Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Paul Baisier
Case #: 1:24-bk-60313
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2024
Dismissed:Nov 07, 2024
Terminated:Dec 03, 2024

Debtor
Eve Financial Consultant & Capital Group LLC
1628 Golden Creek Ct SW
Conyers, GA 30094-3435
Represented By
Eve Financial Consultant & Capital Group LLC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago
Friday, January 17, 2025
13 13 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Letter Re: Outstanding Filing Fee Sat 01/18 12:53 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Letter to Debtor Regarding Outstanding Filing Fee Notice Date 01/17/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
12 12 misc Letter to Debtor re: Unpaid Filing Fees Wed 01/15 6:45 AM
Letter to Debtor Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
misc 06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Dismissed Tue 12/03 10:58 AM
Case Closed (cws)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 09, 2024
11 11 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case (403) Sun 11/10 12:48 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Notice Date 11/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
10 10 order Dismiss Case, Motion to Thu 11/07 9:58 AM
Order GRANTING United States Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case. Related [+] Service by BNC. Entered on 11/7/2024. (mrw)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/15 9:07 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Lisa F. Caplan on behalf of TOM LOZZI AND KAREN RESTIVO. (Caplan, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees Fri 10/04 9:33 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees Notice Date 10/03/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Non-Individual Fri 10/04 9:33 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Non-Individual. Notice Date 10/03/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors Fri 10/04 9:33 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 10/03/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
5 5 motion 05-Motion to Dismiss Case (FOR OTHER) Tue 10/01 6:35 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Adriano Omar Iqbal on behalf of United States Trustee. Hearing to be held on 11/4/2024 at 01:20 PM in Courtroom 1202, Atlanta. (Iqbal, Adriano)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual) Tue 10/01 2:33 PM
Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual). Service by BNC. Statement of Financial Affairs due 10/15/2024. Schedule(s) A/B, D, E/F, G, H due by 10/15/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury due by 10/15/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 10/15/2024. Corporate Resolution due 10/15/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 10/15/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 10/15/2024. Tax Return Date: 10/7/2024. Balance Sheet Date: 10/7/2024.Statement of Operations Due 10/7/2024Cash Flow Statement due 10/7/2024 (cws)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Regarding Unpaid Case Filing Fees Tue 10/01 2:31 PM
Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fee in the Amount of $ 1,738.00 . Service by BNC. Entered on 10/1/2024. Related [+] (cws)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 misc 03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 11) Tue 10/01 1:55 PM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors. 341 Meeting to be held on 11/7/2024 at 09:00 AM via Telephone conference. To attend, Dial 888-902-9750 and enter participation code 9635734. (11 Atl) (cws)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
1 1 misc Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 09/30 3:24 PM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) for Non-Individual Filed by Eve Financial Consultant & Capital Group LLC . Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business) due by 3/31/2025., Disclosure Statement due by 3/31/2025. (rfs)
Related: [-]