Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Barry W Ashe
Referred: Karen Wells Roby
Case #: 2:24-cv-02360
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2024
Terminated:Mar 11, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 26, 2025 4:21 AM CDT
Defendant
Dorcheat Seafood, LLC
Represented By
Cary A Hilburn
Hilburn & Hilburn - Aplc.
contact info
Defendant
Minden Seafood, LLC
Represented By
Cary A Hilburn
Hilburn & Hilburn - Aplc.
contact info
Plaintiff
U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By
Peter Franklin Theis
U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
contact info
Elizabeth Owen
U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
contact info
Jacqueline Claire Barber
U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
contact info
Scott D. Wilson
Eeoc
contact info

GPO Mar 11 2025
ORDER AND REASONS granting 5 Motion to Transfer; Case transferred to Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 03/11/2025.(go)

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
11 11 misc Receipt Wed 03/12 8:31 AM
Receipt of Case Transfer to Western District of Louisiana (gla)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Case Transferred Out - District Tue 03/11 12:16 PM
ORDER AND REASONS granting5 Motion to Transfer; Case transferred to Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 03/11/2025.(go)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
9 9 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 03/03 3:31 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Dorcheat Seafood, LLC, Minden Seafood, LLC re5 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Improper Venue . (Hilburn, Cary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
8 8 respm Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Wed 02/26 8:38 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission re5 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Improper Venue .(Owen, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth J. Owen,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
7 7 minutes ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order Vacating Case Referral to Magistrate Judge Tue 02/04 10:33 AM
Order Vacating Case Referral to Magistrate Judge. FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to dismiss for improper venue (R. Doc. 5), which was set for submission on 02/26/2025, before the Magistrate Judge, is hereby reset for submission on 03/06/2025, before the undersigned. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 02/04/2025.(go)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order Mon 02/03 4:49 PM
NOTICE OF 636(c) NON CONSENT ORDER TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 2/3/2025.(pp)(NEF:Section M)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
5 5 motion Dismiss Case Thu 01/30 2:04 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case for Improper Venue by Minden Seafood, LLC, Dorcheat Seafood, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/26/2025.Attorney Cary A Hilburn added to party Minden Seafood, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Cary A Hilburn added to party Dorcheat Seafood, LLC(pty:dft).(Hilburn, Cary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jeremy Wesson,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - excerpt, USDC - Median Time Intervals from Filing to Disposition,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - excerpt, USDC - Civil Cases Commenced, by Nature of Suit and District,
Att: 5 Proposed Order,
Att: 6 Notice of Submission
Friday, November 15, 2024
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 11/15 3:23 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Dorcheat Seafood, LLC on 10/15/2024, answer due 12/16/2024; Minden Seafood, LLC on 10/15/2024, answer due 12/16/2024. (Owen, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 09/30 10:21 AM
Summons Issued as to Dorcheat Seafood, LLC, Minden Seafood, LLC.(go)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Friday, September 27, 2024
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Fri 09/27 4:26 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (car)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/27 4:05 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Dorcheat Seafood, LLC, Minden Seafood, LLC filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.Attorney Elizabeth Owen added to party U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission(pty:selreq).(Owen, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons