Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Roseann A Ketchmark
Case #: 5:24-cv-06119
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2024
Case in other court:Circuit Court of Buchanan County, Missouri, 24BU-CC01364
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 26, 2025 4:25 AM CDT
Defendant
Accudata Credit Systems, LLC
Represented By
Mark Joseph Galus
Franke, Schultz & Mullen - Kcmo
contact info
John G. Schultz
Franke, Schultz & Mullen - Kcmo
contact info
Plaintiff
Andre Herring-Dancy
Represented By
Jayson A. Watkins
Brown & Watkins, LLC
contact info
Charles Jason Brown
Brown & Watkins, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
20 20 adr Designation of Neutral - Mediation and Assessment Program Fri 04/25 2:22 PM
DESIGNATION OF NEUTRAL naming Angela D. Gupta(Galus, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
19 19 order Amended Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 04/04 2:00 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/16/2026. Dispositive Motions due by 2/9/2026. Status Conference set for 12/16/2025 10:30 AM via Telephone Conference. Initial Conference set for 7/2/2026 02:30 PM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2026 02:30 PM, and Jury Trial set for 8/3/2026 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. Signed on April 4, 2025 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
18 18 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 04/03 3:38 PM
Amended PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Andre Herring-Dancy. (Brown, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
notice Notice of Hearing Cancellation Tue 03/11 12:01 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION - The Status Conference set for 3/13/2025 10:30 AM is cancelled. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
17 17 order Order Mon 03/10 3:23 PM
Order: In light of communications from the parties, the Court cancels the status conference scheduled for March 13, 2025. The parties are directed to file a joint proposed amended scheduling order on or before April 3, 2025. Signed on 3/10/2025 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Gilmer, Alissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
16 16 discov Certificate of Service Wed 03/05 4:11 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Accudata Credit Systems, LLC of discovery responses filed by Mark Joseph Galus on behalf of Defendant Accudata Credit Systems, LLC.(Galus, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand Mon 01/27 3:45 PM
ORDER denying8 motion to remand. Signed on 1/27/2025 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. (Brown, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
14 14 discov Certificate of Service Tue 01/21 3:39 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andre Herring-Dancy of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant, First Request for Production of Documents and First Request for Admissions to Defendant filed by Charles Jason Brown on behalf of Plaintiff Andre Herring-Dancy.(Brown, Charles)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
13 13 adr Designation of Neutral - Mediation and Assessment Program Wed 01/15 3:36 PM
DESIGNATION OF NEUTRAL naming Frank Neuner(Brown, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
12 12 respm Reply Suggestions to Motion Fri 01/03 12:03 PM
REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re8 MOTION to remand filed by Charles Jason Brown on behalf of Plaintiff Andre Herring-Dancy. Related [+] (Brown, Charles)
Related: [-] 8
Friday, December 20, 2024
11 11 respm Suggestions in Opposition to Motion Fri 12/20 10:58 AM
SUGGESTIONS in opposition re8 MOTION to remand filed by Mark Joseph Galus on behalf of Defendant Accudata Credit Systems, LLC. Reply suggestions due by 1/3/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. Related [+] (Galus, Mark)
Related: [-] 8
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/20 10:55 AM
NOTICE of appearance by Mark Joseph Galus on behalf of Accudata Credit Systems, LLC (Attorney Mark Joseph Galus added to party Accudata Credit Systems, LLC(pty:dft))(Galus, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
9 9 respm Suggestions in Support of Motion Fri 12/13 4:40 PM
SUGGESTIONS in support re8 MOTION to remand filed by Charles Jason Brown on behalf of Plaintiff Andre Herring-Dancy. Related [+] (Brown, Charles)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 motion Remand Fri 12/13 4:39 PM
MOTION to remand filed by Charles Jason Brown on behalf of Andre Herring-Dancy. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/27/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Brown, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
7 7 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 12/02 12:12 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/13/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 5/13/2025. Status Conference set for 3/13/2025 10:30 AM via teleconference. Initial Conference set for 9/19/2025 11:30 AM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2025 02:30 PM, and Jury Trial set for 10/20/2025 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. Signed on December 2, 2024 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
6 6 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 11/26 10:24 AM
Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Andre Herring-Dancy. (Brown, Charles)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/23 1:55 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Accudata Credit Systems, LLC.(Schultz, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
notice Notice of Filing Fri 10/18 1:03 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
4 4 order Rule 16 Notice Tue 10/15 1:29 PM
RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 11/14/2024. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/28/2024. Signed on October 15, 2024 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
3 3 order Letter of reassignment Wed 10/09 12:47 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris to District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. Judge Morris no longer assigned to this case. Please note the new case number: 24-6119 CV-SJ-RK. (Melvin, Greg)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of MAPN Fri 09/27 12:35 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 09/27 10:09 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Buchanan County, case number 24BU-CC01364, filed by John G. Schultz. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9222953.(Schultz, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Petition
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment Fri 09/27 12:36 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to all parties: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click[LINK:here] for instructions. Form due by 10/18/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]