Williams v. Warner Music Group Corp.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | J Paul Oetken |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-07352 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Sep 27, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jan 31, 2025 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 26, 2025 5:26 AM EDT |
Defendant
Warner Music Group Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Milton Williams
New York, NY 10003
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, January 30, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Warner Music Group Corp.. Document filed by Milton Williams. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(LaBollita, Michael) |
|
Monday, January 13, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Mon 01/13 4:49 PM
ORDER granting10 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: Granted. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for January 14, 2025 is adjourned to March 18, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel should call (855) 244-8681 at the scheduled time. The access code is 23128287066. Counsel should submit a proposed case management plan as previously instructed no later than three business days prior to the initial conference. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (cw) |
|
Friday, January 10, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Sean J. Kirby dated January 10, 2025. Document filed by Warner Music Group Corp...(Kirby, Sean) |
|
9 | 9
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Warner Music Group Corp. waiver sent on 1/10/2025, answer due 3/11/2025. Document filed by Warner Music Group Corp...(Kirby, Sean) |
|
8 | 8
![]() ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to advise the Court in writing why he has failed to serve the summons and complaint on Defendant within the ninety-day period, or, if Defendant has been served, when and in what manner such service was made. If no written communication is received by January 13, 2025, showing good cause why such service was not made within ninety days, the Court will dismiss the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/10/2025) (sgz) |
|
Thursday, October 03, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Warner Music Group Corp. (vf) |
|
Wednesday, October 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Warner Music Group Corp., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Milton Williams..(LaBollita, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(LaBollita, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, October 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/14/2025 at 12:00 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Counsel should call (888) 557-8511 at the scheduled time. The access code is 9300838. Counsel who appear at the pretrial conference must be authorized to negotiate terms of settlement. Members of the public may join but are instructed to place their phones on mute. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/1/2024) (vfr) |
|
Monday, September 30, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(LaBollita, Michael) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 09/30 9:36 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 09/30 9:36 AM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 09/30 9:37 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 09/30 9:38 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Mon 09/30 9:38 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc) |
||
Friday, September 27, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb on behalf of Milton Williams..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Warner Music Group Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29960628)Document filed by Milton Williams..(LaBollita, Michael) |