BIGELOW v. NEW ENTERPRISE STONE & LIME CO., INC.
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Stephanie L Haines |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00225 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 |
Case Filed: | Sep 30, 2024 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2025 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 7:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
NEW ENTERPRISE STONE & LIME CO., INC.
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
KENNETH J. BENSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID BIGELOW, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 35 minutes ago |
Friday, May 02, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal by DAVID BIGELOW, JR. (Rieser, William) |
|
Friday, March 28, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER OF COURT - Upon the parties having advised the Court that this case has been settled [Doc.18 ], and the only remaining matter being the submission of a stipulation of settlement and dismissal; accordingly, with no further action being required by the Court at this time, the following order is entered: IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk shall remove this case from the docket for administrative purposes, and as more fully stated in said Order of Court. Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 3/28/2025. (dlg) |
|
18 | 18
![]() STATUS REPORT by DAVID BIGELOW, JR. (Rieser, William) |
|
Wednesday, March 05, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION - Mediation. Kenneth J. Benson is appointed as mediator. The ADR Conference shall be concluded on or before April 17, 2025, unless extended by Order of the Court. It is the responsibility of counsel to ensure that notice of the date, time and location of the mediation has been electronically filed with the Court on or before March 17, 2025, and as more fully stated in said Order Referring Case to ADR. Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 3/5/2025. (dlg) |
|
Tuesday, February 18, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() STIPULATION selecting ADR process by DAVID BIGELOW, JR. (Rieser, William) |
|
Tuesday, February 04, 2025 | ||
15 | 15
![]() INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: It is Ordered that compliance with the provisions of Local Rule 16.1 shall be completed as follows: Amended Pleadings due by 2/17/2025; Joinder of Parties due by 2/17/2025. The parties shall complete all Fact Discovery by 7/31/2025. A Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for 9/3/2025 at 10:30 AM, and as more fully stated in said Initial Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 2/3/2025. (dlg) |
|
Monday, February 03, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stephanie L. Haines: Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/3/2025. Court convened for telephone initial case management conference. Counsel entered appearances. Counsel for both parties summarized their positions on the case. Parties have engaged in settlement discussions but believe some fact discovery is necessary prior to mediation. The Court directed the parties to file an amended ADR Stipulation by February 10, 2025, identifying a neutral and setting a date certain for mediation. The Court will enter the parties' proposed initial scheduling order and will set a post-discovery status conference approximately 30 days after the close of fact discovery. The Court advised the parties to meet and confer on any discovery disputes that may arise and, if issue cannot be resolved informally, to contact chambers to set up a phone conference prior to filing any discovery-related motions. Appropriate orders to follow. Conference adjourned. (Court Reporter: Shirley Hall) (dag) |
|
Monday, January 27, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
![]() REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hipple, Mark) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, January 13, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ORDER OF COURT granting11 Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference; and, IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that the Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference in this case previously set for January 28, 2025, hereby is reset for Monday, February 3, 2025, at 10:30 a.m. before Judge Stephanie L. Haines. The conference will be conducted via a TEAMS audio conference number. The conference phone number and conference ID number will be provided to counsel via email in advance of the conference. Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 1/13/2025. (dlg) |
|
Thursday, January 09, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Unopposed MOTION to Continue Initial Rule 16 Case Management Conference by DAVID BIGELOW, JR. (Rieser, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, January 06, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 and 16.2, an Initial Rule 16 Case Management Conference shall be held on Tuesday, January 28, 2025, at 1:30 P.M. The Court will conduct the case management conference via a TEAMS audio conference number, which requires participants to dial in and provide an identification number. The Court will provide the conference phone number and conference ID number via an email to all counsel in advance of the conference, and as more fully stated in the Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 1/6/2025. (dlg) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Friday, December 20, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Conner H Porterfield on behalf of NEW ENTERPRISE STONE & LIME CO., INC.. (Porterfield, Conner) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate by NEW ENTERPRISE STONE & LIME CO., INC.. (Hipple, Mark) |
|
7 | 7
![]() ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by NEW ENTERPRISE STONE & LIME CO., INC.. (Hipple, Mark) |
|
Thursday, October 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DAVID BIGELOW, JR. NEW ENTERPRISE STONE & LIME CO., INC. waiver sent on 10/22/2024, answer due 12/23/2024. (Rieser, William) |
|
Tuesday, October 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions(details more fully stated in said Order) Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 10/1/2024. (dag) |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (dag) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Errata re1 COMPLAINT, by DAVID BIGELOW, JR. Reason for Correction: Attorney Signature with phone number and email address. (Rieser, William) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to NEW ENTERPRISE STONE & LIME CO., INC. (rjr) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 10/01 11:58 AM
Judge Stephanie L. Haines added. (rjr) |
||
misc
QC - Attorney Signature Deficient
Tue 10/01 12:01 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT. ERROR: Attorney signature missing required information, specifically the phone number and email address. CORRECTION: Attorney directed to comply with requirements of LCvR 5.2(B) and refile using the Errata event. (rjr) |
||
Monday, September 30, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against NEW ENTERPRISE STONE & LIME CO., INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8481301), filed by DAVID BIGELOW, JR. (Rieser, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |