Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Janet S Baer
Case #: 1:24-bk-14205
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Oct 21, 2024

Debtor
Cue-N-Cushion Billiard Sales Co.
622 W Lake St
Elmhurst, IL 60126
Represented By
Vaughn A White
Vw Law LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Thomas E Springer
Thomas E. Springer, Chapter 7 Trustee Springer Larsen, LLC 300 S. County Farm Road Suite G
Wheaton, IL 60187
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604


Docket last updated: 09/26/2024 12:11 AM CDT
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7a) Wed 09/25 3:08 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual Fee Amount $338, Filed by Vaughn A White on behalf of Cue-N-Cushion Billiard Sales Co. (White, Vaughn)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 09/25 3:12 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-14205 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A48451159. Fee Amount $ 338.00 (White, Vaughn) Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Asset Corporation) Wed 09/25 4:11 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/21/2024 at 12:30 PM via Zoom - Springer: Meeting ID 525 611 5382, Passcode 5951143851, Phone 1-872-282-7118. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]