California Central District Court
Judge:Terry J Hatter, Jr
Referred: Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 2:24-cv-08305
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fraud
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2024
Terminated:Mar 13, 2025
Case in other court:Los Angeles County Superior Court, 24STCV16417
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 25, 2025 1:23 AM PDT
Defendant
Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC
Represented By
Valerie Quirarte
Keesal, Young And Logan
contact info
Stacey M Garrett
Keesal Young And Logan Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
John Aponte
E50787 CTF C-DW-118-L P. O. Box 689
Soledad, CA 93960


Docket last updated: 77 minutes ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 04/25 1:56 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stacey M Garrett counsel for Defendant Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC. Valerie Quirarte is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC. (Garrett, Stacey)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
25 25 motion Stay Case (to Lift) Fri 04/25 8:55 AM
NOTICE AND REQUEST TO LIFT STAY PURSUANT TO C.C.C.P. §1281.4 BASED ON PLAINTIFF'S BEING GRANTED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IN RELATED CASE PROPERLY FILED IN STATE COURT APONTE v. FIDELITY, 24STCV16417 filed by Plaintiff John Aponte. (es)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV-60P) Fri 04/25 8:49 AM
REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff John Aponte. (es)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
23 23 order Dismiss For Order Thu 03/13 4:44 PM
ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: It is Ordered that the Orders to Show Cause be, and hereby are, Discharged. It is further Ordered that Fidelity's motion to compel arbitration be, and hereby is, Granted8 . It is further Ordered that Plaintiff's demand for a jury trial and demand for discovery [dkt. #22 ] be, and hereby are, Denied as moot. It is further Ordered that this case be, and hereby is, Stayed pending arbitration. It is further Ordered that this case be, and hereby is, administratively closed. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (es)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
22 22 12 pgs motion Order Wed 03/12 11:03 AM
PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL RETURN TO DEFENDANT'S (OSC) & REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY AND AFFIDAVIT OF: JOHN APONTE filed by Plaintiff John Aponte (es)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
21 21 misc Response Mon 02/24 4:41 PM
RESPONSE filed by Defendant Fidelity Brokerage Services LLCto Order,,,, Order to Show Cause,,,19 Regarding Waiver of Arbitration (Quirarte, Valerie)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Response Mon 02/24 4:40 PM
RESPONSE filed by Defendant Fidelity Brokerage Services LLCto Order,,,, Order to Show Cause,,,19 Regarding Subject Matter Jurisdiction(Quirarte, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Diane Brown,
Att: 2 Declaration of Valerie Quirarte
Friday, February 07, 2025
19 19 4 pgs order Order Order to Show Cause Fri 02/07 3:22 PM
ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: It is Ordered that Fidelity shall show cause, if it has any, as to why this case should not be remanded. Fidelitys written response to this Order to Show Cause shallbe filed and served by February 24, 2025. Plaintiff may file an opposition, if any, to Fidelitys response within 21 days of being served with Fidelitys response. Fidelity may file a reply, if any, to Plaintiffs opposition within 7 days after the opposition is filed. It is further Ordered that Fidelity shall show further cause, if it has any, as to why it did not waive its right to arbitration. Fidelitys written response to this Order to Show Cause shall be filed and served by February 24, 2025. Plaintiff may file an opposition, if any, to Fidelitys response within 21 days of being served with Fidelitys response. Fidelity may file a reply, if any, to Plaintiffs opposition within 7 days afterthe opposition is filed. (shb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
18 18 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 02/05 3:29 PM
ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL AND REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF15 by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. The Court hereby orders that Plaintiff's Request for Jury Trial and Reply to Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Reply Brief is stricken for failure to comply with the Local Rules as indicated: Request for Jury Trial is unsigned and non-permitted surreply. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
17 17 motion Strike Wed 02/05 11:58 AM
PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL and reply to defendant's MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF16 ,15 filed by Plaintiff John Aponte. (san)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
16 16 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 01/17 3:35 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: REQUEST for Order15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Document lacks required signature. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (san)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
15 15 5 pgs motion Order Fri 01/17 3:33 PM
PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL and reply to defendant's MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF filed by Plaintiff John Aponte. (san)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
14 14 misc Miscellaneous Document Wed 12/18 2:09 PM
DEFENDANT FIDELITY BROKERAGE SERVICES LLCS MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS UNAUTHORIZED OBJECTION TO REPLY BRIEF re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, or, in the alternative, Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings 8 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related),13 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related),11 , Reply (Motion related),12 (Quirarte, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
13 13 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Fri 12/06 2:24 PM
RETURN AN OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S REPLY BRIEF, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND OR SETTLEMENT ORDER AS OPPOSED TO ARBITRATION, PLAINTIFF RETURN INCLUDEDS DENIALS & ADMISSIONS IN ACCORD WITH F.R.C.P. Rule 88 filed by Plaintiff John Aponte. (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
12 12 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 11/04 5:18 PM
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, or, in the alternative, Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings 8 filed by Defendant Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC. (Garrett, Stacey)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
11 11 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Tue 10/29 10:12 AM
PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL REMAINS IN FULL EFFECT, AND HEREBY OBJECT TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR IMPOSE ARBITRATION BASED ON THE FACT THAT THE CORPORATION AND DEFENDANT NAMES CANNOT ENFORCE A PLAINTIFF OR CUSTOMER TO OPENLY PARTICIPATE IN CRIMINAL ACTIVITY re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, or, in the alternative, Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings 8 filed by Plaintiff John Aponte. (lmh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
10 10 misc Objection Mon 10/21 4:50 PM
OBJECTION TO REMOVAL OF STATE TORT ACTION BASED ON THEORY OF VENUE AND JURISDICTION, LIABILITY BOTH COMPENSATORY AND PUNITIVE STATE 'DORY CLEARLY OPENS AVENUE FOR UNLIMITED OR LIMITED filed by Plaintiff John Aponte. (shb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 09/27 10:06 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 09/27 10:06 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 09/27 10:05 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 09/26 3:02 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC identifying Fidelity Global Brokerage Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Quirarte, Valerie)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 09/26 3:00 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC. (Quirarte, Valerie)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 09/26 2:58 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 24STCV16417 Receipt No: ACACDC-38289750 - Fee: $405, filed by DEFENDANT Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC. (Attorney Valerie Quirarte added to party Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC(pty:dft))(Quirarte, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Valerie Quirarte ISO Defendant Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC Removal to Federal Court
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 09/27 10:17 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff John Aponte. Filed in State Court on 7/1/2024 Submitted with Exhibit A to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 09/27 10:24 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff John Aponte, upon Defendant Fidelity Brokerage Investments Firm served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Fidelity Brokerage Investments Firm David Miller Fidelity Investor in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Filed in State Court on 9/3/2024 Submitted Pg 89 to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]