California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott C Clarkson
Case #: 8:24-bk-12474
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Nov 07, 2024

Debtor
SC Motors, LLC
609 W Orangethorpe Ave
Placentia, CA 92870-6823
Represented By
Anthony B Vigil
Law Offices Of Anthony B Vigil Apc
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Jeffrey I Golden (TR)
Golden Goodrich LLP 3070 Bristol Street, Suite 640
Costa Mesa, CA 92626
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 09/30/2024 12:07 PM PDT
Monday, September 30, 2024
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Mon 09/30 11:12 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:8:24-bk-12474] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A57434287. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 52 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Mon 09/30 11:08 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by SC Motors, LLC (Vigil, Anthony)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Mon 09/30 11:35 AM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Golden (TR), Jeffrey I with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/7/2024 at 08:00 AM via Zoom - Golden: Meeting ID 227 931 0235, Passcode 0647511609, Phone 1 657 222 4074. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]