC,20 Application to Employ filed by Debtor 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC
Friday, February 14, 2025
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Withdrawn/Denied/Marked Off Without Hearing - Text (Case Owned BK & AP) Fri 02/14 1:22 PM
Withdrawn without hearing by letter Related [+] (DianeCorsini)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by LSC West 36th & 39th LLC
Thursday, February 13, 2025
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Thu 02/13 12:02 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance: Charles Wertman, David Goldwasser, Stan Yang, Michael Yellin. Status hearing to be held on 02/27/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. Related [+] (dhc)
Related: [-] 5 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) Thu 02/13 12:03 PM
Hearing Held; - Appearance: Charles Wertman, David Goldwasser, Stan Yang, Michael Yellin. Motion Granted, Submit Order Related [+] (dhc)
Related: [-] 13 Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Thu 02/13 12:03 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance: Charles Wertman, David Goldwasser, Stan Yang, Michael Yellin. Hearing scheduled for 02/27/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY Related [+] (dhc)
Related: [-] 19 Application to Employ Filed by Debtor 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
22 22 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Tue 01/28 3:22 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC Related [+] (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-] 19 Application to Employ filed by Debtor 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC
21 21 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Tue 01/28 3:22 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC Related [+] (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-] 13 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC
Monday, January 27, 2025
20 20 motion Employ (Application) Mon 01/27 10:42 AM
Application to Employ Amended Notice of Hearing Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 2/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-] 19 Application to Employ filed by Debtor 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC
Sunday, January 26, 2025
19 19 0 pgs motion Employ (Application) Sun 01/26 10:23 AM
Application to Employ Charles Wertman, Esq. as Attorney for Debtor Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs Application
Att: 2 Declaration
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 16, 2025
18 18 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Thu 01/16 12:28 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 12/31/2024 Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Thu 01/16 12:27 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 11/30/2024 Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Thu 01/16 12:25 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 10/31/2024 Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Thu 01/16 12:24 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 09/30/2024 Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Letter Thu 01/16 8:35 AM
Letter Withdrawing Motion Filed by Michael R Yellin on behalf of LSC West 36th & 39th LLC Related [+] (Yellin, Michael)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor LSC West 36th & 39th LLC
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Fri 01/17 12:01 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance: Stan Yang, Charles Wertman, Michael Yellin, David Goldwasser. Status hearing to be held on 02/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. Related [+](DianeCorsini)
Related: [-] 5 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
13 13 motion Joint Administration Wed 01/15 3:32 PM
Motion for Joint Administration of Case 24-73697 with Case(s) 24-73698 24-74854 24-74848 Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, January 06, 2025
12 12 misc Declaration Mon 01/06 6:25 PM
Declaration Filed by Michael R Yellin on behalf of LSC West 36th & 39th LLC Related [+] (Yellin, Michael)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor LSC West 36th & 39th LLC,11 Declaration filed by Creditor LSC West 36th & 39th LLC
Att: 1 Exhibit Dickenson A (1 of 2) - Loan Agreement
Att: 2 Exhibit Dickenson A (2 of 2) - Loan Agreement
Att: 3 Exhibit Dickenson B - Promissory Not
Att: 4 Exhibit Dickenson C - Mortgage (CEMA)
Att: 5 Exhibit Dickenson D - Assignment of Leases and Rents
Att: 6 Exhibit Dickenson E - W. 36 & W. 39 - Pledge Agreement
Att: 7 Exhibit Dickenson F - W. 36 & W. 39 - Pledge Agreement
Att: 8 Exhibit Dickenson G - 2022 Allonge
Att: 9 Exhibit Dickenson H - W. 36 & W. 39 - Loan Modification Agreement
Att: 10 Exhibit Dickenson I - August 2 2023 Letter
Att: 11 Exhibit Dickenson J - Dec 11 2023 Letter
Att: 12 Exhibit Dickenson K - Feb 23 Email
Att: 13 Exhibit Dickenson L - 2023 Allonge
11 11 misc Declaration Mon 01/06 6:07 PM
Declaration Filed by Michael R Yellin on behalf of LSC West 36th & 39th LLC Related [+] (Yellin, Michael)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor LSC West 36th & 39th LLC
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notice of UCC Sale.
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Adjournment
Att: 3 Exhibit C - 39th St. Petition
Att: 4 Exhibit D - 36th St. Petition
10 10 motion Dismiss Case Mon 01/06 6:03 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case /LSC West 36th & 39th St LLCs Motion for Entry of an Order: (I) Dismissing 28 W. Herald Properties, LLCs and 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties, LLCs Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1112(B) or, Alternatively, (II) Granting Lender Relief from the Automatic Stay Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 362(d) Filed by Michael R Yellin on behalf of LSC West 36th & 39th LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/27/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 963 (LAS), MM Conf Hrgs-Mtns to Dismiss. (Yellin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order for Motion to Dismiss
Friday, December 27, 2024
court Case Related to a Chapter 11 Fri 12/27 12:06 PM
The above case is related to Case Number(s) 24-73697 las, 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC (rom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
9 9 misc Statement Wed 12/18 12:52 PM
Statement Corporate Resolution Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Action by Written Consent
Thursday, November 21, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Fri 11/22 8:20 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance: Charles Wertman, David Goldwasser, Stan Yang, Michael Yellin. Status hearing to be held on 01/16/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. Related [+] (dhc)
Related: [-] 5 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Monday, November 04, 2024
trustee Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Mon 11/04 1:24 PM
Trustee's Notice of Continued Meeting of Creditors Filed by United States Trustee. 341(a) Meeting Adjourned to 11/7/2024 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic Meeting: Phone 1 (877) 929-0538, Participant Code 4551117, Enter # sign. (Yang, Stan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Thu 10/10 10:41 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance: Stan Yang, Charles Wertman, Michael Yellin. Status hearing to be held on 11/21/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. Related [+](DianeCorsini)
Related: [-] 5 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Sunday, September 29, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Mon 09/30 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 09/29/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 28, 2024
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Sun 09/29 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 09/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Sun 09/29 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 09/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
5 5 order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference (Ch 11) All Judges Thu 09/26 4:20 PM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference. Status hearing to be held on 10/10/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. Signed on 9/26/2024 (dhc)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 09/26 3:52 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Michael R Yellin on behalf of LSC West 36th & 39th LLC (Yellin, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 trustee Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 - US Trustee Thu 09/26 9:19 AM
Meeting of Creditors Filed by United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/28/2024 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic Meeting: Phone 1 (877) 929-0538, Participant Code 4551117, Enter # sign. (Yang, Stan)
Related: [-]
court Case Related to a Chapter 11 Thu 09/26 7:47 AM
The above case is related to Case Number(s) 24-72586 las The Gateway at Wynwood LLC, 24-73698 las 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties (drk)
Related: [-]
utility Judge Reassignment Utility Thu 09/26 7:47 AM
Judge Alan S. Trust removed from the case due to Related Case, Judge Reassigned. Judge Louis A. Scarcella added to the case. (drk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
3 3 court Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Thu 09/26 11:29 AM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 9/25/2024.Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 9/25/2024. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 9/25/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 9/25/2024. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 9/25/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 10/9/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 10/9/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 10/9/2024. (drk)
Related: [-]
1 1 40 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 09/25 10:35 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 28 W. 36 HERALD PROPERTIES, LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 01/23/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 01/23/2025. (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Wed 09/25 10:48 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:8 24-73697 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A22980965. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1