California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: David T Bristow
Case #: 2:24-cv-08377
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2024
Terminated:Oct 09, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 2:01 AM PDT
Defendant
Rob Bonta
Represented By
Kristin A. Liska
Caag - Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Shirley N. Weber
Represented By
Kristin A. Liska
Caag - Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Kelly Chang Rickert
Represented By
David A Shaneyfelt
Alvarez Firm Alc
contact info
Plaintiff
The Babylon Bee, LLC
Represented By
David A Shaneyfelt
Alvarez Firm Alc
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
George Gascon
Terminated: 10/04/2024
Defendant
Hydee Soto
Terminated: 10/04/2024


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
33 33 order Transfer Case Thu 10/10 10:53 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION30 TO TRANSFER VENUE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court hereby orders the clerk to TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California, Sacramento Division. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
32 32 order Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106) - optional html form Tue 10/08 6:08 PM
ORDER STRIKING by Judge Fernando M. Olguin Re: MOTION to Waive Oral Argument25 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): (1) Hearing information is incorrect and not timely. (vdr)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Expedite Tue 10/08 5:49 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Expedite Decision on Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Plaintiffs The Babylon Bee, LLC, Kelly Chang Rickert. Motion set for hearing on 11/7/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Shaneyfelt, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
30 30 motion Transfer Case Tue 10/08 5:44 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of California, Sacramento Division filed by Plaintiffs The Babylon Bee, LLC, Kelly Chang Rickert. Motion set for hearing on 11/7/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Shaneyfelt, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Bryan Neihart,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
29 29 misc Response Tue 10/08 4:21 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs The Babylon Bee, LLC, Kelly Chang Rickertto Staying Case15 (Shaneyfelt, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Bryan Neihart,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of B. Neihart
28 28 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 10/08 3:49 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Johannes Widmalm-Delphonse to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs The Babylon Bee, LLC, Kelly Chang Rickert (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38363189) filed by Plaintiffs The Babylon Bee, LLC, Kelly Chang Rickert. (Shaneyfelt, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order to Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case
27 27 order Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106) - optional html form Tue 10/08 11:27 AM
ORDER STRIKING by Judge Fernando M. Olguin Re: Motions21 and22 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): (1) Hearing information is not timely. See Local Rule 6-1. The notice of motion shall be filed with the Clerk not later than twenty-eight (28) days before the date set for hearing (vdr)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 10/08 9:36 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Motions21 ,22 ,25 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or untimely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
14 14 attorney Response to Notice of Fee Due on Pro Hac Vice Application Tue 10/01 9:24 PM
RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Bryan Neihart David A Shaneyfelt on behalf of Plaintiffs Kelly Chang Rickert, The Babylon Bee, LLC. RE: for Bryan Neihart.(Shaneyfelt, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order to Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case
13 13 attorney Response to Notice of Fee Due on Pro Hac Vice Application Tue 10/01 9:11 PM
RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Jonathan Scruggs David A Shaneyfelt on behalf of Plaintiffs Kelly Chang Rickert, The Babylon Bee, LLC. RE: for Jonathan Scruggs.(Shaneyfelt, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order to Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case
12 12 motion Temporary Restraining Order Tue 10/01 7:01 PM
APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Plaintiffs' Application for TRO or Alternative Motion for Expedited Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs The Babylon Bee, LLC, Kelly Chang Rickert. Application set for hearing on 10/10/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Shaneyfelt, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Application for TRO or Alternative Motion for Expedited Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 2 Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Application for TRO or Alternative Motion for Expedited Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Application for TRO or Alternative Motion for Expedited Preliminary Injunction
11 11 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Tue 10/01 10:15 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Bryan D Neihart on behalf of Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
Related: [-]
10 10 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Tue 10/01 10:10 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan A Scruggs on behalf of Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 10/01 9:56 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Rob Bonta, George Gascon, Hydee Soto, Shirley N. Weber. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons for Shirley N. Weber,
Att: 2 Summons for George Gascon,
Att: 3 Summons for Hydee Soto
8 8 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 10/01 9:43 AM
(Court only) GENERIC COURT ONLY: Case assigned from districtwide case assignment deck for cases seeking nationwide or statewide relief. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 10/01 9:38 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 10/01 9:37 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 10/01 9:37 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (ghap)
Related: [-]
attorney Pay Filing Fee Tue 10/01 9:20 PM
PHV FEE PAID for Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan A. Scruggs Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Receipt No. ACACDC-38321476 for $500 pro hac vice fee. (Shaneyfelt, David)
Related: [-]
attorney Pay Filing Fee Tue 10/01 9:28 PM
PHV FEE PAID for Non-Resident Attorney Bryan D. Neihart Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Receipt No. ACACDC-38321487 for $500 pro hac vice fee. (Shaneyfelt, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
4 4 notice Summons Request Mon 09/30 6:18 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiff The Babylon Bee, LLC, Kelly Chang Rickert.(Shaneyfelt, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons - S. Weber,
Att: 2 Summons - G. Gascon,
Att: 3 Summons - H. Soto
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 09/30 6:09 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff The Babylon Bee, LLC, Kelly Chang Rickert, (Shaneyfelt, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 09/30 6:05 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs The Babylon Bee, LLC, Kelly Chang Rickert. (Shaneyfelt, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 09/30 5:58 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38302956 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Kelly Chang Rickert, The Babylon Bee, LLC. (Attorney David A Shaneyfelt added to party The Babylon Bee, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney David A Shaneyfelt added to party Kelly Chang Rickert(pty:pla))(Shaneyfelt, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Index,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12