Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-57819

Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:James R Sacca
Case #: 1:24-ap-05178
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2024
Terminated:Dec 10, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kanetra Maxine Young-Neal
3517 Oakleaf Pass
Fairburn, GA 30213
Represented By
Lorena Lee Saedi
Saedi Law Group, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Atlanta Postal Credit Union
2 Sun Ct, Suite 400
Peachtree Corners, GA 30092
Represented By
Michael Brian Pugh
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 34 minutes ago
Thursday, December 12, 2024
9 9 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Judgment Fri 12/13 12:59 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Judgment Notice Date 12/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
8 8 order Judgment Tue 12/10 8:14 AM
Consent Judgment with Atlanta Postal Credit Union. Service by BNC Entered on 12/10/2024. Related [+] (yl)
Related: [-] 1
misc Adversary Closed Tue 12/10 8:16 AM
Adversary 24-05178 jrs Closed (yl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Fri 11/15 1:10 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Notice Date 11/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
6 6 3 pgs notice Order and Notice Tue 11/12 12:47 PM
Order and Notice of Rule 26(f) Conference. Written report shall be filed on or before November 29, 2024. Service by BNC. Entered on 11/12/2024. (yl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/30 11:50 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Lorena Lee Saedi on behalf of Kanetra Maxine Young-Neal. (Saedi, Lorena)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Tue 10/01 3:34 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 523(a)(2)(A) and 523(a)(6) and for Attorneys Fees filed by Michael Brian Pugh on behalf of Atlanta Postal Credit Union. Related [+] (Pugh, Michael). Modified on 10/2/2024 (cws)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
Monday, September 30, 2024
3 3 court Summons/Alias Summons Issued (auto) Mon 09/30 2:56 PM
Summons Issued on Kanetra Maxine Young-Neal Answer Due 10/30/2024 (cws)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons/Alias Summons Issued (auto) Mon 09/30 10:53 AM
Summons Issued on Kanetra Maxine Young-Neal Answer Due 10/30/2024 (cws)
Related: [-]
court Notice of Incorrect Docket Entry Mon 09/30 2:54 PM
Notice that Document Number 2 - Summons Issued on Kanetra Maxine Young-Neal Answer Due 10/30/2024, was entered in error. Related [+] (cws)
Related: [-] 2
Friday, September 27, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/27 2:47 PM
Adversary case 24-05178 Complaint against Kanetra Maxine Young-Neal to Determine Dischargeability of Debt pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 523(a)(2)(A) and 523(a)(6)for a Money Judgment, and for Attorneys Fees , Fee Collected $ 350 62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud) 68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury) Filed by Atlanta Postal Credit Union (Pugh, Michael)
Related: [-]