Delaware District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Hall
Case #: 1:24-cv-01070
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 24, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 5:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Aerin Medical Inc.
Represented By
J. Michael Jakes
contact info
Sonja W. Sahlsten
contact info
Daniel M. Silver
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Alexandra M. Joyce
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Maliheh Zare
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Kathleen A. Daley
contact info
Christopher C. Howes
contact info
Plaintiff
Neurent Medical Ltd.
Represented By
Cameron Paul Clark
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Brian P. Egan
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
42 42 misc - Transcript Wed 04/02 12:06 PM
Official Transcript of Oral Argument held on 02/28/25 before Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Court Reporter Heather M. Triozzi,Email: Heather_Triozzi@ded.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/23/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2025. (Triozzi, Heather)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
41 41 order SO ORDERED Tue 03/18 8:29 AM
SO ORDERED, re (105 in 1:23-cv-00756-JLH, 40 in 1:24-cv-01070-JLH) Stipulation and Order to Consolidate C.A. No. 24-1070 JLH with Lead C.A. No. 23-756-JLH for all purposes. The stay in C.A. No. 23-756-JLH shall be lifted only with respect to the '262 Patent. (*See Order for complete details). Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 3/18/2025. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00756-JLH, 1:24-cv-01070-JLH(ceg)
Related: [-]
utility Create Case Association - dkt in member case for Consol or MDL Tue 03/18 8:33 AM
Case associated with lead case: Create association to 1:23-cv-00756-JLH. ALL FUTURE FILINGS SHALL BE MADE IN LEAD CASE NO. 1:23-cv-00756-JLH ONLY. (ceg)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
40 40 misc Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time) Fri 03/14 4:39 PM
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Consolidate by Neurent Medical Inc., Neurent Medical Ltd..(Clark, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, February 28, 2025
39 39 order Oral Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 02/28 3:44 PM
ORAL ORDER: Having heard argument on the pending Motion to Consolidate Cases and Stay (No. 23-756, D.I. 96; No. 24-1070 D.I. 25), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED-IN-PART. On or before March 14, 2025, the parties shall jointly prepare and file (1) a stipulation and proposed order of consolidation; and (2) a proposed interim schedule that follows the Court's guidance at the February 28, 2025 hearing. An in-person status conference is scheduled for August 8, 2025, at 11:00 a.m. On or before August 1, 2025, the parties shall meet and confer and file a proposed schedule governing further proceedings. Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 2/28/2025. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00756-JLH, 1:24-cv-01070-JLH(twk)
Related: [-]
minutes Oral Argument Fri 02/28 11:38 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jennifer L. Hall - Oral Argument held on 2/28/2025. (Court Reporter: H. Triozzi.) Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00756-JLH, 1:24-cv-01070-JLH(twk)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
38 38 order Oral Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 02/21 4:14 PM
ORAL ORDER: An in-person Oral Argument on the pending Motion to Consolidate Cases and Stay (96 in 1:23-cv-00756-JLH, 25 in 1:24-cv-01070-JLH) is scheduled for February 28, 2025, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 2/21/2025. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00756-JLH, 1:24-cv-01070-JLH(twk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
37 37 misc Request for Oral Argument Wed 01/15 3:43 PM
REQUEST for Oral Argument by Neurent Medical Inc., Neurent Medical Ltd. re (25 in 1:24-cv-01070-JLH, 96 in 1:23-cv-00756-JLH) MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Stay . (Egan, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
36 36 respm Brief - Reply Wed 01/08 4:32 PM
REPLY BRIEF re25 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Stay filed by Aerin Medical Inc..(Joyce, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits 1-6
Monday, December 30, 2024
35 35 misc Request for Oral Argument Mon 12/30 4:10 PM
REQUEST for Oral Argument by Neurent Medical Ltd. re19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Egan, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
34 34 respm Brief - Reply Mon 12/23 3:43 PM
REPLY BRIEF re19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Aerin Medical Inc.. (Joyce, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
33 33 misc Declaration Fri 12/20 5:09 PM
DECLARATION re (32 in 1:24-cv-01070-JLH) Answering Brief in Opposition, (99 in 1:23-cv-00756-JLH) Answering Brief in Opposition -- Declaration of Joshua L. Stern -- by Neurent Medical Inc., Neurent Medical Ltd..(Egan, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A-I
32 32 respm Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition Fri 12/20 5:06 PM
ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re25 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Stay filed by Neurent Medical Ltd..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/27/2024. (Egan, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
31 31 respm Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition Mon 12/09 5:03 PM
ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Neurent Medical Ltd..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/16/2024. (Egan, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
30 30 misc Letter Fri 12/06 1:13 PM
Letter to The Honorable Jennifer L. Hall from Brian P. Egan regarding response to issues raised by Aerin - re29 Letter.(Egan, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
29 29 misc Letter Wed 12/04 4:58 PM
Letter to The Honorable Jennifer L. Hall from Defendant Aerin Medical Inc. regarding response to Neurent's Request for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - re28 Letter. (Joyce, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Letter Wed 12/04 11:15 AM
Letter to The Honorable Jennifer L. Hall from Brian P. Egan regarding request for scheduling conference. (Egan, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply Mon 12/02 8:53 AM
SO ORDERED, re (27 in 1:24-cv-01070-JLH, 98 in 1:23-cv-00756-JLH) Stipulation and Order to Extend Briefing Schedule Deadlines. (*Rest Briefing Schedule re D.I. 96 in C.A. No. 24-756 and D.I. 25 in C.A. No. 24-1070 Answering Brief due 12/20/2024; Reply Brief due 1/8/2025). Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 12/2/2024. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00756-JLH, 1:24-cv-01070-JLH(ceg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
27 27 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Wed 11/27 3:30 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Neurent Medical Inc. and Neurent Medical Ltd. to File Their Answering Brief in Response to The Motion to Consolidate and Stay and for Aerin Medical Inc. to File a Reply Brief ISO its Motion to Consolidate and Stay to December 20, 2024 and January 8, 2025 - filed by Neurent Medical Inc., Neurent Medical Ltd.. (Clark, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
26 26 respm Brief - Opening Brief in Support Tue 11/26 4:52 PM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re25 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Stay filed by Aerin Medical Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/10/2024.(Silver, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits 1-2
25 25 motion Consolidate Cases Tue 11/26 4:47 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Stay - filed by Aerin Medical Inc..(Silver, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Rule 7.1.1 Certification
Friday, November 22, 2024
24 24 misc Redacted Document Fri 11/22 10:37 AM
REDACTED VERSION of21 Exhibit to a Document Exhibits C-E by Aerin Medical Inc.. (Joyce, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
23 23 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Wed 11/20 2:21 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME For the Parties to Respond to Motion to Dismiss to December 9, 2024 for Plaintiff and December 23, 2024 for Defendant - filed by Neurent Medical Ltd.. (Egan, Brian)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply Wed 11/20 3:28 PM
SO ORDERED, re23 Stipulation and Order to Extend Briefing Deadlines. (*Reset Briefing Schedule re19 Motion to Dismiss: Answering Brief due 12/9/2024; Reply Brief due 12/23/2024). Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 11/20/2024. (ceg)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
22 22 order SO ORDERED Mon 11/18 12:39 PM
SO ORDERED, re18 Stipulation and Order to File Exhibits to the Motion Under Seal. Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 11/18/2024. (ceg)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Mon 11/18 4:09 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kathleen A. Daley, J. Michael Jakes, Sonja W. Sahlsten, Christopher C. Howes for Aerin Medical Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (scs)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
21 21 misc Exhibit to a Document Fri 11/15 5:13 PM
[SEALED] EXHIBIT re20 Opening Brief in Support, by Aerin Medical Inc..(Joyce, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 SEALED Exhibits C-D,
Att: 2 SEALED Exhibit E,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
20 20 respm Brief - Opening Brief in Support Fri 11/15 5:09 PM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Aerin Medical Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/2/2024.(Joyce, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A-B,
Att: 2 Exhibits F-L
19 19 motion Dismiss/Fail to State Claim Fri 11/15 4:59 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Aerin Medical Inc..(Joyce, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
18 18 misc Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time) Fri 11/15 4:28 PM
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to File Under Seal by Aerin Medical Inc.. (Joyce, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
order SO ORDERED Wed 11/06 7:42 AM
SO ORDERED, re15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory H. Lantier, David L. Cavanaugh, Joshua L. Stern, Alexis Cohen, David P. Yin, and Bobby G. Hampton filed by Neurent Medical Ltd. Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 11/6/2024. (ceg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
17 17 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment Tue 11/05 2:28 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Bobby G. Hampton. ( re15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory H. Lantier, David L. Cavanaugh, Joshua L. Stern, Alexis Cohen, David P. Yin, and Bobby G. Hampton )( Payment of $ 50, receipt number ADEDC-4540894).(Egan, Brian)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 05 Attorneys Credit Card Payment Tue 11/05 2:26 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Gregory H. Lantier, David L. Cavanaugh, Joshua L. Stern, Alexis Cohen, and David P. Yin. ( re15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory H. Lantier, David L. Cavanaugh, Joshua L. Stern, Alexis Cohen, David P. Yin, and Bobby G. Hampton )( Payment of $ 250, receipt number ADEDC-4540893).(Egan, Brian)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/05 2:25 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory H. Lantier, David L. Cavanaugh, Joshua L. Stern, Alexis Cohen, David P. Yin, and Bobby G. Hampton - filed by Neurent Medical Ltd.. (Egan, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
14 14 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Tue 10/15 2:46 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Aerin Medical Inc.. (Joyce, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
13 13 order SO ORDERED Tue 10/15 12:14 PM
SO ORDERED, re11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Michael Jakes, Kathleen A. Daley, Sonja W. Sahlsten, and Christopher C. Howes filed by Aerin Medical Inc. Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 10/15/2024. (twk)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 04 Attorneys Credit Card Payment Tue 10/15 10:37 AM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for J. Michael Jakes, Kathleen S. Daley, Sonja W. Sahlsten, and Christopher C. Howes. ( re11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Michael Jakes, Kathleen A. Daley, Sonja W. Sahlsten, and Christopher C. Howes )( Payment of $ 200, receipt number ADEDC-4523063).(Joyce, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/15 10:34 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Michael Jakes, Kathleen A. Daley, Sonja W. Sahlsten, and Christopher C. Howes - filed by Aerin Medical Inc.. (Joyce, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
misc Deficiency Notice - No 7.1 Statement Filed Mon 10/07 9:25 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE issued by the Court to Defendant: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (b)(1), A party must: (1) file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Counsel is requested to supplement the docket with an appropriate Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (ceg)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 10/07 9:27 AM
SO ORDERED, re8 Stipulation and Order to Extend Time to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to November 15, 2024. (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Aerin Medical Inc. answer due 11/15/2024). Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 10/7/2024. (ceg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/02 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Maliheh Zare on behalf of Aerin Medical Inc. (Zare, Maliheh)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/02 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Joyce on behalf of Aerin Medical Inc. (Joyce, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 10/02 3:03 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Please include the initials of the Judge (JLH) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
8 8 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Mon 09/30 11:03 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to November 15, 2024 - filed by Aerin Medical Inc.. (Silver, Daniel)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/30 11:00 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Silver on behalf of Aerin Medical Inc. (Silver, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/25 11:10 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neurent Medical Ltd..Aerin Medical Inc. served on 9/25/2024, answer due 10/16/2024. (Egan, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 09/25 8:59 AM
Summons Issued as to Aerin Medical Inc. on 9/24/2024. (mpb)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Wed 09/25 8:56 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Neurent Medical Ltd.. (mpb)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Wed 09/25 8:53 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 12,096,973; 12,096,974; 12,098,889. (mpb)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Wed 09/25 8:51 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
Related: [-]
1 1 209 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 09/25 8:45 AM
COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Aerin Medical Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4506215.) - filed by Neurent Medical Ltd..(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-I,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet