Alabama Northern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00321
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2024
Last checked: Friday Sep 27, 2024 2:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Kenneth Irby Sloan (1)
Represented By
Jake Watson
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Kevin L Butler
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Katherine Pritchett Bounds
Federal Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
US Probation
United States Probation Office
contact info
Prim F. Escalona, US Attorney
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Allison Garnett
Doj-Usao
contact info
USM
United States Marshal
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/14/2025 1:15 AM CDT
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
1 1 6 pgs INDICTMENT as to dft Kenneth Irby Sloan (1) count(s) 1, 2-3, 4, 5, 6, 7. Please file all subsequent documents using the criminal case number assigned to this indictment. (CGL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (SEALED) Signed Indictment
2 2 MOTION to Seal Indictment filed by USA as to dft Kenneth Irby Sloan. (CGL)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal Indictment as to dft Kenneth Irby Sloan (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 8/28/2024. (CGL)
Related: [-]