Florida Southern District Court
Judge:David S Leibowitz
Case #: 9:24-cv-81206
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2024
Terminated:Dec 20, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 7:00 AM EDT
Defendant
Hospice By The Sea, Inc.
Represented By
Mark Fereg
Gunster, Yoakley & Stewart, P.A.
contact info
Joseph Gregory Santoro
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Plaintiff
Cedric E. Hill
Daniel H. Hunt, Esq. P.O. Box 565096
Miami, FL 33256
Represented By
Daniel H. Hunt
Daniel H. Hunt, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, December 20, 2024
11 11 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 12/23 8:25 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Closing Case. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 12/20/2024. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
10 10 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 11/12 6:02 PM
Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re8 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint] filed by Hospice By The Sea, Inc.. (Fereg, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
9 9 respm Response to Motion Tue 11/05 9:37 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re8 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint] filed by Cedric E. Hill. Replies due by 11/12/2024. (Hunt, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
8 8 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 10/21 5:24 PM
Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint] by Hospice By The Sea, Inc.. Responses due by 11/4/2024.(Fereg, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/16 3:13 PM
Defendant's NOTICE of Filing of Docket Sheet and All Records in State Court Proceeding by Hospice By The Sea, Inc. re3 Status Report Order (Fereg, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 502024CA006537XXXA MB Docket,
Att: 2 Exhibit DE 2 2024-07-15 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit DE 3 2024-07-15 Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit DE 4 2024-07-15 Summons to be corrected,
Att: 5 Exhibit DE 5 2024-07-15 Receipt $411.00,
Att: 6 Exhibit DE 6 2024-07-16 DCM Designation to the General Track with Jury Trial Order,
Att: 7 Exhibit DE 7 2024-07-15 Issued Summons,
Att: 8 Exhibit DE 8 2024-07-16 Receipt $10.00,
Att: 9 Exhibit DE 9 2024-07-30 Notice of Appearance Mark Fereg,
Att: 10 Exhibit DE 10 2024-07-30 Notice of Appearance of Joseph G. Santoro,
Att: 11 Exhibit DE 11 2024-08-19 Return of Service upon Hospice By The Sea,
Att: 12 Exhibit DE 12 2024-08-28 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 13 Exhibit DE 13 2024-09-10 First Amended Complaint,
Att: 14 Exhibit DE 14 2024-09-24 Order Granting Agreed Order Extending Time for Defendant to Respond,
Att: 15 Exhibit DE 15 2024-09-30 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal
6 6 misc Status Report Wed 10/16 2:58 PM
STATUS REPORT [Removal Status Report] by Hospice By The Sea, Inc. (Fereg, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 10/04 10:37 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Hospice By The Sea, Inc.. Response/Answer due 10/21/2024. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 10/3/2024. See attached document for full details. (dsf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 10/03 5:13 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), to the Amended Complaint by Hospice By The Sea, Inc..(Fereg, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Defendant's Unopposed Motionfor Extension of Time to File A Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
3 3 order Status Report Order Wed 10/02 1:22 PM
ORDER Removal Status Report due by 10/16/2024. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 10/1/2024. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 10/01 7:40 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge David S. Leibowitz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cds)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Mon 09/30 4:52 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - First Amended Complaint) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17873992, filed by Hospice By The Sea, Inc..(Fereg, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - First Amended Complaint