California Northern District Court
Judge:Maxine M Chesney
Case #: 4:24-cv-06787
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2024
Terminated:Dec 19, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 26, 2025 2:06 AM PDT
Defendant
Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Michael Bernard Bernacchi
Burke, Williams & Sorensen, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sahar Sadighpour
Represented By
Kristin Paige Kyle de Bautista
Roberts Disability Law, P.C.
contact info
Michelle Lee Roberts
Roberts Disability Law, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, September 27, 2024
6 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sahar Sadighpour.. (Roberts, Michelle)
Related: [-]
5 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/11/2024. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sahar Sadighpour (Roberts, Michelle)
Related: [-]
3 3 Proposed Summons. (Roberts, Michelle)
Related: [-]
2 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Sahar Sadighpour . (Kyle de Bautista, Kristin)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19891709.). Filed by Sahar Sadighpour. (Kyle de Bautista, Kristin)
Related: [-]