Washington Western District Court
Judge:Michelle L Peterson
Case #: 2:24-cv-01552
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2024
Case in other court:King County Superior Court, 24-00002-13595-2 KNT
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 26, 2025 2:33 AM PDT
Defendant
First National Insurance Co of America
Represented By
Sarah L Eversole
Wilson Smith Cochran & Dickerson
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Rockwell
Represented By
Stephen M Hansen
Law Offices Of Stephen M Hansen Ps
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
29 29 misc Praecipe-Other Tue 05/13 4:57 PM
PRAECIPE re19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Jennifer Rockwell(Hansen, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Monday, May 12, 2025
28 28 motion Seal Mon 05/12 7:25 PM
MOTION to Seal Provisionally , filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Rockwell. Noting Date 6/2/2025, (Hansen, Stephen)
Related: [-]
27 27 sealdoc Sealed Document Mon 05/12 7:24 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Stephen M. Hansen by Plaintiff Jennifer Rockwell re14 Protective Order, Terminate Motions,19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment(Hansen, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit
26 26 respm Declaration Mon 05/12 7:16 PM
DECLARATION of Mary E. Owen filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Rockwell re19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Hansen, Stephen)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Declaration Mon 05/12 7:15 PM
DECLARATION of Darrell M. Harber filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Rockwell re19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Hansen, Stephen)
Related: [-]
24 24 respm Response to Motion Mon 05/12 7:14 PM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Jennifer Rockwell, to19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . (Hansen, Stephen)
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Response to Motion Mon 05/12 5:41 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendant First National Insurance Co of America, to17 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Lathrop . (Eversole, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
22 22 misc Praecipe-Other Thu 05/01 10:20 AM
PRAECIPE re Terminate Motions by Plaintiff Jennifer Rockwell(Hansen, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
21 21 respm Declaration Tue 04/22 11:15 AM
DECLARATION of Eversole and Exhibits filed by Defendant First National Insurance Co of America re19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Eversole, Sarah)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Declaration Tue 04/22 11:14 AM
DECLARATION of Alyssa Bowen filed by Defendant First National Insurance Co of America re19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment(Eversole, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
19 19 motion Partial Summary Judgment Tue 04/22 11:09 AM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , filed by Defendant First National Insurance Co of America. Noting Date 5/16/2025, (Eversole, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order proposed order
utility Terminate Motions (Public) Tue 04/22 2:35 PM
***Motion terminated:18 MOTION to Exclude DECLARATION OF HANSEN filed by Jennifer Rockwell. This document was filed as a motion, but is a Declaration. (TF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
18 18 motion Exclude Mon 04/21 8:48 PM
MOTION to Exclude DECLARATION OF HANSEN, filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Rockwell. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 5/23/2025, (Hansen, Stephen) Modified on 4/22/2025 to term motion. Document is declaration in support of17 motion to exclude expert testimony (TF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
17 17 motion Exclude Mon 04/21 8:41 PM
MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Lathrop , filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Rockwell. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 5/23/2025, (Hansen, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 03/31 1:14 PM
ORDER on15 Stipulated Motion to Continue signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/21/2025, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 4/21/2025, Discovery completed by 4/14/2025, Dispositive motions and Daubert motions due by 4/21/2025. (AQ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
15 15 motion Stipulated Motion Wed 03/26 2:53 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Continue , filed by All Parties. Noting Date 3/26/2025, (Eversole, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order proposed order on stipulated motion
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
14 14 order Protective Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 01/15 12:41 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson, re11 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order. (SNP)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
13 13 misc Praecipe to Attach Document Fri 01/10 3:45 PM
PRAECIPE to attach document re11 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order ,12 Minute Order by Defendant First National Insurance Co of America (Eversole, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
12 12 order 2 - Minute Order Tue 01/07 3:31 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson, United States Magistrate Judge, re: the parties'11 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order.(TF)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Protective Order Tue 01/07 12:32 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Defendant First National Insurance Co of America. Noting Date 1/7/2025, (Eversole, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
10 10 order 1 - Order ~Util - Set/Reset Trial Date and Related Deadlines Tue 10/29 5:08 PM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. Jury Trial is set for 6/23/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12A before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. Joinder of Parties due by 11/26/2024, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/30/2024, Discovery Motions due by 1/14/2025, Discovery completed by 2/13/2025, Dispositive motions due by 3/17/2025, Amended Pleadings due by 12/30/2024, Motions in Limine due by 5/27/2025, Pretrial Order due by 6/3/2025, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 1/30/2025, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 6/13/2025, Pretrial Conference set for 6/13/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12A before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (TF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
9 9 order Order on Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge Fri 10/25 3:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER ON CONSENT to proceed before a Magistrate Judge made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin. Pursuant to the Parties'8 Joint Status Report, this case is reassigned to Judge Michelle L. Peterson for all further proceedings. Judge Tana Lin is no longer assigned to the case. All future pleadings shall bear the case number 2:24-cv-01552-MLP. (Text only entry) (KMP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
8 8 misc Joint Status Report Thu 10/10 9:24 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 5 - 6. Filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Rockwell.(Hansen, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
7 7 order TL Minute Order re Chambers Procedures Thu 10/03 2:16 PM
MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: The Court has posted Chambers Procedures at[LINK:https://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-procedures] . All counsel and unrepresented ("pro se") parties are DIRECTED to review them, if they have not already done so. Failure to follow the requirements set forth in the Chambers Procedures may result in the imposition of sanctions. (KMP)
Related: [-]
6 6 order TL Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Thu 10/03 2:16 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
5 5 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 10/02 1:13 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Safeco Insurance Company of America, Corporate Parent Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc. for First National Insurance Co of America. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by First National Insurance Co of America. (Eversole, Sarah)
Related: [-]
4 4 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 10/02 1:08 PM
DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1(a)(2). Filed by First National Insurance Co of America. (Eversole, Sarah)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Wed 10/02 12:55 PM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 10/02 12:47 PM
Judge Tana Lin added. (RE)
Related: [-]
utility Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines Wed 10/02 12:55 PM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Defendant First National Insurance Co of America must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/9/2024. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents. (RE)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
2 2 misc Declaration (non motion) Fri 09/27 3:26 PM
DECLARATION of Sarah L. Eversole re1 Notice of Removal by Defendant First National Insurance Co. of America(Eversole, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex 1,
Att: 2 Ex 2,
Att: 3 Ex 3,
Att: 4 Ex 4
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 09/27 3:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 24 2-13595 2 KNT; Related [+] filed by First National Insurance Co. of America.(Eversole, Sarah)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8648653
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Complaint