Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Case #: 2:24-cv-01563
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2024
Case in other court:King County Superior Court, 24-00002-19599-8-SEA
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 4:35 AM PDT
Defendant
First American Title Insurance Company
Represented By
Scott E Gizer
Early Sullivan Wright Gizer & Mcrae LLP
contact info
Jessica Detering
Early Sullivan Wright Gizer & Mcrae LLP
contact info
Teruyuki S Olsen
Oseran Hahn P.S.
contact info
Chris Ritter
Early Sullivan Wright Gizer & Mcrae LLP
contact info
Jeffery Connor Rankin
Oseran Hahn P.S.
contact info
Plaintiff
Bel-Red Partners LLC
Represented By
Bradley P Thoreson
Buchalter Pc (sea)
contact info
Adam Charles Doupe
Buchalter Pc (sea)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
40 40 order KKE Order Re Chambers Procedures CV (FORM) Tue 05/06 11:08 AM
ORDER REGARDING CHAMBERS PROCEDURES IN CIVIL CASES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
39 39 respm Declaration Thu 05/01 6:27 PM
DECLARATION of Adam C. Doupe filed by Plaintiff Bel-Red Partners LLC re37 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Thoreson, Bradley)
Related: [-]
38 38 respm Declaration Thu 05/01 6:24 PM
DECLARATION of Jeffrey M. Richey filed by Plaintiff Bel-Red Partners LLC re37 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Thoreson, Bradley)
Related: [-]
37 37 motion Partial Summary Judgment Thu 05/01 6:22 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , filed by Plaintiff Bel-Red Partners LLC. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 5/29/2025, (Thoreson, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, April 28, 2025
36 36 4 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/28 4:49 PM
ORDER granting Parties'35 Joint Stipulated Motion to Modify Court's Scheduling Order and Reset Trial Date. Bench Trial is set for 5/11/2026 at 09:30 AM before District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/30/2025, Supplemental Disclosure of Expert Testimony Under FRCP 26(a)(2)(D)(ii) due 10/30/2025, Discovery Motions due by 10/30/2025, Discovery completed by 11/28/2025, Dispositive motions due by 12/29/2025, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 2/27/2026, Pretrial Order due by 4/6/2026, Trial briefs, joint briefs on motions in limine, preliminary proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law, and deposition designations due 4/13/2026. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
35 35 motion Stipulated Motion Thu 04/24 11:47 AM
Joint Stipulated MOTION To Modify Court's Scheduling Order and Reset Trial Date , filed by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. Noting Date 4/24/2025, (Olsen, Teruyuki)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
34 34 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 03/25 12:04 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company, TO RESPONSE to28 MOTION to Dismiss (Olsen, Teruyuki)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
33 33 respm Response to Motion Tue 03/18 3:21 PM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Bel-Red Partners LLC, to28 MOTION to Dismiss .(Doupe, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
32 32 order Protective Order Wed 03/12 4:53 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
31 31 motion Stipulated Motion Thu 03/06 1:26 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Plaintiff Bel-Red Partners LLC. Noting Date 3/6/2025, (Doupe, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Redline of Model PO and Proposed PO
Friday, February 28, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion Fri 02/28 1:54 PM
ORDER denying Parties'29 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order. The parties' motion (Dkt. No.29 ) is DENIED without prejudice, subject to re-filing in compliance with Local Civil Rule 26(c)(2). Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
29 29 motion Stipulated Motion Thu 02/27 3:17 PM
Stipulated MOTION Protective Order , filed by Plaintiff Bel-Red Partners LLC. Noting Date 2/27/2025, (Doupe, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion Noting Date (Public) Wed 02/26 12:49 PM
Noting Date Set/Reset re28 MOTION to Dismiss: Noted for 3/25/2025, per LCR 7(d)(4). (KRA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
28 28 motion Dismiss Tue 02/25 3:33 PM
MOTION to Dismiss , filed by All Defendants. Noting Date 2/26/2025, (Olsen, Teruyuki)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
27 27 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 02/11 1:37 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages and Declaratory Relief against defendant(s) First American Title Insurance Company filed by Bel-Red Partners LLC.(Doupe, Adam)
Related: [-]
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/11 10:10 AM
ORDER. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend its complaint (Dkt. No.22 ). Plaintiff shall FILE the proposed amended complaint within 14 days of this order. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
25 25 respm Response to Motion Fri 01/31 4:03 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company, to22 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint . (Gizer, Scott)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Unavailability Fri 01/31 12:52 PM
NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Teruyuki S Olsen for All Defendants from 02/12, 02/13, 02/14,2/17, 04/12, 04/14,04/15, 04/16,04/17,04/18,04/21,04/22. (Olsen, Teruyuki)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
23 23 respm Declaration Fri 01/17 3:53 PM
DECLARATION of Adam C. Doupe filed by Plaintiff Bel-Red Partners LLC re22 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Doupe, Adam)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Leave to File Document Fri 01/17 3:52 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint , filed by Plaintiff Bel-Red Partners LLC. Noting Date 2/7/2025, (Doupe, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, November 22, 2024
21 21 order KKE Order Setting and Amending Trial Date and Related Dates (FORM) Fri 11/22 9:57 AM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. Length of Trial: *7-10 days*. Bench Trial is set for 1/26/2026 at 09:30 AM before District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. Joinder of Parties due by 12/20/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 1/17/2025, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 6/30/2025, Discovery Motions due by 7/30/2025, Discovery completed by 8/29/2025, Dispositive motions due by 9/29/2025, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 11/28/2025, Pretrial Order due by 1/5/2026, Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/12/2026, Motions in Limine due by 1/12/2026, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 1/12/2026, Deposition Designations due by 1/12/2026. (DS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
20 20 misc Joint Status Report Wed 11/20 5:05 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 7-10. Filed by Plaintiff Bel-Red Partners LLC.(Doupe, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/21 2:12 PM
ANSWER to Complaint; by First American Title Insurance Company.(Gizer, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
18 18 misc Verification of State Court Records Mon 10/14 2:03 PM
VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by All Defendants (Olsen, Teruyuki)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc State Court Record Mon 10/14 12:25 PM
STATE COURT RECORD filed by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (Olsen, Teruyuki)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
16 16 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Wed 10/09 12:53 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/30/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/13/2024, Joint Status Report due by 11/20/2024. (DS)
Related: [-]
15 15 order KKE Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Wed 10/09 12:52 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion Wed 10/09 9:46 AM
ORDER granting Parties'13 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. Defendant shall file an Answer to the Complaint by 10/21/2024. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (SB)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
13 13 motion Stipulated Motion Mon 10/07 2:09 PM
Stipulated MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT , filed by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. Noting Date 10/7/2024, (Olsen, Teruyuki)
Related: [-]
12 12 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 10/07 12:18 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate GranCorp Holdings, L.L.C., Other Affiliate Sound Investment Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate Medina Legacy Holdings, LLC for Bel-Red Partners LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Bel-Red Partners LLC. (Doupe, Adam)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/07 9:55 AM
ORDER re8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Scott E Gizer for Defendant First American Title Insurance Company, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (CDA)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
10 10 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/04 8:52 AM
ORDER re7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Chris Ritter for Defendant First American Title Insurance Company, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (CDA)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/04 8:51 AM
ORDER re6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jessica Detering for Defendant First American Title Insurance Company, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (CDA)
Related: [-]
utility Notice to PHV and Local Counsel Unable to Process Application Fri 10/04 8:54 AM
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice8 by attorney Scott Gizer will not be processed at this time. The Pro Hac attorney must submit a Pro Hac Vice access request via[LINK:Manage My Account] on PACER, under the Maintenance tab. See page 2 of the[LINK:Pro Hac Vice Application Guide] for detailed instructions. Please contact Admissions Clerk Monique Guillebeau at 206-370-8433 or[LINK:WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov] with additional questions. (Ad hoc Attorney Scott Gizer) (CDA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
8 8 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/03 10:20 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Scott Gizer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant First American Title Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8657246 (Olsen, Teruyuki)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/03 10:18 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christopher Ritter FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant First American Title Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8657239 (Olsen, Teruyuki)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/03 10:16 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jessica Detering FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant First American Title Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8657224 (Olsen, Teruyuki)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
5 5 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Wed 10/02 12:02 PM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (AVC)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Wed 10/02 10:38 AM
Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Notice of Removal - Certificate of Service Not Provided:. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (AVC) Modified on 10/2/2024 stricken docketed in error (AVC)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 10/02 11:52 AM
District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson added. (AVC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
3 3 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 10/01 12:28 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent First American Financial Corporation for First American Title Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by First American Title Insurance Company. (Olsen, Teruyuki)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
2 2 misc Declaration (non motion) Mon 09/30 2:13 PM
DECLARATION of Daryl Lyman re1 Notice of Removal, by Plaintiff First American Title Insurance Company (Olsen, Teruyuki)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 09/30 2:10 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 24 2-19599 8 SEA; Related [+] filed by First American Title Insurance Company.(Olsen, Teruyuki)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8650690
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Complaint State Court Complaint