|
|
Arrest of Yuniesky De Armas Perez (ogn1) [1:24-mj-03800-EIS]
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT as to Yuniesky De Armas Perez (1). (aw) [1:24-mj-03800-EIS]
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez: Initial Appearance as to Yuniesky De Armas Perez held on 8/27/2024. Defendant sworn, and advised the Court he will hire Counsel. The Government seeks pretrial Detention based on risk of flight and danger to the community. Arraignment set for 9/10/2024 at 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Detention Hearing set for 8/29/2024 at 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 9/10/2024 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 8/29/2024 at 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Spanish Interpreter present. (Digital 14:22:24; 15:29:23) It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence- that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. The government has a duty to disclose any evidence that goes to negating the defendants guilt, the credibility of a witness, or that would reduce a potential sentence. The defendant is entitled to this information without a request. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez on 8/27/2024. (ogn1) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/29/2024) (fbn). [1:24-mj-03800-EIS]
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez: Status Conference as to Yuniesky De Armas Perez held on 8/29/2024. Defendnat not present; not transported from FDC. Matter reset for 8/29/24 @ 2pm. Spanish Interpreter present. (Digital 10:49:08) Signed by Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez on 8/29/2024. (ogn1) [1:24-mj-03800-EIS]
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez: Status Conference RE: Pretrial Detention as to Yuniesky De Armas Perez held on 8/29/2024. Report Re: Counsel Hearing as to Yuniesky De Armas Perez held on 8/29/2024, Defense Counsel filed a temporary Notice of Appearance in open court. Defense stipulated to Pretrial Detention with the right to revisit. Defense ore tenus motion to reset Preliminary Examination and Arraignment -GRANTED-. Preliminary Examination and Arraignment set for 9/23/2024 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Spanish Interpreter present. (Digital 15:40:05) Signed by Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez on 8/29/2024. (ogn1) [1:24-mj-03800-EIS]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
NOTICE OF TEMPORARY ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Raquel Natalia Leon appearing for Yuniesky De Armas Perez (ogn1) [1:24-mj-03800-EIS]
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT as to Lisdany Pereira (1). (fbn) [1:24-mj-03917-EIS]
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez: Initial Appearance as to Lisdany Pereira held on 9/11/2024. Bond set: Lisdany Pereira (1) STIP PTD w/right to revisit. Date of Location Custody (Arrest or Surrender): 9/10/2024. Arraignment set for 9/25/2024 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 9/25/2024 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 9/25/2024 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Attorney filed a temporary notice of appearance. Attorney added: David Stuart Seltzer for Lisdany Pereira (Digital 14:23:47; 14:38:56) It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence- that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. The government has a duty to disclose any evidence that goes to negating the defendants guilt, the credibility of a witness, or that would reduce a potential sentence. The defendant is entitled to this information without a request. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez on 9/11/2024. (aw) [1:24-mj-03917-EIS]
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
NOTICE OF TEMPORARY ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David Stuart Seltzer appearing for Lisdany Pereira (aw) [1:24-mj-03917-EIS]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
RENOTICE OF HEARING **TIME CHANGE ONLY** as to Yuniesky De Armas Perez. Preliminary Examination/Arraignment RESET for 9/23/2024 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. (mdc) [1:24-mj-03800-EIS]
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
RENOTICE OF HEARING **TIME CHANGE ONLY** as to Lisdany Pereira. Report Re: Counsel Hearing, Preliminary Examination, Arraignment RESET for 9/25/2024 at 01:30 PM in the Miami Division before the MIAMI Duty Magistrate Judge. (mdc) [1:24-mj-03917-EIS]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Arraignment, Preliminary Examination and Report RE Counsel by Yuniesky De Armas Perez. Responses due by 10/4/2024. (Leon, Raquel) [1:24-mj-03800-EIS]
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
PAPERLESS ORDER Granting7 the UNOPPOSED Motion to Continue Report Re: Counsel, Preliminary Examination and Arraignment as to Yuniesky De Armas Perez (1). Report Re: Counsel Hearing, Preliminary Examination and Arraignment RESET for 10/7/2024 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 9/20/2024. (mdc) [1:24-mj-03800-EIS]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Arraignment, APH, and Report re Counsel re 4 Notice of Hearing,2 Initial Appearance,,,,,, by Lisdany Pereira. Responses due by 10/7/2024. (Seltzer, David) [1:24-mj-03917-EIS]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
PAPERLESS ORDER Granting5 the UNOPPOSED Motion to Continue Report Re: Counsel, Preliminary Examination and Arraignment as to Lisdany Pereira (1). The Report Re: Counsel Hearing, Preliminary Examination and Arraignment are RESET for 10/9/2024 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before the MIAMI Duty Magistrate Judge. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 9/24/2024. (mdc) [1:24-mj-03917-EIS]
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
INDICTMENT as to Yuniesky De Armas Perez (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Dayan Lopez Chaple (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Lisdany Pereira (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Leandro Fonseca Rodriguez (4) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Ottonied Gonzalez Mendoza (5) count(s) 5 and Forfeiture. (ogn1) (ogn1).
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
(9/26/2024) Restricted Unredacted Indictment
|