California Northern District Court
Judge:James Donato
Case #: 3:24-cv-06843
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 2:24 AM PDT
Defendant
Google LLC
Represented By
Jessica E Phillips
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton Garrison LLP
contact info
Karen Leah Dunn
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Meredith Richardson Dearborn
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Jeannie S. Rhee
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Martha Lea Goodman
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Samsung Electronic America, Inc.
Represented By
Victoria F. Maroulis
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Adam Bryan Wolfson
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Sullivan LLP
contact info
Debra Dawn Bernstein
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Kevin Yoshiwo Teruya
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info
Defendant
Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
Represented By
Victoria F. Maroulis
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Adam Bryan Wolfson
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Sullivan LLP
contact info
Debra Dawn Bernstein
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Kevin Yoshiwo Teruya
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Epic Games, Inc.
Represented By
Yonatan Even
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Lauren Ann Moskowitz
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Michael Jacob Zaken
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Gary Andrew Bornstein
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Shaneeda Jaffer
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info
Lily Anna North
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
82 82 minutes Status Conference Tue 05/13 3:06 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference held on 5/8/2025. Total Time in Court: 11 minutes. Court Reporter: April Brott. (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/9/2025)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
81 81 misc Transcript Thu 05/08 10:37 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on May 8, 2025, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber April Wood Brott, telephone number 510-225-8350 april_brott@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/6/2025. (Brott, April)
Related: [-] 78 Transcript Order (s)78
80 80 misc Transcript Order Thu 05/08 1:57 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/8/2025 before Judge James Donato by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Electronic America, Inc., for Court Reporter April Brott. (Maroulis, Victoria)
Related: [-]
79 79 misc Transcript Order Thu 05/08 1:43 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/8/2025 before Judge James Donato by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter April Brott. (Zaken, Michael)
Related: [-]
78 78 misc Transcript Order Thu 05/08 1:25 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/08/2025 before Judge James Donato by Google LLC, for Court Reporter April Brott. (Phillips, Jessica)
Related: [-]