Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Kelley Brisbon Hodge
Case #: 2:24-cv-05240
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 5:50 AM EDT
Defendant
NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC
Represented By
PATRICK K. GIBSON
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford P.C.
contact info
Abbey Jane Luffey
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
OTR CAPITAL, LLC
Represented By
TIMOTHY L. FREY
Cohen & Frey P.C.
contact info
JEFFREY D. COHEN
Cohen & Frey P.C.
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
ELITE TRANSIT SOLUTIONS, LLC
ThirdParty Plaintiff
NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC
Represented By
PATRICK K. GIBSON
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford P.C.
contact info
Abbey Jane Luffey
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 05/14 12:53 PM
ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 6/23/2025 11:00 AM Via Video Conference BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 5/14/25. 5/14/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
23 23 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Tue 05/13 5:23 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ELITE TRANSIT SOLUTIONS, LLC.(Grieco, F. Timothy)
Related: [-]
22 22 answer Answer to Third Party Complaint Tue 05/13 5:20 PM
ANSWER to13 Third Party Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by ELITE TRANSIT SOLUTIONS, LLC.(Grieco, F. Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Service Mon 03/17 9:26 AM
ORDER DENYING AS MOOT15 MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 18, 2025, IS CANCELLED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 3/14/25. 3/17/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 03/14 4:33 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC. ELITE TRANSIT SOLUTIONS, LLC waiver sent on 3/14/2025, answer due 5/13/2025. (Luffey, Abbey)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
19 19 misc Letter Mon 03/10 4:56 PM
Letter dated March 10, 2025 by NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC.(Luffey, Abbey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Affidavit
18 18 service Affidavit of Service Mon 03/10 4:52 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by GUARENTEED SUBPOENA SERVICE, INC re: served LETTER, SUMMONS, THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT, AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE upon ELITE TRANSIT SOLUTIONS LLC C/O MICHAEL JOHNSON on 02 18-2025 (Luffey, Abbey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 03/06 3:20 PM
ORDER THAT A STATUS CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 3/18/2025 10:00 AM Via Video Conference BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 3/6/25. 3/6/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/28 2:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Abbey Jane Luffey on behalf of NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC (Luffey, Abbey)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
15 15 motion Service Fri 02/21 5:01 PM
MOTION for Service Alternative Service filed by NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC.Brief, Affidavit, Certificate of Service.(GIBSON, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Affidavit in Support of Motion with Exhibits
Monday, November 25, 2024
14 14 service Summons Issued Mon 11/25 11:24 AM
Summons Issued on Third-Party Complaint as to ELITE TRANSIT SOLUTIONS, LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 11/25/24 (bw)
Related: [-]
13 13 cmp Third Party Complaint Mon 11/25 9:38 AM
THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against ELITE TRANSIT SOLUTIONS, LLC, filed by NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC.(GIBSON, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons On A Third-Party Complaint,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, November 15, 2024
12 12 discov Disclosure of Citizenship Fri 11/15 12:29 PM
Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC . (GIBSON, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
11 11 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Fri 11/15 12:26 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC.(GIBSON, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/15 12:22 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC.(GIBSON, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 11/12 10:41 AM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT, NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC, SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION UNTIL 11/15/2024 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 11/12/24. 11/12/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
8 8 misc Stipulation Fri 11/08 2:06 PM
STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT by NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC. (GIBSON, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 10/25 3:14 PM
ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT, NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC, SHALL HAVE UNTIL 11/8/2024 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 10/25/24. 10/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
6 6 misc Stipulation Wed 10/23 1:11 PM
STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT by NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC. (GIBSON, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/18 3:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK K. GIBSON on behalf of NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC (GIBSON, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order Thu 10/03 2:19 PM
ORDER THAT SEVEN (7) DAYS PRIOR TO ANY MOTION BEING FILED (INCLUDING A MOTION UNDERFED.R.CIV.P. 12 OR 56, 28 U.S.C. § 1441, OR 28 U.S.C. § 1404), COUNSEL MUST NOTIFYOPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE POTENTIAL MOTION, AND THE POSSIBLERESOLUTION OF SAME. THESE DISCUSSIONS SHALL BE SUBSTANTIVE AND NOT PERFUNCTORY. TOTHIS END, COUNSEL SHALL PROVIDE THE OPPOSING PARTY WITH AN OPPORTUNITY TO CURE ANYALLEGED DEFECTS PRIOR TO FILING A MOTION; IN THE EVENT THE PARTIES ARE UNABLE TO PRELIMINARILY NEGATE THE NEED FOR THE FILING OF A MOTION AFTER ENGAGING IN SUBSTANTIVE DISCUSSIONS, THE MOVING PARTY SHALL SO SPECIFY IN A CERTIFICATION ATTACHED AND FILED WITH THE MOTION. SAID CERTIFICATION SHALLINDICATE THE DATE(S) OF DISCUSSION(S) AND SHALL INFORM THE COURT OF THE PARTIESINABILITY TO REACH A RESOLUTION; FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER SHALL RESULT IN DENIAL OF THE MOTION WITHOUT FURTHERNOTICE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 10/3/24. 10/3/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 10/01 8:56 AM
Summons Issued as to NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 10/1/24 (bw)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
2 2 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Mon 09/30 4:32 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by OTR CAPITAL, LLC.(FREY, TIMOTHY)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Mon 09/30 4:27 PM
COMPLAINT against NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17778805.), filed by OTR CAPITAL, LLC.(COHEN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form