Alabama Middle District Court
Judge:R Austin Huffaker, Jr
Referred: Stephen Michael Doyle
Case #: 2:24-cv-00605
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:754 Receiver of Property in Different Districts
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 25, 2025 3:17 AM CDT
Cross Defendant
First Horizon Bank
Represented By
Clarence A. Wilbon
Adams And Reese LLP
contact info
Thomas William Lawless
Lawless & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Danielle Elysees Douglas
Adams And Reese LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jaipal Gill
Represented By
William Calvin White, II
Boles Holmes White LLC
contact info
Jeffrey Edward Holmes
Boles Holmes Parkman White LLC
contact info
Defendant
Premier Holdings, LLC
2660 Eastchase Lane, Suite 300
Montgomery, AL 36117
Represented By
William Calvin White, II
Boles Holmes White LLC
contact info
Jeffrey Edward Holmes
Boles Holmes Parkman White LLC
contact info
Defendant
Joginder Sidhu
Represented By
William Calvin White, II
Boles Holmes White LLC
contact info
Jeffrey Edward Holmes
Boles Holmes Parkman White LLC
contact info
Defendant
John A. Howard
Represented By
Stephen E Whitehead
Lloyd Gray Whitehead & Monroe, PC
contact info
Bret L. Linley
Lloyd Gray Whitehead & Monroe
contact info
Brett Jared Chessin
Lloyd Gray Whitehead & Monroe PC
contact info
Defendant
Robert M Ritchey
40 Mountain Lane
Dadeville, AL 36853
Represented By
Shannon Lynn Holliday
Copeland Franco Screws & Gill, PA
contact info
James David Martin
Copeland Franco Screws & Gill PA
contact info
Robert David Segall
Copeland Franco Screws & Gill
contact info
Interested Party
F. Laetsch Gregory
Interested Party 1032 Via Mirabel
Palos Verdes Estates, CA 90274
Represented By
Anthony Brian Bush
The Bush Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Laetsch Properties, LLC
Interested Party 1032 Via Mirabel
Palos Verdes Estates, CA 90274
Represented By
Anthony Brian Bush
The Bush Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Bulldog Restaurants, LLC
Represented By
Gabriel J Quistorff
Balch & Bingham
contact info
Jeremy Lowery Retherford
Balch & Bingham
contact info
Interested Party
Merit Bank
Represented By
Tazewell Taylor Shepard, IV
Sparkman, Shepard & Shepard, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Attn: Glenn E. Glover One Federal Place 1819 5th Avenue North
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
Brooke L. Bean
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Jeffrey R. Dutson
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Glenn Edward Glover
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Renasant Bank
Represented By
Gabriel J Quistorff
Balch & Bingham
contact info
Robert Lee DeMoss, III
Balch & Bingham
contact info
Jeremy Lowery Retherford
Balch & Bingham
contact info
Plaintiff
First Horizon Bank
Represented By
Clarence A. Wilbon
Adams And Reese LLP
contact info
Thomas William Lawless
Lawless & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Danielle Elysees Douglas
Adams And Reese LLP
contact info
Receiver
Moore Company Realty
4 Office Park Circle Suite 217
Birmingham, AL 35223
Represented By
Stuart H Memory
The Law Offices Of Memory & Day
contact info
William Wesley Causby
Memory Memory & Causby, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 22, 2025
167 167 minutes Status Conference Thu 05/22 2:06 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr.: Status Conference held on 5/22/2025 (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Dee Coker, 334.799.1573, dee_coker@almd.uscourts.gov) (WW)
Related: [-]
166 166 order Order on Motion to Continue Thu 05/22 11:34 AM
TEXT ORDER: Pending before the Court is Receiver's Motion to Extend Deadline to File Second Report. (Doc. 164 .) For good cause, the Motion (doc. 164 ) is DENIED as moot. Entered by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. on 5/22/2025. (CWL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
165 165 misc Status Report Tue 05/20 8:36 PM
STATUS REPORT Second Receiver Report with Exhibits by Moore Company Realty. (Memory, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2025
164 164 motion Continue Mon 05/19 7:32 PM
MOTION to Continue Deadline to File Second Report by Moore Company Realty. (Causby, William)
Related: [-]
163 163 order ~Util - Set Hearings Order Mon 05/19 9:18 AM
TEXT ORDER: A telephonic status conference is SET for 5/22/2025 at 1:30 PM (CT); The Courtroom Deputy will contact counsel with the call-in information. Entered by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. on 5/19/2025. (LAB)
Related: [-]
162 162 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 05/19 9:01 AM
Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson no longer assigned to the case. (case reassigned back to original presider due to administrative error) (LAB)
Related: [-]
161 161 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 05/19 8:11 AM
Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
160 160 respoth Response to Order Fri 05/16 4:19 PM
Response to Order re157 Order,, Response to Court Order of May 16, 2025 filed by Jaipal Gill, Premier Holdings, LLC. (Holmes, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
159 159 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/16 11:46 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re145 MOTION TO EXPAND RECEIVERSHIP ESTATE re92 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by AuburnBank. (Parnell, Charles)
Related: [-]
158 158 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/16 11:45 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re145 MOTION TO EXPAND RECEIVERSHIP ESTATE re92 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by River Bank & Trust. (Parnell, Charles)
Related: [-]
157 157 2 pgs order Order Fri 05/16 11:31 AM
ORDER: Premier Holdings, LLC and Jaipal Gill are ORDERED to provide First Horizon Bank and the Receiver with real-time view only access of Premier Holdings' operations account at Truist Bank on or by May 29, 2025. The Parties shall contact Truist Bank to facilitate the view only access if necessary. If such access is not able to be set up before May 29, 2025, then the parties shall file a joint status update on or by May 29, 2025, informing the Court of the reason for the delay and the updated timeline. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. on 5/16/2025. (BES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
156 156 respm Response in Support of Motion Thu 05/15 10:13 PM
RESPONSE in Support re145 MOTION TO EXPAND RECEIVERSHIP ESTATE re92 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Supplement to Motion to Expand Receivership Estate filed by Moore Company Realty. (Memory, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 exhibit a