Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-20375
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2024
Last checked: Friday Sep 27, 2024 3:59 AM EDT
Defendant
Giovanni Martinez (1)
Represented By
George Thomas Pallas
contact info
Erick Cruz
The Law Office Of Erick Cruz
contact info
Kenneth Lee Weisman
contact info
Defendant
Sebastian Martinez (2)
Represented By
Helmuth Solis
Helmuth Solis PA
contact info
Joshua David Rydell
The Law Office Of Joshua D. Rydell
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sandra Demirci
contact info
Monique Botero
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/27/2024 5:59 AM EDT
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
1 1 MOTION TO SEAL by USA as to Giovanni Martinez, Sebastian Martinez. (at)
Related: [-]
2 2 SEALED ORDER granting1 Motion TO SEAL as to Giovanni Martinez (1), Sebastian Martinez (2). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez on 8/28/2024). (See attached document for full details). (at)
Related: [-]
3 3 INDICTMENT as to Giovanni Martinez (1) count(s) 1, 5, 6, Sebastian Martinez (2) count(s) 1, 2-4, 6. FORFEITURE ALLEGATIONS. (at) (at).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (8/29/2024) Restricted Unredacted Indictment