Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Patricia Tolliver Giles
Referred: Lindsey R Vaala
Case #: 1:24-cv-01682
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause28:1338 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 23, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 6:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Ericsson Inc.
Represented By
Christian Bennett Hecht
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Mark Masutani
Holland & Knight Llp (ma-Na)
contact info
Brent Ryan Gary
Holland & Knight
contact info
Jacob Baron
Holland & Knight Llp (ma-Na)
contact info
Defendant
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson
Plaintiff
Mark Sandstrom
201 N. Union St. #110
Alexandria, VA 22314


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, February 28, 2025
38 38 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 03/04 12:35 PM
REPLY to Opposition to Motion re35 MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Mark Sandstrom. (jlan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
37 37 respm Response to Motion Thu 02/27 1:43 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re35 MOTION filed by Ericsson Inc.. (Hecht, Christian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
36 36 misc Waiver of Fri 02/14 6:42 PM
NOTICE of Waiver of Oral Argument in re35 MOTION to Lift Stay, filed by Mark Sandstrom. (Dest)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Fri 02/14 6:41 PM
MOTION to Lift Stay, filed by Mark Sandstrom. (Dest)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
34 34 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 02/03 11:12 AM
ORDERED that Defendants Ericsson, Inc., Nokia of America Corporation, and AT&T Services Inc.'s motions to dismiss, or in the alternative, stay the civil actions (Dkt. 6, 1:24-cv- 1682; Dkt. 8. 1:24-cv-1687) are GRANTED in part; it is further ORDERED that Civil Action Nos. 1:24-cv-1681, 1:24-cv-1682, and 1:24-cv-1687 are STAYED, pending resolution of Civil Action No. 1:24-cv-1780; and it is further ORDERED that the motions are DENIED without prejudice in all other respects. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 2/3/2025. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 01/29 11:25 AM
Set Deadline as to32 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2025 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 801 before District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles. (triv)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
33 33 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 01/28 10:19 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: February 27, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. re32 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mark Sandstrom. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Summary Judgment Tue 01/28 10:16 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mark Sandstrom.(Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment A,
Att: 2 Appendix 1 of Attachment A,
Att: 3 Appendix 2 of Attachment A,
Att: 4 Appendix 3 of Attachment A,
Att: 5 Appendix 4 of Attachment A,
Att: 6 Attachment B,
Att: 7 Attachment C,
Att: 8 Exhibit 3,
Att: 9 Exhibit 4,
Att: 10 Exhibit 5
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
31 31 notice Notice (other) Wed 01/15 1:54 PM
NOTICE by Ericsson Inc. re29 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,30 Amended Complaint (Hecht, Christian)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
30 30 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 01/14 11:43 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (Additional Facts for Complaint for Declaratory Judgment) against Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, filed by Mark Sandstrom.(Dest)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1d,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Attachment-1
Friday, January 03, 2025
29 29 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Fri 01/03 2:33 PM
ORDER granting26 MOTION/REQUEST for Leave to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff is advised that his Amended Complaint (i.e., his Complaint as amended by the addition of Exhibit 1d) will become a complete substitute for his original Complaint, and he must therefore include the Complaint and all attachments and exhibits thereto in one filing; he cannot incorporate attachments or exhibits by reference. Plaintiff is therefore directed to refile his previous Complaint, together with Exhibit 1d, as an Amended Complaint on or before January 7, 2025. ORDERED that, within five (5) days after Plaintiff files the Amended Complaint on the docket, Defendant is directed to file a notice informing the Court whether Defendant seeks to file a supplement to the pending motion to dismiss to address the addition of Exhibit 1d. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 01/03/2025. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (wgar, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
28 28 respoth Reply Other Fri 12/27 8:02 PM
REPLY to Defendant's Opposition to Request for a Leave to Amend Complaint in re27 Opposition, filed by Mark Sandstrom. (Dest)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, December 20, 2024
27 27 respoth Opposition Fri 12/20 1:30 PM
Opposition to26 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Ericsson Inc.. (Hecht, Christian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
26 26 motion Amend/Correct Fri 12/06 6:37 PM
MOTION/REQUEST for Leave to Amend Complaint, filed by Mark Sandstrom. (Dest)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit D
Thursday, November 21, 2024
25 25 minutes Motion Hearing Thu 11/21 11:39 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles: Motion Hearing held on 11/21/2024. Appearances of Pro Se Plaintiff and Counsel for Defendant. RE:6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and, Alternatively, MOTION to Stay with Roseboro filed by Ericsson Inc. - MATTER ARGUED AND TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT - ORDER TO FOLLOW. Court Reporter: S. Wallace (pmil, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
24 24 respm Reply to Motion Wed 11/20 11:57 AM
Sur-reply for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and, Alternatively, Motion to Stay in re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and, Alternatively, MOTION to Stay with Roseboro, filed by Mark Sandstrom. (Dest)
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 11/20 11:49 AM
ORDERED that Plaintiff's Request for Leave to File a Sur[-]reply for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, and Alternatively, Motion to Stay (Dkt. 22) is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's proposed sur-reply (contained in Dkt. 22) is deemed filed (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 11/20/2024. (Dest)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
22 22 motion Leave to File Document Tue 11/19 1:09 PM
MOTION/REQUEST for Leave to File a Sur-Reply for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, and, Alternatively, Motion to Stay, filed by Mark Sandstrom. (Dest)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment- A (Proposed Sur-Reply to Defendant Motion to Dismiss),
Att: 2 Envelope
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 11/12 12:12 PM
ORDERED that Plaintiff's Request to Attend Hearings Remotely (Dkt. 20) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 11/12/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 11/04 2:49 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and, Alternatively, MOTION to Stay with Roseboro,. filed by Ericsson Inc..(Hecht, Christian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Decl. of B. Gary,
Att: 2 Ex. W Denial of R. 57 Motion
Friday, November 01, 2024
20 20 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Mon 11/04 4:04 PM
Request to Attend Hearings Remotely by Mark Sandstrom. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 10/30 3:12 PM
ORDERED that Motion (Dkt. 14) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have until November 4, 2024, to file its reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 6). Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 10/30/2024. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Wed 10/30 12:44 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Mark Masutani for Ericsson Inc. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 10/30/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Wed 10/30 12:43 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Jacob Baron for Ericsson Inc. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 10/30/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
15 15 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Tue 10/29 4:03 PM
Memorandum in Support re14 MOTION To Clarify Time to Submit Reply, or Alternatively to Extend Time to File Reply to November 4, 2024 re13 Response in Opposition to Motion,6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and, Alternatively, MOTION to Stay w filed by Ericsson Inc.. (Hecht, Christian)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Tue 10/29 4:02 PM
MOTION To Clarify Time to Submit Reply, or Alternatively to Extend Time to File Reply to November 4, 2024 re13 Response in Opposition to Motion,6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and, Alternatively, MOTION to Stay with Roseboro,. by Ericsson Inc.. (Hecht, Christian)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
13 13 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 10/28 3:36 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and, Alternatively, MOTION to Stay with Roseboro,. filed by Mark Sandstrom. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
12 12 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/22 1:43 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark Masutani and Certification of Local Counsel Brent R. Gary Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9806643. by Ericsson Inc.. (Hecht, Christian)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/22 1:40 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacob K. Baron and Certification of Local Counsel Brent R. Gary Filing fee $ 75, receipt number CVAEDC-9806613. by Ericsson Inc.. (Hecht, Christian)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Notice of Hearing Date Tue 10/22 12:08 PM
Notice of Hearing Date re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and, Alternatively, MOTION to Stay with Roseboro,. (Hecht, Christian)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 10/22 3:11 PM
Set Deadline as to6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and, Alternatively, MOTION to Stay with Roseboro. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 801 before District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles. (triv)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/21 3:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Ryan Gary on behalf of Ericsson Inc. (Gary, Brent)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Correction Mon 10/21 9:25 AM
Notice of Correction re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and, Alternatively, MOTION to Stay with Roseboro. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing or Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (swil)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/18 2:42 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ericsson Inc.. (Hecht, Christian)
Related: [-]
7 7 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Support Fri 10/18 2:40 PM
Memorandum in Support re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and, Alternatively, MOTION to Stay with Roseboro,. filed by Ericsson Inc..(Hecht, Christian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of B. Gary,
Att: 2 Ex. A (US Patent No. 10,567,474 B2),
Att: 3 Ex. B (US Patent No. 10,848,546 B2),
Att: 4 Ex. C (US Patent No. 7,333,511 B2),
Att: 5 Ex. D (US Patent No. 7,558,260 B2),
Att: 6 Ex. E (Assignment of Patent Appl. No. 10/382,729),
Att: 7 Ex. F (Assignment of Patent Appl. No. 10/230,698),
Att: 8 Ex. G (Employment Agreement),
Att: 9 Ex. H (Patent Assignment dated February 27, 2006),
Att: 10 Ex. I (Patent Assignment dated February 9, 2007),
Att: 11 Ex. J (Termination Letter),
Att: 12 Ex. K (Patent Assignment (Patent No. 7558260)),
Att: 13 Ex. L (Patent Assignment (Patent No. 7333511)),
Att: 14 Ex. M (Patent Assignment dated October 26, 2011),
Att: 15 Ex. N (Order from the Court of Queens Bench of Alberta, Canada),
Att: 16 Ex. O (Patent Purchase Agreement),
Att: 17 Ex. P (Patent Assignment dated June 22, 2012),
Att: 18 Ex. Q (Patent Assignment dated August 26, 2015),
Att: 19 Ex. R (Certificate of Merger),
Att: 20 Ex. S (Patent Assignment dated July 4, 2016),
Att: 21 Ex. T (Patent Assignment dated July 4, 2016),
Att: 22 Ex. U (First Amended Complaint Xenogenic),
Att: 23 Ex. V (Complaint)
6 6 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 10/18 2:11 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and, Alternatively, MOTION to Stay with Roseboro,. by Ericsson Inc.. (Hecht, Christian)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing Tue 10/01 1:01 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 09/30/2024. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/01 12:59 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Ericsson Inc. served on 9/27/2024, answer due 10/18/2024. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 09/30 2:09 PM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles and Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff, Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick no longer assigned to the case. (jlan)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
3 3 motion Pro Se E-Noticing Thu 09/26 4:02 PM
MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by Mark Sandstrom. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 09/26 3:53 PM
Summons Issued as to Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. Service via SPS.(dvanm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 09/26 3:46 PM
COMPLAINT against Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number 100008700.), filed by Mark Sandstrom.(dvanm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Receipt