California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Lafferty
Case #: 4:24-bk-41498
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Nov 06, 2024
Terminated:Nov 08, 2024

Debtor
OptIn, Inc.
78 Salmon Rd
Alameda, CA 94502-7770
Represented By
Bernard D. Bollinger, Jr.
Buchalter Nemer
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Janina M. Hoskins
Janina M. Hoskins, Trustee P.O. Box 158
Middletown, CA 95461
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak
Office of the United States Trustee Phillip J. Burton Federal Building 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102


Docket last updated: 09/27/2024 12:02 AM PDT
Thursday, September 26, 2024
crditcrd none Thu 09/26 1:12 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-41498 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00). Receipt number A33437004, amount $ 338.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Thu 09/26 1:12 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $338. Filed by OptIn, Inc.. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 10/10/2024. (Bollinger, Bernard)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) Thu 09/26 4:30 PM
Meeting of Creditors and Appointment of Interim Trustee Janina Hoskins with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/6/2024 at 09:00 AM via Zoom Trustee - Hoskins: Meeting ID 806 340 2778, Passcode 5407806484, Phone 1-510-585-4470. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment)
Related: [-]