New York Southern District Court
Judge:Andrew L Carter, Jr
Case #: 1:24-cv-07362
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause12:22 Securities Fraud
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 5:07 AM EDT
Defendant
Stephen Apolant
Represented By
Jerome M. Selvers
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden
contact info
David Neil Cinotti
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Camelot Nevada Trust
Defendant
Charles Dilluvio
Represented By
Maxim Mordecai Lebowitz-Nowak
Herrick, Feinstein LLP
contact info
Michael Ryan Feeney
Herrick Feinstein LLP
contact info
Arthur Glenn Jakoby
Herrick, Feinstein Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Jonathan Farber
Represented By
Thomas Puzzo
Law Offices Of Thomas E. Puzzo
contact info
Defendant
Seacor Capital, Inc.
Represented By
Maxim Mordecai Lebowitz-Nowak
Herrick, Feinstein LLP
contact info
Michael Ryan Feeney
Herrick Feinstein LLP
contact info
Arthur Glenn Jakoby
Herrick, Feinstein Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Sky-Direct LLC
Represented By
Jerome M. Selvers
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden
contact info
David Neil Cinotti
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Wexford Industries Ltd.
Represented By
Thomas Puzzo
Law Offices Of Thomas E. Puzzo
contact info
Defendant
Dannie Zhabilov
Represented By
Robert Gerard Heim
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
Evan J. Gotlob
Lucosky Brookman
contact info
Samuel Blatnick
Lucosky Brookman LLP
contact info
David Michael Rosenfield
Lucosky Brookman
contact info
Michael John Grudberg
Tarter Krinsky Drogin, LLP
contact info
Anne L. Melton
Lucosky Brookman
contact info
Matthew Ross
Lucosky Brookman
contact info
Defendant
Harry Zhabilov
Represented By
Evan J. Gotlob
Lucosky Brookman
contact info
David Michael Rosenfield
Lucosky Brookman
contact info
Patrick Ryan Morris
Morris Legal Corp.
contact info
Matthew Ross
Lucosky Brookman
contact info
Defendant
Billy V. Ray, Jr.
Plaintiff
Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By
Rua M. Kelly
U.S. Securities And Exchange Commission (ma)
contact info
Marc Jonathan Jones
United States Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Nita Kumaraswami Klunder
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Relief Defendant
Equity Markets ADV LLC
Represented By
Jerome M. Selvers
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden
contact info
David Neil Cinotti
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden, P.C.
contact info
Relief Defendant
NY Farms Group, Inc.
Represented By
Jerome M. Selvers
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden
contact info
David Neil Cinotti
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Saturday, March 15, 2025
78 78 misc Letter Mon 03/17 12:07 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Kelli Austin dated 3/15/2025 re: respones to Marc Jone's Letter Motion for Conference filed March 13, 2025.. (vba)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
77 77 motion Conference Thu 03/13 4:48 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Marc Jones dated March 13, 2025. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Jones, Marc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
76 76 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/10 8:45 AM
ORDER FOR ADMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE granting75 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Motion of Evan J. Gotlob for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned action is granted. As further set forth by this Order. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/10/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]