Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steven D Grimberg
Case #: 1:24-cv-04317
Nature of Suit462 Immigration - Naturalization Application
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2024
Terminated:Feb 05, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 4:36 AM EDT
Defendant
Micah Brown
Represented By
Sharon Alice Lim
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Northern District Of Georgia
contact info
Neeli Ben-David
contact info
Defendant
Brian Driscoll
Represented By
Sharon Alice Lim
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Northern District Of Georgia
contact info
Neeli Ben-David
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer B. Higgins
Represented By
Sharon Alice Lim
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Northern District Of Georgia
contact info
Neeli Ben-David
contact info
Defendant
Benjamin Huffman
Represented By
Sharon Alice Lim
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Northern District Of Georgia
contact info
Neeli Ben-David
contact info
Defendant
James McHenry
Represented By
Sharon Alice Lim
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Northern District Of Georgia
contact info
Neeli Ben-David
contact info
Plaintiff
Etizaz Hassan Shah
Represented By
Sadia Subhani
Subhani & Subhani LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 02/05 10:12 AM
ORDER GRANTING7 Motion to Stay or Administratively Close this Case through 7/7/2025. The Clerk is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. The parties are ORDERED to file documents disposing of the case by 7/7/2025. Absent an extension or further order of the Court, if there is no request to reopen by that date, the case will be deemed dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 2/5/2025. (tas)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 02/05 10:14 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (tas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 02/04 10:31 AM
Submission of7 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings , to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Fri 01/24 1:25 AM
Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Neeli Ben-David replacing attorney Sharon Alice Lim. (Ben-David, Neeli)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
7 7 motion Stay Fri 01/17 10:56 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings with Brief In Support by Alejandro Mayorkas, Merrick Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Micah Brown, Christopher Wray.(Lim, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
6 6 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 12/03 11:59 AM
ORDER: The Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time for Defendants to file answer or otherwise respond to the complaint ECF5 is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. The new deadline is January 16, 2025. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 12/3/2024. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Mon 12/02 9:55 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Brief In Support by Alejandro Mayorkas, Merrick Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Micah Brown, Christopher Wray.(Lim, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, October 03, 2024
4 4 service Return of Service Executed as to USA Thu 10/03 4:02 PM
Return of Service Executed by Etizaz Hassan Shah. All Defendants.(Subhani, Sadia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service - FBI,
Att: 2 Proof of Service - DHS,
Att: 3 Proof of Service - Atty General
Thursday, September 26, 2024
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Thu 09/26 4:01 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/26/2024. (tas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued as to USA Thu 09/26 11:54 AM
Summons Issued as to Merrick Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Christopher Wray, U.S. Attorney(ajw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
1 1 cmp Complaint for Mandamus Relief Thu 09/26 11:44 AM
COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13744410) filed by Etizaz Hassan Shah.(ajw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Interview Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Biometrics Notice,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Interview Cancellation,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Exhaustion of Remedies,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Exhaustion of Remedies,
Att: 6 Exhibit D - Exhaustion of Remedies,
Att: 7 Exhibit D - Exhaustion of Remedies,
Att: 8 Exhibit D - Exhaustion of Remedies,
Att: 9 Exhibit D - Exhaustion of Remedies,
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet