District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:James E Boasberg
Case #: 1:24-cv-02769
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2024
Terminated:Jan 30, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 26, 2025 5:11 AM EDT
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
Defendant
XOCHITIL TORRES SMALL
Represented By
Arjun Mody
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Stephen DeGenaro
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Represented By
Arjun Mody
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Stephen DeGenaro
contact info
Defendant
THOMAS J. VILSACK
Represented By
Arjun Mody
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Stephen DeGenaro
contact info
Defendant
DEBRA YOCUM
Represented By
Arjun Mody
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Stephen DeGenaro
contact info
Plaintiff
ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Represented By
James Anthony Wolff
Warshaw Burstein LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
OVANOVA CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC
Represented By
Alex Menendez
Watkinson Miller
contact info
James Anthony Wolff
Warshaw Burstein LLP
contact info
Gregory Sussman
Watkinson Miller PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
OVANOVA ENERGY CORPORATION
Represented By
Alex Menendez
Watkinson Miller
contact info
James Anthony Wolff
Warshaw Burstein LLP
contact info
Gregory Sussman
Watkinson Miller PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
OVANOVA SOLAR CORPORATION
Represented By
Alex Menendez
Watkinson Miller
contact info
James Anthony Wolff
Warshaw Burstein LLP
contact info
Gregory Sussman
Watkinson Miller PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
OVANOVA, INC.
Represented By
Alex Menendez
Watkinson Miller
contact info
James Anthony Wolff
Warshaw Burstein LLP
contact info
Gregory Sussman
Watkinson Miller PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
MARTIN KELLER
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
Stephen DeGenaro
contact info
Steven A. Neeley
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Defendant
NATIONAL RENEWABLE ENERGY LABORATORY
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
Stephen DeGenaro
contact info
Steven A. Neeley
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info

GPO Jan 13 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 32 Order on Motion to Dismiss Defendants National Renewable Energy Laboratory and Martin Keller. Signed by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/13/2025. (lcjeb4)
GPO Jan 30 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 35 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on January 30, 2025. (lcjeb3)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, January 30, 2025
36 36 12 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Thu 01/30 10:09 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION re35 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on January 30, 2025. (lcjeb3)
Related: [-]
35 35 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 01/30 10:08 AM
ORDER GRANTING27 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on January 30, 2025. (lcjeb3)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Thu 01/30 10:13 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Given the Court's35 Order dismissing the case, the31 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is DENIED as moot. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on January 30, 2025. (lcjeb3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
34 34 3 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 01/15 1:48 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to31 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by XOCHITIL TORRES SMALL, DEBRA YOCUM, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, THOMAS J. VILSACK.(Mody, Arjun)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 01/15 4:55 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) The Unopposed34 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED; and 2) Defendants shall file their Response to Plaintiffs'31 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by January 31, 2025. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on January 15, 2025. (lcjeb2)
Related: [-]
order .Order Wed 01/15 5:12 PM
MINUTE ORDER: As set forth in its33 Memorandum Opinion, the Court does not believe that Plaintiffs' inclusion of NREL and Keller as Defendants was a frivolous exercise, even if it was legally incorrect. As such, the Court ORDERS that Defendants'23 Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/15/2025. (lcjeb4)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
33 33 7 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Mon 01/13 3:23 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION re32 Order on Motion to Dismiss Defendants National Renewable Energy Laboratory and Martin Keller. Signed by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/13/2025. (lcjeb4)
Related: [-]
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 01/13 3:17 PM
ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendants National Renewable Energy Laboratory and Martin Keller's15 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED; and 2) Defendants National Renewable Energy Laboratory and Martin Keller are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/13/2025. (lcjeb4) Modified to add signature on 1/13/2025 (znbn).
Related: [-]
31 31 2 pgs motion Preliminary Injunction Mon 01/13 12:17 PM
Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by OVANOVA, INC., OVANOVA ENERGY CORPORATION, OVANOVA CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC, OVANOVA SOLAR CORPORATION, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10.(Wolff, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 36 pgs Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 6 pgs Affidavit Chiquete Affidavit,
Att: 3 200 pgs Exhibit Exhibits to Chiquete Affidavit,
Att: 4 4 pgs Affidavit Crafton Affidavit,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibits to Crafton Affidavit
Friday, January 10, 2025
30 30 16 pgs respm Reply to opposition to motion Fri 01/10 3:46 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re27 Motion to Dismiss filed by XOCHITIL TORRES SMALL, DEBRA YOCUM, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, THOMAS J. VILSACK. (Mody, Arjun)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
29 29 20 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Fri 12/27 8:35 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re27 Motion to Dismiss filed by OVANOVA, INC., OVANOVA ENERGY CORPORATION, OVANOVA CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC, OVANOVA SOLAR CORPORATION, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10.(Wolff, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 12/27 12:19 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) The Unopposed28 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED; and 2) Defendants shall file their Reply in support of their27 Motion to Dismiss by January 10, 2025. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on December 27, 2024. (lcjeb4)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
28 28 3 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 12/26 11:42 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to27 MOTION to Dismiss by XOCHITIL TORRES SMALL, DEBRA YOCUM, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, THOMAS J. VILSACK.(Mody, Arjun)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, December 19, 2024
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 12/19 1:47 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendants'25 Motion to Excuse Compliance is GRANTED; and 2) Government Defendants are excused from complying with Local Rule 7(n)(1) for purposes of their motion to dismiss. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on December 19, 2024. (lcjeb2)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
27 27 1 pgs motion Dismiss Fri 12/13 4:24 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by XOCHITIL TORRES SMALL, DEBRA YOCUM, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, THOMAS J. VILSACK.(Mody, Arjun)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 27 pgs Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, December 12, 2024
26 26 7 pgs respm Reply to opposition to motion Thu 12/12 4:34 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re23 Motion for Sanctions, filed by MARTIN KELLER, NATIONAL RENEWABLE ENERGY LABORATORY. (Neeley, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
25 25 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 12/09 12:31 PM
MOTION to Excuse Compliance with Local Rule 7(n)(1) by XOCHITIL TORRES SMALL, DEBRA YOCUM, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, THOMAS J. VILSACK.(Mody, Arjun)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
order .Order Mon 12/09 3:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff shall file any opposition to Defendants'25 Motion to Excuse Compliance by December 16, 2024. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on December 9, 2024. (lcjeb2)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
notice Notice of Error Fri 12/06 9:18 AM
NOTICE OF ERROR regarding24 Memorandum in Opposition. Please note the following error(s) for future filings; do not refile: Invalid attorney signature- signature on document must match PACER login. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
24 24 8 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Thu 12/05 4:15 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re23 Motion for Sanctions, filed by OVANOVA, INC., OVANOVA ENERGY CORPORATION, OVANOVA CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC, OVANOVA SOLAR CORPORATION.(Sussman, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, November 21, 2024
23 23 motion Sanctions Thu 11/21 11:18 AM
MOTION for Sanctions by MARTIN KELLER, NATIONAL RENEWABLE ENERGY LABORATORY.(Neeley, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit 1 - Letter to Plaintiffs Counsel,
Att: 2 5 pgs Exhibit 2 - Response from Plaintiffs Cousnel,
Att: 3 2 pgs Supplement Local Rule 7(m) Certification,
Att: 4 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
22 22 8 pgs respm Reply to opposition to motion Wed 11/20 5:42 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re15 Motion to Dismiss filed by MARTIN KELLER, NATIONAL RENEWABLE ENERGY LABORATORY. (Neeley, Steven)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 16, 2024
21 21 misc Transcript Sat 11/16 3:40 PM
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS, before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg, held on 11 13-2024 Page Numbers: 1 - 17. Date of Issuance: 11 16-2024 Court Reporter: Elizabeth Davila, Telephone number: 202-354-3242. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/7/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2025.(Davila, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 11/15 10:19 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) The Unopposed20 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED; and 2) Defendant shall file its Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by December 13, 2024. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on November 15, 2024. (lcjeb2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
20 20 motion Extension of Time to Thu 11/14 5:21 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by XOCHITIL TORRES SMALL, DEBRA YOCUM, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, THOMAS J. VILSACK.(Mody, Arjun)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
19 19 respm Response to motion Wed 11/13 10:37 PM
RESPONSE re15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by OVANOVA, INC., OVANOVA ENERGY CORPORATION, OVANOVA CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC, OVANOVA SOLAR CORPORATION.(Sussman, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 17 pgs Exhibit Crafton Affidavit,
Att: 2 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
minutes Motion Hearing Wed 11/13 11:26 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg: Motion Hearing held via Zoom on 11/13/2024 re5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by OVANOVA SOLAR CORPORATION, OVANOVA CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC, OVANOVA ENERGY CORPORATION, OVANOVA, INC.. Oral arguments heard, motion DENIED for the reason stated on the record. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Davila) (znbn)
Related: [-]
order .Order Wed 11/13 11:42 AM
MINUTE ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record in today's hearing, the Court ORDERS that Plaintiffs'5 Motion for TRO is DENIED. Plaintiffs may file a further Motion for Preliminary Injunction at any point if they so desire. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/13/2024. (lcjeb1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/12 11:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by James Anthony Wolff on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wolff, James) (Main Document 18 replaced on 11/13/2024) (znmw).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
17 17 respm Reply to opposition to motion Wed 11/06 7:56 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re5 Motion for TRO,, Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by OVANOVA, INC., OVANOVA ENERGY CORPORATION, OVANOVA CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC, OVANOVA SOLAR CORPORATION.(Sussman, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order
16 16 respm Reply to opposition to motion Wed 11/06 7:53 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re5 Motion for TRO,, Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by OVANOVA, INC., OVANOVA ENERGY CORPORATION, OVANOVA CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC, OVANOVA SOLAR CORPORATION.(Sussman, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
15 15 13 pgs motion Dismiss Wed 10/30 8:47 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by MARTIN KELLER, NATIONAL RENEWABLE ENERGY LABORATORY.(Neeley, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
14 14 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Wed 10/30 6:23 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re5 Motion for TRO,, Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by XOCHITIL TORRES SMALL, DEBRA YOCUM, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, THOMAS J. VILSACK.(Mody, Arjun)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Debra Yocum,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Letter to La Finca Naturals,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Letter to DTI Solutions,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Letter to Cookeville Auto Salvage,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
13 13 18 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Wed 10/30 4:18 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re5 Motion for TRO,, Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by MARTIN KELLER, NATIONAL RENEWABLE ENERGY LABORATORY.(Neeley, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Martin Keller, PhD,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Keller Declaration,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 10/16 2:11 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg: Status Conference held on 10/16/2024. A further Status Conference is set for 11/13/2024 at 11:00 AM via Zoom. Minute Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Tammy Nestor) (znbn)
Related: [-]
order .Order Wed 10/16 2:57 PM
MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's status hearing, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendants shall file any Oppositions to Plaintiffs' TRO Motion by October 30, 2024, and Plaintiffs shall file any Reply by November 6, 2024; and 2) The parties shall appear for a hearing on the Motion on November 13, 2024, at 11:00 a.m. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on October 16, 2024. (lcjeb2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 10/16 5:39 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/30/2024. Replies due by 11/6/2024. (znbn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Wed 10/09 1:33 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MARTIN KELLER, NATIONAL RENEWABLE ENERGY LABORATORY. Attorney Stephen DeGenaro terminated. (DeGenaro, Stephen)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/09 1:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Arjun Mody on behalf of XOCHITIL TORRES SMALL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, THOMAS J. VILSACK, DEBRA YOCUM (Mody, Arjun)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/09 11:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Neeley on behalf of MARTIN KELLER, NATIONAL RENEWABLE ENERGY LABORATORY (Neeley, Steven)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status Wed 10/09 8:57 AM
NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Menendez on behalf of OVANOVA CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC, OVANOVA ENERGY CORPORATION, OVANOVA SOLAR CORPORATION, OVANOVA, INC. (Menendez, Alex). Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 10/16/2024. (zapb) RESOLVED.....10/9/2024 (zhcn)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 10/09 2:45 PM
Minute Entry for Video Status Conference held on 10/9/2024 before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg: A further Video Status Conference set for 10/16/2024 at 2:00 PM before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. Court Reporter: Tammy Nestor. (smc)
Related: [-]
order .Order Wed 10/09 5:32 PM
MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's status hearing, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall return for a further Zoom status hearing on October 16, 2024, at 2:00 p.m. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on October 9, 2024. (lcjeb2)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/07 9:48 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James A. Wolff is GRANTED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] . So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on October 7, 2024. (lcjeb2)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/04 4:44 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- James A. Wolff, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11211794. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by OVANOVA CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC, OVANOVA ENERGY CORPORATION, OVANOVA SOLAR CORPORATION, OVANOVA, INC..(Sussman, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Supplement,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/04 1:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Menendez on behalf of OVANOVA CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC, OVANOVA ENERGY CORPORATION, OVANOVA SOLAR CORPORATION, OVANOVA, INC. (Menendez, Alex)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/02 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of MARTIN KELLER, NATIONAL RENEWABLE ENERGY LABORATORY, XOCHITIL TORRES SMALL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, THOMAS J. VILSACK, DEBRA YOCUM (DeGenaro, Stephen)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 10/02 2:29 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 10/2/2024 at 03:30 PM via Zoom. (znbn)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 10/02 3:57 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg: Status Conference held via Zoom on 10/2/2024. A further Status Conference is set for 10/9/2024 at 02:00 PM via Zoom before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg.). (Court Reporter Tammy Nestor) (znbn)
Related: [-]
order .Order Wed 10/02 4:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER: As discussed, the parties shall appear for a status conference via Zoom on October 9, 2024, at 2 PM. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/2/2024. (lcjeb4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
6 6 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Tue 10/01 4:59 PM
SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to MARTIN KELLER, NATIONAL RENEWABLE ENERGY LABORATORY, XOCHITIL TORRES SMALL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, THOMAS J. VILSACK, DEBRA YOCUM, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 10/01 4:53 PM
Case Assigned to Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
5 5 motion Temporary Restraining Order Mon 09/30 9:49 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by OVANOVA CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC, OVANOVA ENERGY CORPORATION, OVANOVA SOLAR CORPORATION, OVANOVA, INC..(Sussman, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 3 Affidavit,
Att: 4 Declaration
4 4 1 pgs notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Mon 09/30 11:10 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by OVANOVA CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC, OVANOVA ENERGY CORPORATION, OVANOVA SOLAR CORPORATION, OVANOVA, INC. (Sussman, Gregory)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Request for Summons to Issue Mon 09/30 11:06 AM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by OVANOVA CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC, OVANOVA ENERGY CORPORATION, OVANOVA SOLAR CORPORATION, OVANOVA, INC..(Sussman, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
2 2 cmp Request for Summons to Issue Mon 09/30 10:08 AM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to USDA filed by OVANOVA CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC, OVANOVA ENERGY CORPORATION, OVANOVA SOLAR CORPORATION, OVANOVA, INC..(Sussman, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Vilsack,
Att: 2 Summons Torres Small,
Att: 3 Summons NREL,
Att: 4 Summons Keller,
Att: 5 Summons Yocum
Friday, September 27, 2024
1 1 44 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/27 6:06 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11192643) filed by OVANOVA CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC, OVANOVA ENERGY CORPORATION, OVANOVA SOLAR CORPORATION, OVANOVA, INC..(Sussman, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet