Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Victoria M Calvert
Case #: 1:24-cv-04324
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 4:36 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Erin Stark
Represented By
Stacey Godfrey Evans
Stacey Evans Law
contact info
Ryan E. Harbin
Stacey Evans Law
contact info
Counter Claimant
The Stark Firm PLLC
Represented By
Stacey Godfrey Evans
Stacey Evans Law
contact info
Ryan E. Harbin
Stacey Evans Law
contact info
Counter Defendant
Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By
Peter J. Wright
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Meredith Laughlin Allen
Mcguire Woods LLP
contact info
Defendant
Erin Stark
Represented By
Stacey Godfrey Evans
Stacey Evans Law
contact info
Ryan E. Harbin
Stacey Evans Law
contact info
Defendant
The Stark Firm PLLC
Represented By
Stacey Godfrey Evans
Stacey Evans Law
contact info
Ryan E. Harbin
Stacey Evans Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By
Robert A. Muckenfuss
Mcguirewoods, Llp-Nc
contact info
Peter J. Wright
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Zwickert Timmermans
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Meredith Laughlin Allen
Mcguire Woods LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 40 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
40 40 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 05/13 5:16 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re35 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Rule 12 Motions filed by Erin Stark, The Stark Firm PLLC. (Harbin, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
39 39 discov Certificate of Service Fri 05/09 3:29 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Requests to Defendants by Bank of America, N.A..(Allen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
38 38 30+ pgs order Order Mon 05/05 4:18 PM
STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CASES PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE VICTORIA M. CALVERT. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 5/5/25. (vs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
37 37 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 04/30 5:17 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re35 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Rule 12 Motions filed by Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America, N.A..(Allen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Timmermans Declaration
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
36 36 discov Certificate of Service Tue 04/22 11:11 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Responses by Erin Stark, The Stark Firm PLLC.(Harbin, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Thu 04/17 10:17 AM
Submission of29 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , to District Judge Victoria M. Calvert. (vs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
35 35 motion Stay Wed 04/16 1:14 PM
MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Rule 12 Motions by Erin Stark, Erin Stark, The Stark Firm PLLC, The Stark Firm PLLC.(Harbin, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
34 34 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 04/09 3:42 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re29 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Erin Stark, The Stark Firm PLLC. (Harbin, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
33 33 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 03/26 4:41 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re29 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America, N.A.. (Allen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
32 32 discov Certificate of Service Fri 03/21 6:19 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Requests to Defendants by Bank of America, N.A..(Allen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
31 31 order Scheduling Order Fri 03/21 11:25 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:30 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 6/9/2025. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 3/21/2025. (jbu)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
30 30 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Thu 03/20 3:22 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America, N.A.. (Allen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
29 29 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Wed 03/12 5:00 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings with Brief In Support by Erin Stark, The Stark Firm PLLC. (Harbin, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Fri 02/28 9:26 AM
Submission of18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counterclaims MOTION to Strike, to District Judge Victoria M. Calvert. (vs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
28 28 respm Reply Brief Thu 02/27 4:28 PM
REPLY BRIEF re18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counterclaims MOTION to Strike (Updated Filing for Formatting) filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Allen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Reply Brief Thu 02/27 4:02 PM
REPLY BRIEF re18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counterclaims MOTION to Strike filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Allen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
26 26 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/20 3:50 PM
Amended Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Other Affiliate Bank of America Corporation, Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corporation for Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America, N.A.. (Allen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
25 25 discov Certificate of Service Tue 02/18 5:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Disclosures by Erin Stark, The Stark Firm PLLC.(Harbin, Ryan)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Certificate of Service Tue 02/18 2:33 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America, N.A. of Initial Disclosures (Allen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
23 23 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 02/13 10:59 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counterclaims MOTION to Strike filed by Erin Stark, The Stark Firm PLLC. (Harbin, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
22 22 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/11 12:00 PM
ORDER granting the21 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter J. Wright. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 2/11/2025. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jbu)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 02/11 12:01 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Peter J. Wright re22 Order on Application for Admission PHV,. (jbu)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Thu 02/06 2:21 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:21 APPLICATION for Admission of Peter J. Wright Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14041495). Attorney Peter J. Wright added appearing on behalf of Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America, N.A.. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (jas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
21 21 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/05 1:58 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Peter J. Wright Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14041495). with Brief In Support by Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America, N.A.. (Allen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Service by Publication Wed 02/05 9:50 AM
ORDER denying as moot4 Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 2/4/2025. (jbu)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
utility Docket Correction Fri 01/31 9:13 AM
Notification of Docket Correction re18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counterclaims MOTION to Strike. Multi-part motion filed as only one motion. Additional motion added to entry and docket text modified to accurately reflect filed document. (jbu)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
19 19 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 01/30 4:09 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate Bank of America Corporation, Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate BAC North America Holding Company for Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America, N.A.. (Allen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 01/30 4:05 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counterclaims, Motion to Strike with Brief In Support by Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America, N.A.. (Allen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
17 17 misc Leave of Absence Wed 01/29 1:48 PM
Application for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 02/28/2025, 03/01/2025, 03/02/2025, 03/03/2025, 03/04/2025, by Ryan E. Harbin.(Harbin, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, January 23, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Thu 01/23 2:09 PM
Submission of4 MOTION for Service by Publication as to Erin Stark , to District Judge Victoria M. Calvert. (vs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
16 16 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/15 11:44 AM
ORDER granting the13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth Zwickert Timmermans. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 1/15/2025. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jbu)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/15 11:42 AM
ORDER granting the12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert A. Muckenfuss. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 1/15/2025. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jbu)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Fri 01/10 9:53 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:13 APPLICATION for Admission of Elizabeth Zwickert Timmermans Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13977428). Attorney Elizabeth Zwickert Timmermans added appearing on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (jas)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Fri 01/10 9:54 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:12 APPLICATION for Admission of Robert A. Muckenfuss Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13977423). Attorney Robert A. Muckenfuss added appearing on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (jas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Thu 01/09 9:15 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT ( Discovery ends on 6/9/2025.), COUNTERCLAIM against Bank of America, N.A. by The Stark Firm PLLC, Erin Stark.(Harbin, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit
13 13 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/09 3:10 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Elizabeth Zwickert Timmermans Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13977428). with Brief In Support by Bank of America, N.A.. (Allen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/09 3:08 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Robert A. Muckenfuss Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13977423). with Brief In Support by Bank of America, N.A.. (Allen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/23 12:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey Godfrey Evans on behalf of Erin Stark, The Stark Firm PLLC (Evans, Stacey)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 12/23 9:30 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Erin Stark Answer due 1/9/2025; The Stark Firm PLLC Answer due 1/9/2025. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 12/23/2024. (jbu)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Fri 12/20 6:55 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Brief In Support by Erin Stark, The Stark Firm PLLC.(Harbin, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - 12.19 Email,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/20 6:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan E. Harbin on behalf of Erin Stark, The Stark Firm PLLC (Harbin, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Fri 12/13 4:15 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint on The Stark Firm, PLLC , as to Georgia Secretary of State. (Allen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Mon 12/09 6:24 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint , as to The Stark Law Firm PLLC. (Allen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Mon 12/09 6:22 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint , as to Erin Stark. (Allen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
4 4 motion Service by Publication Wed 11/27 3:52 PM
MOTION for Service by Publication as to Erin Stark with Brief In Support by Bank of America, N.A..(Allen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 09/26 7:56 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to The Stark Firm PLLC. (jbu)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 09/26 7:55 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Erin Stark. (jbu)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 09/26 7:54 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13745309)(jbu) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet