Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Jon E Deguilio
Case #: 1:24-cv-00412
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 62 minutes ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
16 16 ss Social Security Reply Brief of Plaintiff Fri 04/11 3:13 PM
REPLY BRIEF by Andrew D. McCullough. (Farr, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
15 15 ss Social Security Response Brief of Government Fri 03/28 4:22 PM
RESPONSE BRIEF by Commissioner of Social Security. (Hwang, Taehee)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/28 4:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Taehee Hwang on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Hwang, Taehee)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 03/13 4:39 PM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS12 Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The Social Security Response Brief of the Government is due by 4/11/2025. Text entry by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 3/13/2025. (jss)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 03/13 4:25 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief of Commissioner by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Hinsley, Jay)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 02/13 9:52 AM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS10 Defendant's First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The Social Security Response Brief of the Government is due by 3/14/2025. Text entry by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 2/13/2025. (jss)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 02/13 7:40 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief of Commissioner by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Hinsley, Jay)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
9 9 ss Social Security Opening Brief of Plaintiff Fri 01/03 6:12 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY OPENING BRIEF by Andrew D. McCullough. (Farr, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/25 12:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Antonio Lee - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Lee - AUSA, Antonio)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
7 7 ss Social Security Administrative Record Fri 11/22 1:28 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Commissioner of Social Security. (Hinsley, Jay)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/22 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jay C Hinsley on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Hinsley, Jay)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Commencement of SSA Action Mon 09/30 11:37 AM
Notice of Commencement of Social Security Appeal action (1 Complaint) sent to the Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security Answer or Motion due 11/29/2024. Pursuant to General Order #2022-20, the briefing schedule is as follows: The plaintiff's opening brief must be filed within 42 days after the answer is filed or 42 days after entry of an order disposing of the last remaining motion under Rule 4(c) of the Supplemental Rules, whichever is later. The Commissioner's response brief must be filed 42 days after service of the opening brief. Any reply brief must be filed 14 days after service of the response brief. (jld)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 09/30 11:36 AM
***NEW CASE*** Judge Jon E DeGuilio added. (jld)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/27 5:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas T Lavella on behalf of Andrew D. McCullough (Lavella, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/27 5:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew F Richter on behalf of Andrew D. McCullough (Richter, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/27 5:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric A Farr on behalf of Andrew D. McCullough (Farr, Eric)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/27 5:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5698424.), filed by Andrew D. McCullough.(Farr, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet