California Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas S Hixson
Case #: 4:24-cv-06848
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 2:24 AM PDT
Defendant
Insurance Auto Auctions, Inc.
Represented By
Nisha Verma
Dorsey & Whitney, LLP
contact info
Alexandra Galante Super
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
US Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By
James H Baker
U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
contact info
Marcia L. Mitchell
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, September 30, 2024
4 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by James H Baker on behalf of US Equal Employment Oppurtunity Commission (Baker, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/15/2024. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Mitchell, Marcia)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Insurance Auto Auctions, Inc.. Filed by US Equal Employment Oppurtunity Commission.(Mitchell, Marcia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet