New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lorna G Schofield
Case #: 1:24-cv-07335
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2024
Terminated:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 26, 2025 5:23 AM EDT
Defendant
WarnerMedia Direct, LLC
Represented By
David Lawrence Yohai
Weil, Gotshal & Manges Llp (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Sky Deutschland Fernsehen GmbH & Co. KG
Represented By
Craig Jacob Bergman
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (nyc)
contact info
Paul Spagnoletti
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
contact info
Scott Sonny Balber
Herbert Smith Freehills New York LLP
contact info
Luca Marzorati
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sky Italia S.r.l.
Represented By
Craig Jacob Bergman
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (nyc)
contact info
Paul Spagnoletti
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
contact info
Scott Sonny Balber
Herbert Smith Freehills New York LLP
contact info
Luca Marzorati
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sky UK Ltd.
Represented By
Craig Jacob Bergman
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (nyc)
contact info
Paul Spagnoletti
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
contact info
Scott Sonny Balber
Herbert Smith Freehills New York LLP
contact info
Luca Marzorati
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
24 24 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 12/18 3:43 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), all parties to the above-captioned action hereby agree to the dismissal with prejudice of all claims in the action. Every party will bear its own fees and costs. This Stipulation may be executed in two or more counterparts, all of which shall be considered one and the same agreement, and shall become effective when such counterparts havebeen signed by all of the parties and delivered to the other parties.IT IS SO STIPULATED. So Ordered. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the case. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/18/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
23 23 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Tue 12/10 12:11 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Sky UK Ltd., Sky Italia S.r.l., Sky Deutschland Fernsehen GmbH & Co. KG..(Spagnoletti, Paul)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Tue 12/10 11:41 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Paul Spagnoletti. RE-FILE Document No. 22 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the voluntary dismissal. Re-file the document using Proposed Orders, Proposed Stipulation and Order. (km)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
22 22 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 12/09 11:35 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) WarnerMedia Direct, LLC and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Sky UK Ltd., Sky Deutschland Fernsehen GmbH & Co. KG, Sky Italia S.r.l.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Spagnoletti, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/08 4:20 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by WarnerMedia Direct, LLC..(Yohai, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
20 20 order Scheduling Order Thu 11/07 6:04 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. See 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 1/13/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 12/11/2024. Fact Discovery due by 3/10/2025. Expert Discovery due by 4/25/2025. Telephone Conference set for 5/14/2025 at 04:10 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. To join the conference, the parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and use Access Code 558-3333. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 2 weeks. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter the dates under paragraphs 5, 6, 8(a), 9(b)-(c) and 13(a)-(c) into the Court's calendar, and to schedule the conference under paragraph 13(c) as a Pre-Motion Conference, even though the conference will be held by telephone. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/7/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 11/07 5:51 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the November 13, 2024, initial pretrial conference is CANCELED. If the parties believe that a conference would nevertheless be useful, they should inform the Court immediately so the conference can be reinstated. The case management plan and scheduling order will issue in a separate order. The parties' attention is particularly directed to the provisions for periodic status letters, and the need for a pre-motion letter to avoid cancellation of the final conference and setting of a trial date. It is further ORDERED that if either party seeks to file a motion for summary judgment at the conclusion of discovery, they shall file a pre-motion letter pursuant to Individual Rules III.A.1 and III.C.6. The parties should be aware that the Court does not extend the deadlines for fact and expert discovery absent compelling circumstances. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/7/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
18 18 misc Letter Wed 11/06 4:59 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Paul Spagnoletti dated November 6, 2024 re: Proposed Civil Case Management Plan. Document filed by Sky UK Ltd., Sky Italia S.r.l., Sky Deutschland Fernsehen GmbH & Co. KG..(Spagnoletti, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Civil Case Management Plan
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
17 17 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/30 4:26 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Warner Bros. Discovery, Inc., Other Affiliate Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Other Affiliate WM Max, LLC, Other Affiliate WM Max Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate WM Interactive Media Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate WM Max Holdings II, LLC, Other Affiliate WarnerMedia Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Other Affiliate WM Columbus Holdings, Inc. for WarnerMedia Direct, LLC. Document filed by WarnerMedia Direct, LLC..(Yohai, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 10/17 10:05 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney David Lawrence Yohai to RE-FILE Document No. 14 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the jurisdiction of this action is based on diversity - the party/intervenor did not name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time - name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Please use the revised form found here NYSD form page (kw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 10/15 3:58 PM
ORDER granting15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time Application GRANTED. Defendant shall file any response to the Complaint by November 8, 2024. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Dkt. No. 15. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/15/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 10/15 3:59 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: WarnerMedia Direct, LLC answer due 11/8/2024. (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
15 15 motion Extension of Time Mon 10/14 5:18 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from David L. Yohai dated October 14, 2024. Document filed by WarnerMedia Direct, LLC..(Yohai, David)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 10/14 5:13 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Warner Bros. Discovery, Inc., Other Affiliate Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Other Affiliate WM Max, LLC, Other Affiliate WM Max Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate WM Interactive Media Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate WM Max Holdings II, LLC, Other Affiliate WarnerMedia Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Other Affiliate WM Columbus Holdings, Inc. for WarnerMedia Direct, LLC. Document filed by WarnerMedia Direct, LLC..(Yohai, David)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/14 5:01 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Lawrence Yohai on behalf of WarnerMedia Direct, LLC..(Yohai, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/04 12:26 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Sonny Balber on behalf of Sky Deutschland Fernsehen GmbH & Co. KG, Sky Italia S.r.l., Sky UK Ltd...(Balber, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
11 11 service Certificate of Service Other Thu 10/03 3:23 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of copy of Court Order setting initial conference and the Court's Individual Rules served on WarnerMedia Direct, LLC on October 3, 2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Sky Deutschland Fernsehen GmbH & Co. KG, Sky Italia S.r.l., Sky UK Ltd...(Bergman, Craig)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 10/02 9:38 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. WarnerMedia Direct, LLC served on 9/30/2024, answer due 10/21/2024. Service was accepted by Robin Hutt-Banks. Document filed by Sky UK Ltd. ; Sky Deutschland Fernsehen GmbH & Co. KG; Sky Italia S.r.l...(Spagnoletti, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
9 9 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 10/01 4:40 PM
ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/13/2024 at 04:10 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. The telephonic conference is public, and the time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties shall ensure they are all dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/1/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued Mon 09/30 11:21 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to WarnerMedia Direct, LLC..(gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 09/30 11:19 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 09/30 11:19 AM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 09/30 11:21 AM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/27 2:31 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Luca Marzorati on behalf of Sky Deutschland Fernsehen GmbH & Co. KG, Sky Italia S.r.l., Sky UK Ltd...(Marzorati, Luca)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/27 2:29 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig Jacob Bergman on behalf of Sky Deutschland Fernsehen GmbH & Co. KG, Sky Italia S.r.l., Sky UK Ltd...(Bergman, Craig)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/27 2:27 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Spagnoletti on behalf of Sky Deutschland Fernsehen GmbH & Co. KG, Sky Italia S.r.l., Sky UK Ltd...(Spagnoletti, Paul)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 09/27 2:25 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Comcast Corporation, Other Affiliate Sky German Holdings GmbH, Other Affiliate Sky International Operations Limited for Sky Deutschland Fernsehen GmbH & Co. KG; Corporate Parent Comcast Corporation for Sky Italia S.r.l., Sky UK Ltd.. Document filed by Sky Deutschland Fernsehen GmbH & Co. KG, Sky Italia S.r.l., Sky UK Ltd...(Spagnoletti, Paul)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 09/27 2:19 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to WarnerMedia Direct, LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Sky Deutschland Fernsehen GmbH & Co. KG, Sky Italia S.r.l., Sky UK Ltd...(Spagnoletti, Paul)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 09/27 2:17 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Spagnoletti, Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 36 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/27 2:16 PM
COMPLAINT against WarnerMedia Direct, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29958478)Document filed by Sky UK Ltd., Sky Deutschland Fernsehen GmbH & Co. KG, Sky Italia S.r.l...(Spagnoletti, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Co-Funding Agreement, dated September 20, 2019