New York Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00558
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2024
Last checked: Friday Sep 27, 2024 3:19 AM EDT
Defendant
Johnny Nunez (1)
Represented By
Justine Aleta Harris
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Dana R. McCann
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/27/2024 4:22 AM EDT
Thursday, July 18, 2024
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Johnny Nunez (1). Violation of 18 U.S.C. §§ 751(a) and4082(a) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger) (job) [1:24-mj-02634-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
Arrest of Johnny Nunez. (job) [1:24-mj-02634-UA]
Related: [-]
3 3 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Johnny Nunez. CJA, attorney, Justine Harris appointed counsel. Approved. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary Stein) (job) [1:24-mj-02634-UA]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary Stein: Initial Appearance as to Johnny Nunez held on 7/31/2024. Detention Hearing as to Johnny Nunez held on 7/31/2024. AUSA, Dana McCann present for the Government. Defendant present with attorney, Justine Harris. BAIL DISPOSITION: Detention on consent w/o prejudice. ***Preliminary Hearing Date: August 30, 2024 on defendant's consent. (Added attorney Justine Aleta Harris for Johnny Nunez.) (job) [1:24-mj-02634-UA]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
5 5 MEDICAL ORDER as to Johnny Nunez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary Stein on 8/2/2024)(job) [1:24-mj-02634-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
6 6 ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Johnny Nunez. Time excluded from 8/28/24 until 9/30/24. Follows oral order of 8/28/24. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 8/28/24)(vb) [1:24-mj-02634-UA]
Related: [-]
7 7 AFFIRMATION of Dana R. McCann in Support by USA as to Johnny Nunez re:6 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (vb) [1:24-mj-02634-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
Case Designated ECF as to Johnny Nunez. (jm)
Related: [-]
8 8 UNREDACTED INDICTMENT FILED as to Johnny Nunez. (jm) (Not for Public view pursuant to Standing Order of the court, 24-mc-184.)
Related: [-]
9 9 REDACTED INDICTMENT FILED as to Johnny Nunez (1) count(s) 1. (jm)
Related: [-]