Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Robin L Rosenberg
Referred: Bruce E Reinhart
Case #: 9:24-cv-81200
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 6:57 AM EDT
Defendant
Advance Auto Parts, Inc.
Represented By
Ena Teresa Diaz
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Jenna Rinehart Rassif
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Scott Stephan Allen
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Richard J. Mrizek
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Ranjiv Sondhi
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Discount Auto Parts LLC
Represented By
Ena Teresa Diaz
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Jenna Rinehart Rassif
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Scott Stephan Allen
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Richard J. Mrizek
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Ranjiv Sondhi
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Mediator
Marlene Quintana
Gray Robinson 333 S.E. 2ND AVENUE Suite 3200
MIAMI, FL 33131
Plaintiff
U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By
Toussaint Marcus Cummings
Eeoc
contact info


Docket last updated: 43 minutes ago
Thursday, May 22, 2025
48 48 order Order on Motion to Intervene Thu 05/22 4:26 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO INTERVENE AND ADD NEW CLAIMS AND EXTENDING REMAINING DEADLINES. Expert Discovery due by 9/15/2025. Fact Discovery due by 9/15/2025. Mediation Deadline 11/17/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 10/16/2025. In Limine Motions due by 10/16/2025. Motions due by 10/16/2025. Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/12/2025. Calendar Call set for 1/7/2026 10:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. Jury Trial set for 1/12/2026 before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. Status Conference set for 11/26/2025 10:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/22/2025. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
47 47 motion Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Order -NOT R&R- to District Court Tue 05/20 5:11 PM
Plaintiff's OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge 45 Order,,, to District Court (Cummings, Toussaint)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
46 46 misc Transcript Tue 05/13 11:00 AM
TRANSCRIPT of telephonic discovery hearing held on 5 6-2025 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-36 pages, Court Reporter: Dawn Savino, 850-521-3674 / dawnsavino117@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/3/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/13/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2025. (Savino, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
45 45 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 05/06 11:04 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER re43 the parties' discovery disputes as set forth in their Joint Memorandum. As the Court ordered during the hearing: for Category #1 in the joint memo, Defendants' objections are denied and Defendants are ordered to provide the information as requested for both store locations from 1/10/20-12/31/24; for Category #2, Defendants must provide the contact information for people in any non-protected category at each store during the time when Warens and Miller worked there; for Category #5, Defendants' objections are overruled; for Categories # 6 and 8, the Court finds that the compromise proposed by Defendants at the hearing is adequate at this time (this determination is without prejudice for Plaintiff to seek additional information at a later date). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 5/6/2025. (hk02)
Related: [-]
44 44 minutes Discovery Hearing Tue 05/06 10:49 AM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Zoom Telephone Discovery Hearing on DE 43 held on 5/6/2025. Total time in court: 50 minutes. (hk02)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
43 43 5 pgs misc Memorandum Claim Fri 05/02 7:37 PM
MEMORANDUM of Law Joint Discovery Memorandum , CLAIM by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Cummings, Toussaint)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
42 42 misc Stipulation Wed 04/30 2:36 PM
STIPULATION (Joint) by Advance Auto Parts, Inc. (Allen, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
41 41 order Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing Mon 04/28 2:56 PM
PAPERLESS Order Setting a Telephone Discovery Hearing for 5/6/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Counsel shall appear telephonically using the following conference call instructions: Dial: 833-435-1820 (or 833-568-8864); Enter Meeting ID: 160 225 1740# and Passcode: 576690#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/28/2025. (hk02)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
40 40 respm Reply in Support of Motion Tue 04/22 2:24 PM
REPLY in Support of Motion re38 MOTION to Intervene . filed by Jessica Warens. (Copeland, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
39 39 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/18 12:13 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re38 MOTION to Intervene filed by Discount Auto Parts LLC, Advance Auto Parts, Inc.. Replies due by 4/25/2025. (Allen, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
38 38 motion Intervene Mon 04/14 4:30 PM
MOTION to Intervene by Jessica Warens.(Copeland, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Complaint of Intervention
37 37 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 04/14 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Charles Copeland on behalf of Jessica Warens. Attorney Christopher Charles Copeland added to party Jessica Warens(pty:intvp). (Copeland, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
36 36 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/26 4:52 PM
NOTICE of Scrivener's Error by Discount Auto Parts LLC, Advance Auto Parts, Inc. re35 Answer to Complaint (Allen, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
35 35 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/07 10:37 AM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Discount Auto Parts LLC, Advance Auto Parts, Inc.. (Allen, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
34 34 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 02/27 11:08 AM
ORDER denying11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/27/2025. See attached document for full details. (amb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
33 33 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 02/21 3:42 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting29 Plaintiff's Motion for Additional Pretrial Deadline. Plaintiff shall identify additional class members to Defendants by June 9, 2025. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Court's Scheduling Order27 is amended to remove the deadline for class certification motions. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (lwt)
Related: [-]
32 32 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Fri 02/21 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Marlene Quintana, Discount Auto Parts LLC, Advance Auto Parts, Inc. as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 7/22/2025 at 10:00 a.m.. (Allen, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
utility ~Util - Terminate Attorneys Thu 02/06 10:41 AM
Attorney Ena Teresa Diaz representing Defendants Discount Auto Parts LLC and Advance Auto Parts, Inc. is hereby terminated from this case. (hk02)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
31 31 notice Notice/Stipulation of Substitution of Counsel - aty Wed 02/05 1:44 PM
NOTICE/STIPULATION of Substitution of Counsel by Ranjiv Sondhi on behalf of Discount Auto Parts LLC, Advance Auto Parts, Inc. instead of prior counsel of record Ena T. Diaz. . Attorney Ranjiv Sondhi added to party Discount Auto Parts LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Ranjiv Sondhi added to party Advance Auto Parts, Inc.(pty:dft). (Sondhi, Ranjiv)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 02/05 1:39 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Stephan Allen on behalf of Discount Auto Parts LLC, Advance Auto Parts, Inc.. Attorney Scott Stephan Allen added to party Discount Auto Parts LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Scott Stephan Allen added to party Advance Auto Parts, Inc.(pty:dft). (Allen, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
29 29 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 01/31 2:03 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Additional Deadline by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Cummings, Toussaint)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
28 28 2 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 01/24 3:26 PM
ORDER SETTING ZOOM DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE. (Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters set for 7/2/2025 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart.), (joint Discovery Status Report due by 6/25/2025.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 1/24/2025. See attached document for full details. (jas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
27 27 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Fri 01/24 11:31 AM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, ANDTRIAL DATE, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MEDIATION: (Fact Discovery due by 8/1/2025., Expert Discovery due by 8/1/2025. Jury Trial set for 12/1/2025 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 11/26/2025 10:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 10/15/2025 10:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), REFERRING CASE to Mediation. (Mediation Deadline 10/1/2025.). Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/23/2025. See attached document for full details. (jas)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Thu 01/23 4:59 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by EEOC (Cummings, Toussaint)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
25 25 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Tue 01/14 9:55 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the address and email information as submitted through attorneys PACER account for attorney Ena Teresa Diaz (nwn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
24 24 notice Notice of CHANGE OF ADDRESS, Email or Law Firm Name Thu 01/09 2:57 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information; Change of Email; Change of Law Firm Name; by Ena Teresa Diaz (Diaz, Ena)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 01/09 11:42 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying22 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. If the Court concludes that a sur-reply is necessary, the Court will order a sur-reply. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/9/2025. (lwt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
22 22 motion Leave to File Document Wed 01/08 7:33 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by EEOC. (Cummings, Toussaint)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Terminate Attorneys Wed 01/08 10:20 AM
Attorney Jenna Rinehart Rassif representing Discount Auto Parts LLC (Defendant) and Advance Auto Parts, Inc. (Defendant) is hereby terminated based on the stipulated substitution of counsel. (hk02)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
21 21 notice Notice/Stipulation of Substitution of Counsel - aty Tue 01/07 5:24 PM
NOTICE/STIPULATION of Substitution of Counsel by Ena Teresa Diaz on behalf of Advance Auto Parts, Inc., Discount Auto Parts LLC instead of prior counsel of record Jenna Rinehart Rassif. . Attorney Ena Teresa Diaz added to party Advance Auto Parts, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ena Teresa Diaz added to party Discount Auto Parts LLC(pty:dft). (Diaz, Ena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, January 06, 2025
20 20 respm Reply in Support of Motion Mon 01/06 4:17 PM
Defendant's REPLY in Support of Motion re11 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint (Partial) . filed by Advance Auto Parts, Inc., Discount Auto Parts LLC. (Rassif, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings Thu 12/26 1:45 PM
Reset Deadlines as to11 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint (Partial) . Per DE#19. Replies due by 1/6/2025. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
19 19 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 12/23 3:53 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting18 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file a reply by January 6, 2025. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (lwt)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 12/23 11:45 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to11 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint (Partial) by Advance Auto Parts, Inc., Discount Auto Parts LLC.(Rassif, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 12/23 10:53 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint (Partial) filed by EEOC. Replies due by 12/30/2024. (Cummings, Toussaint)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
16 16 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 12/18 11:37 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting15 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report. The Parties shall file a Joint Scheduling Report by January 23, 2025. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (lwt)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Extension of Time Wed 12/18 9:05 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file Joint Scheduling Report by EEOC. Responses due by 1/2/2025.(Cummings, Toussaint)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 12/18 3:03 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Joint Scheduling Report due by 1/23/2025. Per DE 16 Order. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
14 14 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/10 3:39 PM
Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Discount Auto Parts LLC identifying Corporate Parent Advance Auto Parts, Inc., Corporate Parent Advance Stores Company, Incorporated, Corporate Parent Blackrock, Inc., Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Discount Auto Parts LLC (Rassif, Jenna)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/10 3:29 PM
Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Advance Auto Parts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Blackrock, Inc., Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Advance Auto Parts, Inc. (Rassif, Jenna)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/10 10:35 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Richard J. Mrizek. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 12/10/2024. (hk02)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
11 11 motion Dismiss Mon 12/09 4:35 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint (Partial) by Advance Auto Parts, Inc., Discount Auto Parts LLC. Responses due by 12/23/2024.(Rassif, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Warens' Charge of Discrimination
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Mon 12/09 3:24 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Richard J. Mrizek. Filing Fee $ 250.00 Receipt # CFLSDC-18038146 by Advance Auto Parts, Inc., Discount Auto Parts LLC. Attorney Jenna Rinehart Rassif added to party Advance Auto Parts, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jenna Rinehart Rassif added to party Discount Auto Parts LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 12/23/2024.(Rassif, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Richard J. Mrizek,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order granting motion
Monday, December 02, 2024
9 9 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Mon 12/02 11:14 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by EEOC. Advance Auto Parts, Inc. served on 11/22/2024, response/answer due 12/13/2024. (Cummings, Toussaint)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/02 8:56 AM
Second NOTICE of Filing Service Status Report by EEOC (Cummings, Toussaint)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Service Spreadsheet
Friday, November 22, 2024
7 7 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Fri 11/22 9:29 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by EEOC. Discount Auto Parts LLC served on 11/18/2024, response/answer due 12/9/2024. (Cummings, Toussaint)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/30 6:04 PM
Plaintiff's NOTICE of Filing Service Status Report by EEOC (Cummings, Toussaint)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Service Spreadsheet
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
5 5 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 10/02 10:38 AM
STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 10/2/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Order of Requirements Tue 10/01 1:57 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ORDER OF COURT-MANDATED REQUIREMENTS ON SERVICE, DEFAULTS, AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTS Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/1/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 09/30 4:27 PM
Summons Issued as to Advance Auto Parts, Inc., Discount Auto Parts LLC. (pc)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 09/30 4:21 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 09/30 1:26 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by EEOC.(Cummings, Toussaint)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Summon(s)