Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-21939

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jerrold N Poslusny Jr
Case #: 1:24-ap-01573
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2024
Terminated:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Thrio, Inc., Defendant
5230 Las Virgenes Road Suite 210
Calabasas, CA 91302
Represented By
Thrio, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Maureen P. Steady, Trustee/Plaintiff
Chapter 7 Trustee 2 Kings Highway West Suite 102 Suite 102
Haddonfield, NJ 08033
Represented By
Jeffrey Kurtzman
Kurtzman Steady LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
utility Close Adversary Case Wed 12/18 7:56 AM
Adversary Case (1:24-ap-1573) Closed. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
6 6 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Wed 12/04 10:29 AM
ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT OF CLAIMS AGAINST THRIO, INC. Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/3/2024. (kvr)
Related: [-] 4
court Hearing Held Tue 12/03 2:47 PM
Minute of 12/3/2024 Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Granted; Order will be signed Related [+] (cm)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement under Rule 9019 Filed by Maureen P. Steady.Hearing scheduled for 12/3/2024 at 11:00 AM at JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Notice of Motion #3 Certification #4 Proposed Order #5 Certificate of Service) Filed by Plaintiff Maureen P. Steady
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
utility Terminate Deadline Wed 11/27 11:49 AM
Obj to Notice of Information Deadline Terminated, Reason: Certificate of No Objection filed in Main Case (def)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
5 5 misc Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy Fri 11/01 1:11 PM
Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy re: Settlement of Adv 24-1573 Hearing scheduled for 12/03/24 @ 11:00 am. Filed by Jeffrey Kurtzman on behalf of Maureen P. Steady. Objections due by 11/26/24. (Kurtzman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Approve Compromise or Settlement Under Rule 9019 Fri 11/01 1:10 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement under Rule 9019 Filed by Maureen P. Steady.Hearing scheduled for 12/3/2024 at 11:00 AM at JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Kurtzman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Notice of Motion
Att: 3 Certification
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
Friday, September 27, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Fri 09/27 11:32 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Jeffrey Kurtzman on behalf of Maureen P. Steady. (Kurtzman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-01573 Complaint by Maureen P. Steady against Thrio, Inc.. Fee Amount $ 350.. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) filed by Plaintiff Maureen P. Steady,2 Summons Issued to Maureen P. Steady for Service on Thrio, Inc. Answer due on 10/28/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 12/30/2024 at 02:00 PM at JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: # 1 Pre Trial Instructions) (lgr)
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 09/27 9:03 AM
Summons Issued to Maureen P. Steady for Service on Thrio, Inc. Answer due on 10/28/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 12/30/2024 at 02:00 PM at JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (lgr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions
Thursday, September 26, 2024
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 09/26 10:28 AM
Adversary case 24-01573 Complaint by Maureen P. Steady against Thrio, Inc.. Fee Amount $ 350.. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Kurtzman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit