South Carolina District Court
Judge:Bruce Howe Hendricks
Case #: 9:24-cv-05358
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2024
Terminated:Nov 13, 2024
Case in other court:Beaufort County Court of Common Pleas, 2024CP0701438
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 26, 2025 5:56 AM EDT
Defendant
Armando Tellez
Represented By
Todd J Kaiser
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Ryan Windsor Van Buren
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Defendant
Transportation Insurance Advisors, LLC
Represented By
Todd J Kaiser
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Ryan Windsor Van Buren
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Howard B Mills
Represented By
Thomas Blase Iandoli
Twenge And Twombley
contact info
J Ashley Twombley
Twenge And Twombley
contact info
Plaintiff
Nash W Mills
Represented By
Thomas Blase Iandoli
Twenge And Twombley
contact info
J Ashley Twombley
Twenge And Twombley
contact info
Plaintiff
Phoebe Mills
Represented By
Thomas Blase Iandoli
Twenge And Twombley
contact info
J Ashley Twombley
Twenge And Twombley
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
10 10 1 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 11/12 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Howard B Mills, Nash W Mills, Phoebe Mills (Twombley, J)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 10/25 9:38 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 11/22/2024. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/25/2024.(rhei, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
8 8 3 pgs motion Extension of Time Thu 10/24 4:36 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Armando Tellez, Transportation Insurance Advisors, LLC. Response to Motion due by 11/7/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Van Buren, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Supporting Documents Declaration of Ryan Van Buren
Thursday, October 03, 2024
7 7 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/03 11:40 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Todd J. Kaiser for Transportation Insurance Advisors, LLC and Armando Tellez. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/03/2024.(rhei, )
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 10/03 9:25 AM
ORDER granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' time to file and serve their responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended through and including November 4, 2024. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/3/2024.(rhei, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
5 5 2 pgs motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion) Wed 10/02 3:26 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Todd J. Kaiser ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-12025439) by Armando Tellez, Transportation Insurance Advisors, LLC. Response to Motion due by 10/16/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Van Buren, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Affidavit Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission,
Att: 2 3 pgs Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 1 pgs Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Admission
4 4 4 pgs motion Extension of Time Wed 10/02 12:26 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time by Armando Tellez, Transportation Insurance Advisors, LLC. Response to Motion due by 10/16/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Van Buren, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Supporting Documents Parties' emails,
Att: 2 2 pgs Supporting Documents Declaration of Ryan Van Buren,
Att: 3 1 pgs Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Alter Time to File Responsive Pleading
Friday, September 27, 2024
3 3 4 pgs discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 09/27 3:16 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Armando Tellez, Transportation Insurance Advisors, LLC.(rhei, )
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Fri 09/27 3:13 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Beaufort County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2024CP0701438. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12017145), filed by Transportation Insurance Advisors, LLC, Armando Tellez.(rhei, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/27/2024) (rhei, ). Modified to replace Exhibit 1 with corrected version as provided by filing user on 9/27/2024 (rhei, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit 1- Declaration of Anna E. Ketcham,
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit 2- Affidavit of Service of Andrea Smith,
Att: 3 14 pgs Exhibit 3- Unpublished Decisions,
Att: 4 23 pgs Exhibit 4- State Court Pleadings