Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Christopher C Conner
Case #: 1:24-cv-01666
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1391 Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2024
Terminated:Oct 10, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 6:06 AM EDT
Defendant
Andres Alcala
Defendant
Trius Trucking, Inc.
Plaintiff
Andrew Johnson II
Represented By
Kane Daly
Simon & Simon
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, October 10, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order Transferring Case Thu 10/10 9:12 AM
ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall TRANSFER the above-captioned matter to the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. The Clerk of Court shall thereafter CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/10/2024. (mw)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Thu 10/10 9:13 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case electronically transferred to the Western District of Pennsylvania on today's date. (mw)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Thu 10/10 10:37 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case transferred from Pennsylvania Middle has been opened in Western District of Pennsylvania as case 3:24-cv-00239, filed 10/10/2024 (ll)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order Tue 10/01 8:15 AM
ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before Tuesday, October 8, 2024, the parties shall SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be transferred to the Western District of Pennsylvania pursuant to Section 1404(a). Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/1/2024. (mw)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 09/30 3:07 PM
Summons Issued as to Andres Alcala, Trius Trucking, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (rw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/30 3:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Andres Alcala, Trius Trucking, Inc. ( Filing fee $405, Receipt Number APAMDC-6771750), filed by Andrew Johnson II.(rw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet