Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-02335
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2024
Terminated:Sep 27, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 28, 2024 12:18 AM MST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sydney Yew
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jonathan Garcia-Nava (1)
Terminated: 09/27/2024
Represented By
Robert Bruce Stirling, II
Federal Public Defenders Office - Yuma
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/28/2024 4:05 AM MST
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
Arrest of Jonathan Garcia-Nava on 9/25/2024. (NM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jonathan Garcia-Nava. (NM)
Related: [-]