Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Ed Kinkeade
Case #: 3:24-cv-02440
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:44 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2024
Terminated:Dec 11, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 26, 2025 5:10 AM CDT
Defendant
Cory T. Graves
Represented By
Richard A Illmer
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Cody Michael White
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Defendant
CWO Technical Solutions LLC
Represented By
Richard A Illmer
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Cody Michael White
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Restoration 1 Franchise Holding LLC
Represented By
Aaron-Michael Hanchett Sapp
Cheng Cohen LLC
contact info
Max DeLeon
Cheng Cohen LLC
contact info
J David Apple
J David Apple PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
28 28 order Judgment Wed 03/05 1:35 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/5/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
27 27 misc Stipulation Fri 02/28 2:07 PM
STIPULATION REVISED JOINT STIPULATION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF CONSENT PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Restoration 1 Franchise Holding LLC. (DeLeon, Max)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, December 26, 2024
26 26 misc Stipulation Thu 12/26 4:52 PM
Joint STIPULATION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF CONSENT PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Restoration 1 Franchise Holding LLC. (Sapp, Aaron-Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
25 25 order Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Wed 12/11 8:42 AM
ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE AND STAYING CASE Before the Court is the Parties' Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings ("Motion") for 30 Days (Doc. No. 24). The Motion is GRANTED. This case is hereby STAYED pending further Order of the Court. There appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the file as open for statistical purposes. The Clerk is therefore instructed to submit a JS-6 form to the Administrative Office, thereby removing this case from the statistical records. Nothing in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this case, and should further proceedings become necessary or desirable, any party or the Court may initiate such further proceedings in the same manner as if this Order had not been entered. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/11/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
24 24 motion Stay Tue 12/10 6:19 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings for 30 Days filed by Restoration 1 Franchise Holding LLC (Sapp, Aaron-Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
23 23 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply Wed 12/04 10:02 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting22 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants Responses due by 12/10/2024. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/4/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 12/03 5:06 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to19 MOTION for Injunction Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by CWO Technical Solutions LLC, Cory T. Graves (Illmer, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
21 21 respm Appendix in Support Tue 11/12 3:35 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Restoration 1 Franchise Holding LLC re19 MOTION for Injunction Motion for Preliminary Injunction ,20 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Sapp, Aaron-Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction
20 20 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Tue 11/12 3:32 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Restoration 1 Franchise Holding LLC re19 MOTION for Injunction Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Sapp, Aaron-Michael)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Injunction Tue 11/12 3:30 PM
MOTION for Injunction Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Restoration 1 Franchise Holding LLC (Sapp, Aaron-Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, November 08, 2024
18 18 6 pgs order Order for Scheduling Order Proposal Fri 11/08 10:55 AM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/8/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
17 17 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 11/07 6:15 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CWO Technical Solutions LLC, Cory T. Graves. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Illmer, Richard)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 11/07 5:53 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, filed by CWO Technical Solutions LLC, Cory T. Graves. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Richard A Illmer added to party CWO Technical Solutions LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Richard A Illmer added to party Cory T. Graves(pty:dft) (Illmer, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
15 15 service Summons Returned Wed 10/09 4:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to CWO Technical Solutions LLC ; served on 10/3/2024. (DeLeon, Max)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Wed 10/09 4:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Cory T. Graves ; served on 10/3/2024. (DeLeon, Max)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
13 13 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/02 4:44 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Max Deleon. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/2/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/02 4:44 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Aaron-Michael Sapp. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/2/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/02 4:17 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Max Deleon (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14963462) filed by Restoration 1 Franchise Holding LLC (Apple, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order on Admission Pro Hac Vice
10 10 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/02 4:14 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Aaron-Michael Sapp (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14963435) filed by Restoration 1 Franchise Holding LLC (Apple, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order on Admission Pro Hac Vice
Friday, September 27, 2024
9 9 6 pgs order Order Fri 09/27 11:26 AM
ORDER: This Order governs requests to file materials in this case under seal. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/27/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs misc Report to Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office Fri 09/27 10:50 AM
Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (ykp)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Fri 09/27 10:46 AM
Summons Issued as to CWO Technical Solutions LLC, Cory T. Graves. (ykp)
Related: [-]
6 6 qcref Kinkeade Fri 09/27 10:29 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge McKay). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Fri 09/27 8:54 AM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Restoration 1 Franchise Holding, LLC. (Apple, J) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/27/2024) (kcr)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Fri 09/27 8:52 AM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Restoration 1 Franchise Holding, LLC. (Apple, J) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/27/2024) (kcr)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 09/27 8:48 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Restoration 1 Franchise Holding, LLC. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Apple, J)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Fri 09/27 8:43 AM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to1 Complaint by Plaintiff Restoration 1 Franchise Holding, LLC. (Apple, J) (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened document on 9/27/2024) (ykp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/27 8:36 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Restoration 1 Franchise Holding, LLC. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14949985) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Apple, J)
Related: [-]