Connecticut District Court
Judge:Omar A Williams
Referred: Maria E Garcia
Case #: 3:24-cv-01561
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause7:6(b) Federal Commodity Exchange Regulation
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 26, 2025 5:06 AM EDT
Defendant
Global Financial Institution LLC
Represented By
Jullian H Jones, I
Law Office Of Jullian H. Jones, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Defendant
Michael Frederick Staryk
Defendant
Yvonne Stephanie Solerti-Coto
Represented By
Jullian H Jones, I
Law Office Of Jullian H. Jones, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By
Xavier Romeu-Matta
U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
contact info
Gates S. Hurand
U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
contact info
Nicole Buseman
U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 10, 2025
24 24 misc Affidavit Mon 03/10 5:31 PM
AFFIDAVIT re23 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Michael Frederick Staryk Signed By Xavier Romeu-Matta filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission.(Romeu-Matta, Xavier)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit Statement of Damages,
Att: 4 Exhibit Factual Resume,
Att: 5 Exhibit USA v. Staryk - Docket,
Att: 6 Exhibit CFTC v. Staryk, et al. - Docket
23 23 2 pgs motion Default Judgment Mon 03/10 5:23 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Michael Frederick Staryk by Commodity Futures Trading Commission.(Romeu-Matta, Xavier)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 26 pgs Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 22 pgs Text of Proposed Order
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/10 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Buseman on behalf of Commodity Futures Trading Commission (Buseman, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
21 21 order Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a) Fri 02/07 1:03 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Default Entry 55(a). Motion for default judgment due by 3/10/2025. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed or this action will be dismissed. Signed by Clerk on 2/7/25. (Velez, F)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
20 20 motion Default Entry 55(a) Thu 01/16 10:11 AM
MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Michael Frederick Staryk by Commodity Futures Trading Commission.(Romeu-Matta, Xavier)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Xavier Romeu-Matta
Thursday, December 19, 2024
19 19 order Order Thu 12/19 3:50 PM
ORDER Approving and Adopting 18 Rule 26(f) Report. The court thanks the parties for their Local Rule 26(f) Report and hereby APPROVES and ADOPTS all deadlines proposed therein. All discovery shall be completed on or before July 17, 2025, and all interim discovery deadlines hereby are incorporated by reference. All interim discovery deadlines may be amended by agreement of the parties without the court's approval provided those amendments do not delay the deadline for completion of all discovery. Any motions for summary judgment shall be filed on or before thirty-five (35) days after the close of discovery. The joint trial memorandum will be filed one month after the court's ruling on dispositive motions, if any. If no dispositive motions are filed, and the case is not settled, the joint trial memorandum will be filed four weeks before the trial date. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 12/19/2024. (Lussier, Nicolas)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/20 10:25 AM
Set Deadline: Discovery due by 7/17/2025. (Velez, F)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
18 18 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 12/16 3:02 PM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Romeu-Matta, Xavier)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 02, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 11/02 1:01 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jullian H Jones, I on behalf of Yvonne Stephanie Solerti-Coto(Jones, Jullian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement 7.1 statement
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Sat 11/02 12:49 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Yvonne Stephanie Solerti-Coto.(Jones, Jullian)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 11/04 9:23 AM
Set Deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/16/2024. (Velez, F)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/24 1:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. Global Financial Institution LLC served on 10/10/2024, answer due 10/31/2024. (Romeu-Matta, Xavier)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/24 1:16 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. Yvonne Stephanie Solerti-Coto served on 10/10/2024, answer due 10/31/2024. (Romeu-Matta, Xavier)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/10 7:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. Michael Frederick Staryk served on 10/3/2024, answer due 10/24/2024. (Romeu-Matta, Xavier)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
12 12 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 09/30 10:40 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Global Financial Institution LLC, Yvonne Stephanie Solerti-Coto, Michael Frederick Staryk* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Xavier Romeu-Matta* *U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission* *290 Broadway, 6th Floor* *New York, NY 10007*. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Electronic Service Documents Mon 09/30 10:39 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,9 Standing Order re: Letters,10 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,3 Notice of Appearance filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission,4 Notice of Appearance filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission,7 Electronic Filing Order,1 Complaint filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,5 Complaint filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission,8 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 09/30/2024. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 09/30 10:12 AM
COMPLAINT Civil Cover Sheet against All Defendants, filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission.(Romeu-Matta, Xavier)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
10 10 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Mon 09/30 10:37 AM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
9 9 intord Standing Order re: Letters Mon 09/30 10:37 AM
Standing Order re: Letters. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 09/27/2024. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Mon 09/30 10:36 AM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 09/27/2024. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Electronic Filing Order Mon 09/30 10:36 AM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 09/27/2024. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Mon 09/30 10:35 AM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/26/2024. Discovery due by 3/29/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 5/3/2025. Signed by Clerk on 09/27/2024. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/27 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Xavier Romeu-Matta on behalf of Commodity Futures Trading Commission (Romeu-Matta, Xavier)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/27 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gates S. Hurand on behalf of Commodity Futures Trading Commission (Hurand, Gates)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Fri 09/27 3:43 PM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 9/27/2024.(Maturo, F.)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/27 3:23 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Commodity Future Trading Commission.(Romeu-Matta, Xavier)
Related: [-]
service Request to Issue Summons Fri 09/27 3:28 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Global Financial Institution LLC. (Romeu-Matta, Xavier)
Related: [-]
service Request to Issue Summons Fri 09/27 3:29 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Yvonne Stephani Solerti-Coto. (Romeu-Matta, Xavier)
Related: [-]
service Request to Issue Summons Fri 09/27 3:30 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Michael Frederick Staryk. (Romeu-Matta, Xavier)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 09/27 4:17 PM
Judge Omar A. Williams and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Freberg, B)
Related: [-]