New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lorna G Schofield
Case #: 1:24-cv-07262
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1605 Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act of 1976
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 25, 2025 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
The Permanent Mission of Cote D'Ivoire to the United Nations in New York
Represented By
Michael S. Cryan
Arentfox Schiff LLP
contact info
Andre Acka Ossohou
contact info
Anna Mandel
Arent Fox LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GNOBO GNOPO
21 WOODLAND AVENUE
CHICOPEE, MA 01020
Represented By
Ryanne Guy Konan
Ryanne Konan Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
32 32 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Wed 04/09 10:43 AM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:27 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by The Permanent Mission of Cote D'Ivoire to the United Nations in New York..(Cryan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
31 31 17 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Thu 03/13 9:32 PM
FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:27 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by GNOBO GNOPO..(Konan, Ryanne)
Related: [-]
30 30 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 03/13 9:30 PM
DECLARATION of Ryanne Konan, Esq in Support re:27 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by GNOBO GNOPO..(Konan, Ryanne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Plaintiff,
Att: 2 Exhibit Termination of Plaintiff's Status,
Att: 3 Exhibit Document in Support of Contract Signed by Plaintiff
Thursday, March 06, 2025
29 29 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 03/06 4:12 PM
DECLARATION of His Excellency Ambassador Tiemoko Moriko in Support re:27 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by The Permanent Mission of Cote D'Ivoire to the United Nations in New York..(Cryan, Michael)
Related: [-]
28 28 16 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 03/06 4:03 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:27 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by The Permanent Mission of Cote D'Ivoire to the United Nations in New York..(Cryan, Michael)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Dismiss Thu 03/06 3:59 PM
MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by The Permanent Mission of Cote D'Ivoire to the United Nations in New York. Responses due by 4/3/2025.(Cryan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default Wed 02/19 2:36 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Ryanne Konan. RE-FILE Document No. 20 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): (1) the proposed clerk's certificate of default does not list the name(s) for the party(ies) who accepted service; (2) there is no order granting alternate service; (3) improper service effectuated. Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default found under the event list Proposed Orders - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct PDF that - lists the correct filed date of the complaint, lists the correct name(s) of the party(ies) who was/were served, lists the correct date the party(ies) was/were served, lists the correct filed date of the proof of service. (tp)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error Wed 02/19 2:36 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Ryanne Konan to RE-FILE Document 21 Declaration in Support. ERROR(S): the document is associated with a deficient docket entry. (tp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/12 4:37 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anna Mandel on behalf of The Permanent Mission of Cote D'Ivoire to the United Nations in New York..(Mandel, Anna)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/12 4:31 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael S. Cryan on behalf of The Permanent Mission of Cote D'Ivoire to the United Nations in New York..(Cryan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
24 24 order Stipulation and Order Mon 02/10 5:38 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEYS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and among the undersigned, that, effective January 31, 2025, the law firm of ArentFox Schiff LLP, 1301 Avenue of Americas, 42nd Floor, New York, NY 10019-6040, be and hereby is substituted as counsel of record for the Defendant, la Republique de Cote d'Ivoire, named incorrectly herein as "The Permanent Mission of the Cote Ivoire to the United Nations in New York," which is merely an emanation of the Republique de Cote d'Ivoire, a sovereign nation, in the above-captioned matter, in place of attorney Andre Acka Ossohou, Esq. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/10/2025) (jjc)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 02/10 5:30 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:19 Letter, filed by The Permanent Mission of Cote D'Ivoire to the United Nations in New York. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant shall file any motion to dismiss by March 6, 2025, accompanied by a memorandum of law not to exceed 8,750 words. Plaintiff shall respond by April 3, 2025, accompanied by a memorandum of law not to exceed 8,750 words. Defendant shall reply by April 24, 2025, accompanied by a memorandum of law not to exceed 3,500 words. Because the propriety of service is at issue, Plaintiff shall not move for default judgment until resolution of the motion. ( Motions due by 3/6/2025., Replies due by 4/24/2025., Responses due by 4/3/2025) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/10/2025) (jjc)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Conference Mon 02/10 2:22 AM
SECOND LETTER MOTION for Conference re:19 Letter, Opposition to Defendant's Request addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Ryanne Konan, Esq dated 02/10/2025. Document filed by GNOBO GNOPO..(Konan, Ryanne)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
21 21 respoth Declaration in Support (non-motion) Fri 02/07 12:20 PM
DECLARATION of Ryanne Konan, Esq. in Support re:5 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference,,12 Notice of Appearance,8 Clerk Certificate of Mailing,,,10 Status Report,13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Ryanne Konan, Esq dated 01/15/2025.,11 Memo Endorsement,,, Terminate Hearings,,9 Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference,7 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Ryanne Konan, Esq dated 10/29/2024.,1 Complaint,6 Summons Issued,14 Order on Motion for Extension of Time. Document filed by GNOBO GNOPO..(Konan, Ryanne)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default Fri 02/07 12:18 PM
PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by GNOBO GNOPO..(Konan, Ryanne) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Letter Fri 02/07 10:57 AM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Michael S. Cryan dated February 7, 2025 re: Gnobo Gnopo v. The Permanent Mission of the Cote DIvoire to the United Nations in New York. Document filed by The Permanent Mission of Cote D'Ivoire to the United Nations in New York..(Cryan, Michael)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Proposed Order for Substitution of Attorney Fri 02/07 10:49 AM
PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by The Permanent Mission of Cote D'Ivoire to the United Nations in New York..(Cryan, Michael)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error Fri 02/07 11:53 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Ryanne Konan to RE-FILE Document 16 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. ERROR(S): the document is associated with a deficient docket entry; deficient docket entry not corrected. (tp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
17 17 respoth Affirmation in Support (non-motion) Thu 02/06 3:56 PM
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - AFFIRMATION of Ryanne Konan, Esq in Support re:8 Clerk Certificate of Mailing,,,10 Status Report,9 Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference,1 Complaint. Document filed by GNOBO GNOPO..(Konan, Ryanne) Modified on 2/6/2025 (nd)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default Thu 02/06 3:54 PM
PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by GNOBO GNOPO..(Konan, Ryanne) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default Thu 02/06 12:33 AM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by GNOBO GNOPO..(Konan, Ryanne) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 2/6/2025 (nd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Affirmation in support of certificate of default
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default Thu 02/06 11:50 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Ryanne Konan. File the proof of service in the case using an applicable event found under the event list Service of Process. RE-FILE Document No. 15 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): (1) the proposed clerk's certificate of default lists the wrong filed date for the complaint; (2) the proof of service of the pleading listed wrong docket entry number; (3) leave signature date blank; (4) Supporting documents were not filed separately. Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default found under the event list Proposed Orders ; Re-file Declaration in support (non-motion) found under event list Other Answers. (nd)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error Thu 02/06 4:47 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Ryanne Konan to RE-FILE Document 17 Affirmation in Support,. Use the event type Declration in Support (non-motion) found under the event list Other Answers. (nd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 01/16 12:10 PM
ORDER granting13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. Plaintiff shall seek a certificate of default by March6, 2025. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/16/2025) (jjc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
13 13 motion Extension of Time Wed 01/15 11:23 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Ryanne Konan, Esq dated 01/15/2025. Document filed by GNOBO GNOPO..(Konan, Ryanne)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 11, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 01/11 10:20 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andre Acka Ossohou on behalf of The Permanent Mission of Cote D'Ivoire to the United Nations in New York..(Ossohou, Andre)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
11 11 order Memo Endorsement 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 01/10 3:56 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:10 Status Report filed by GNOBO GNOPO. ENDORSEMENT: The initial pretrial conference scheduled for January 15, 2025, is adjourned sine die. Plaintiff shall follow the default judgment procedures set forth in Local Rules 55.1 and 55.2. Plaintiff shall seek a certificate of default from the Clerk of Court by January 20, 2025, and shall move for default judgment within ten days of obtaining a certificate of default. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/10/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
10 10 misc Status Report Thu 01/09 12:05 AM
STATUS REPORT. Document filed by GNOBO GNOPO..(Konan, Ryanne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 10/30 6:48 PM
ORDER granting7 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference Application GRANTED. The parties shall file the materials described at Dkt. 5 by January 8, 2025. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for November 13, 2024, is adjourned to January 15, 2025, at 4:20pm. Initial Conference set for 1/15/2025 at 04:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/30/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Clerk Certificate of Mailing Wed 10/30 4:48 PM
CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons; Complaint; Plaintiff's Notice of Suit, pursuant to 22 CFR § 93.2; Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act Related [+]; Affidavit from the translator of the summons, complaint and Notice of Suit affirming her qualifications and that the translation is accurate; courtesy copy of the Republic of Cote d'Ivoire's official website, dated 9/24/24 for Cote d'Ivoire's Ministry for Foreign Affairs, African Integration and Ivorians Abroad mailed to Mr. Kacou Houaja Leon Adom Minister for Foreign Affairs, African Integration and Ivorians Abroad BLVD Angoulvant, Abidjan, CI BPV 109 ABIDJAN, Cote d'Ivoire on 10/30/2024 by Federal Express tracking # 7795 9678 7427, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. § 1608(a)(3). (ras)
Related: [-] quired by 22 C.F.R. § 93.2 (e)
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
7 7 motion Adjourn Conference Tue 10/29 5:20 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Ryanne Konan, Esq dated 10/29/2024. Document filed by GNOBO GNOPO..(Konan, Ryanne)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 09/30 3:40 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Permanent Mission of Cote D'Ivoire to the United Nations in New York..(jgo)
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Mon 09/30 2:42 PM
ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/13/2024 at 04:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. The telephonic conference is public, and the time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties shall ensure they are all dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time, as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/30/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 09/27 4:46 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Permanent Mission of Cte d'Ivoire to the United Nations in New York, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by GNOBO GNOPO..(Konan, Ryanne)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Fri 09/27 9:00 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ryanne Guy Konan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: THE PERMANENT MISSION OF COTE D'IVOIRE TO THE UNITED STATES. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party name entered incorrectly. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Fri 09/27 9:03 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ryanne Guy Konan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None); Dollar Demand Blank; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the Dollar Demand has been modified to 1,076,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 09/27 9:05 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 09/27 9:05 AM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 09/27 9:06 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 09/27 9:07 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Ryanne Guy Konan to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 09/26 8:53 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Konan, Ryanne)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 09/26 8:52 AM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE PERMANENT MISSION OF COTE D'IVOIRE TO THE UNITED NATIONS IN NEW YORK, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by GNOBO GNOPO..(Konan, Ryanne) Modified on 9/27/2024 (vf)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/26 8:47 AM
COMPLAINT against THE PERMANENT MISSION OF COTE D'IVOIRE TO THE UNITED STATES. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29948108)Document filed by GNOBO GNOPO..(Konan, Ryanne)
Related: [-]