Tennessee Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Nancy B King
Case #: 3:24-bk-03688
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Mar 19, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Warhorse SH West Retail, LLC
231 Public Sq Ste 300
Franklin, TN 37064-2552
Represented By
Denis Graham (Gray) Waldron
Dunham Hildebrand Payne Waldron, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE 701 BROADWAY STE 318
NASHVILLE, TN 37203


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
66 66 motion Disallow Claim(s) - BK Motion Tue 04/29 3:58 PM
Motion and Notice to Disallow Claim(s)# Filed by 906 Studio, PLLC in the amount of $$32,138.00 . If timely response hearing will be held on 6/24/2025 at 09:00 AM, Courtroom 3 (Virtual hearing if allowed; see website for details); 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. Responses due by 5/30/2025. Certificate of Service mailed on 4/29/2025. Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Warhorse SH West Retail, LLC. (Hildebrand, Henry)
Related: [-]