Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-06432
Case Filed:Sep 24, 2024
Last checked: Friday Sep 27, 2024 12:52 AM MST
Defendant
Fredy Jose Lopez (1)
Represented By
Angeles Ellis
Federal Public Defenders Office - Tucson
contact info
Material Witness
Material Witnesses
Represented By
Samuel Ali-Sondiata Washington
Law Office Of Samuel Washington
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph G Rieu
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/27/2024 2:48 AM MST
Sunday, September 15, 2024
Arrest of Fredy Jose Lopez on 9/15/2024. (CXE) [4:24-mj-06685-N/A-MAA]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Fredy Jose Lopez. (CXE) [4:24-mj-06685-N/A-MAA]
Related: [-]
2 2 AFFIDAVIT FOR DETENTION OF MATERIAL WITNESS by USA as to Fredy Jose Lopez signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins. (CXE) [4:24-mj-06685-N/A-MAA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins: Initial Appearance for Material Witness in case as to Fredy Jose Lopez held on 9/17/2024. Material Witness(es) are present and in custody. Samuel Washington appointed as counsel for the material witnesses with appointment type CJA. The Court orders the Material Witnesses temporarily detained in the custody of the United States Marshal pursuant to 18§3144. IT IS ORDERED the United States Attorney shall schedule a date and time for the video deposition of the material witness(es) within 30 days of appearance. (a juvenile material witness within 24 hours) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall preserve video deposition testimony pending resolution of this matter. Material Witness(es) present and state true name to be the following: Benito Morales-Nieblas, Antonio Alvarado-Rosales and Denia Maritza Lopez-Sarmiento. Appearances : AUSA Raquel Arellano, duty for the Government, CJA Attorney Samuel Washington for material witness(es). Material Witness(es) are present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Arturo Garcia, appears telephonically, and assists material witness(es). Related [+] Hearing held 1:22 PM to 1:31 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CXE) [4:24-mj-06685-N/A-MAA]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
4 4 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins: Initial Appearance as to Fredy Jose Lopez held on 9/17/2024. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. Government's motion for detention and request for continuance of the Detention Hearing is granted. Defendant(s) temporarily detained in the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Spanish Interpreter required. An attorney is appointed to represent the defendant. In the presence of government and defense counsel, the Court orally advises the government of their Brady obligation. Written order to follow. Appearances : AUSA Raquel Arellano (duty) for the Government, AFPD Jessica Murillo specially appearing for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Irene Lopez-Obrecht and Liliana Nido assists defendant. Detention Hearing set for 10/1/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera. Preliminary Hearing set for 10/1/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera. Related [+] Hearing held 2:44 pm to 3:37 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAM) [4:24-mj-06685-N/A-MAA]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
5 5 ORDER: Under federal law, including Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and all applicable decisions from the Supreme Court and the Ninth Circuit interpreting Brady , the government has a continuing obligation to produce all information or evidence known to the government relating to guilt or punishment that might reasonably be considered favorable to the defendant's case, even if the evidence is not admissible so long as it is reasonably likely to lead to admissible evidence. See United States v. Price , 566 F.3d 900,913 n.14 (9th Cir. 2009). Accordingly, the court orders the government to produce to the defendant in a timely manner all such information or evidence. Information or evidence may be favorable to a defendant's case if it either may help bolster the defendant's case or impeach a prosecutor's witness or other government evidence. If doubt exists, it should be resolved in favor of the defendant with full disclosure being made. If the government believes that a required disclosure would compromise witness safety, victim rights, national security, a sensitive law-enforcement technique, or any other substantial government interest, the government may apply to the Court for a modification of the requirements of this Disclosure Order, which may include in camera review and/or withholding or subjecting to a protective order all or part of the information. This Disclosure Order is entered under Rule 5(f) and does not relieve any party in this matter of any other discovery obligation. The consequences for violating either this Disclosure Order or the government's obligations under Brady include, but are not limited to, the following: contempt, sanction, referral to a disciplinary authority, adverse jury instruction, exclusion of evidence, and dismissal of charges. Nothing in this Disclosure Order enlarges or diminishes the government's obligation to disclose information and evidence to a defendant under Brady , as interpreted and applied under Supreme Court and Ninth Circuit precedent. As the Supreme Court noted, "the government violates the Constitution's Due Process Clause 'if it withholds evidence that is favorable to the defense and material to the defendant's guilt or punishment." ' Turner v. United States , 137 S. Ct. 1885, 1888 (2017), quoting Smith v. Cain , 565 U.S. 73, 75 (2012). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins.(JAM)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [4:24-mj-06685-N/A-MAA]
Related: [-]
7 7 MINUTE ORDER: Added appointed attorney Angeles Ellis, FPD for Fredy Jose Lopez. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO) [4:24-mj-06685-N/A-MAA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
8 8 INFORMATION - Felony as to Fredy Jose Lopez (1) count(s) 1, 2. (BAC)
Related: [-]
9 9 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Fredy Jose Lopez. (BAC)
Related: [-]