VAUGHN v. GILL et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | David S Cercone |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01368 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 30, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 7:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
SHON GILL
|
|
Defendant
DENNIS JOHNSTON
|
|
Plaintiff
AARON VAUGHN
KW-3603 SCI BENNER TOWNSHIP 301 Institution Drive
Bellefonte, PA 16823 |
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 12, 2025 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Partial Payment of Filing Fee by AARON VAUGHN. Fee $10.30, receipt number 200013374. (rjr) |
|
Friday, March 07, 2025 | ||
24 | 24
![]() OBJECTIONS to18 Report and Recommendation (Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by AARON VAUGHN. (cel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, February 14, 2025 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Partial Payment of Filing Fee by AARON VAUGHN. Fee $9.77, receipt number 200013003. (jkn) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2025 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 02/07 11:02 AM
ORDER granting19 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to the extent Plaintiff is requesting additional time to file objections to the pending Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's objections are due by March 10, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on February 7, 2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kcb) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Fri 02/07 11:00 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice20 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel for the same reasons set forth in this Court's order at ECF No. 7 denying Plaintiff's previous motion for counsel. The Court reiterates that Local Civil Rule 10.C provides that "[a]bsent special circumstances, no motions for the appointment of counsel will be granted until after dispositive motions have been resolved." The local rule reflects the experience-based judgment of the District Court that, given the few attorneys who have expressed willingness to represent inmates pro bono, counsel should be reserved for cases pending trial. This case has not reached the applicable stage and Plaintiff has not demonstrated that special circumstances exist. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on February 7, 2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kcb) |
|
Thursday, February 06, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
![]() MOTION to Appoint Counsel by AARON VAUGHN. Motion(s) referred to Kezia O.L. Taylor. (cel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
19 | 19
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (Motion to Dismiss cannot be found on the docket.) by AARON VAUGHN. Motion(s) referred to Kezia O.L. Taylor. (cel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, January 28, 2025 | ||
18 | 18
![]() REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that13 Plaintiff's Complaint be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) and 28 USC 1915A(b)(1). Objections to R&R due by 2/11/2025. Objections to R&R for Unregistered ECF Users due by 2/14/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on January 28, 2025. (kcb) |
|
Tuesday, January 14, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Tue 01/14 1:41 PM
ORDER re15 Request for Default filed by AARON VAUGHN. Plaintiff's request to enter default against the Defendants is denied as premature because service of the Complaint has not yet occurred. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on January 14, 2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kcb) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 01/14 2:13 PM
Magistrate Judge Kezia O.L. Taylor no longer assigned to case. (rjr) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 01/14 2:14 PM
Judge David S. Cercone presiding and Magistrate Judge Kezia O.L. Taylor referred. (rjr) |
||
Monday, January 13, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Partial Payment of Filing Fee by AARON VAUGHN. Fee $10.30, receipt number 200012497. (jkn) |
|
15 | 15
![]() REQUEST by AARON VAUGHN for entry of DEFAULT against SHON GILL, DENNIS JOHNSTON. (dmh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, December 10, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Partial Payment of Filing Fee by AARON VAUGHN. Fee $14.40, receipt number 200012069. (jkn) |
|
Friday, November 08, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Partial Payment of Filing Fee by AARON VAUGHN. Fee $8.40, receipt number 200011643. (jkn) |
|
Tuesday, October 29, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Partial Payment of Filing Fee by AARON VAUGHN. Fee $15.41, receipt number 200011482. (jkn) |
|
Wednesday, October 16, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Partial Payment of Filing Fee by AARON VAUGHN. Fee $15.41, receipt number 200011328. (jkn) |
|
Tuesday, October 01, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() COMPLAINT against SHON GILL, DENNIS JOHNSTON, filed by AARON VAUGHN. (cel) |
|
9 | 9
![]() STANDING PRACTICE ORDER FOR PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on October 1, 2024. (kcb) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 10/01 11:12 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part4 Plaintiff's Motion to Obtain Service of Process Without Prepayment of the U.S. Marshal Fee. The Court is aware of the fact that Plaintiff has been granted in forma pauperis status. For this reason, if service of the complaint is ordered, the U.S. Marshal Service will serve it without prepayment of the service fees. However, the U.S. Marshal Service reserves the right to bill Plaintiff for payment of the service fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on October 1, 2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kcb) |
|
7 | 7
![]() ORDER denying without prejudice3 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on October 1, 2024. (kcb) |
|
6 | 6
![]() ORDER granting1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Within thirty days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $15.41 or risk dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order and Plaintiff's authorization form to the inmate account officer at Plaintiff's place of confinement. The Clerk of Court is also directed to docket the Complaint and any exhibits that may be attached thereto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on October 1, 2024. (kcb) |
|
Monday, September 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by AARON VAUGHN. (cel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() MOTION to Obtain Service of Process Without Prepayment of the U.S. Marshal Fee re Proposed Complaint filed with1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by AARON VAUGHN by AARON VAUGHN. (cel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() MOTION to Appoint Counsel by AARON VAUGHN. (cel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by AARON VAUGHN. (cel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by AARON VAUGHN. (cel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |