Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Lance M Africk
Referred: Michael North
Case #: 2:24-cv-02372
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:2401 Federal Tort Claims Act
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 6:12 AM CDT
Defendant
Stewart Harman, III
Represented By
Brock Darren Dupre
U. S. Attorney'S Office (new Orleans)
contact info
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Brock Darren Dupre
U. S. Attorney'S Office (new Orleans)
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronald Evans
Represented By
John Benjamin Avin
Irpino, Avin & Hawkins (new Orleans)
contact info
Anthony D. Irpino
Irpino, Avin & Hawkins (new Orleans)
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 04/22 4:45 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Party Stewart Harman, III dismissed. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 04/22/2025. (ko)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
16 16 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/15 12:03 PM
ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 5/22/2025 09:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Counsel shall comply as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 4/15/2025.(meb)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Scheduling Order Tue 04/15 10:19 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 5/22/2025 09:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. All discovery must be completed by 8/8/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Bench Trial set for 10/27/2025 08:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. (NEF: Magistrate Judge North)(blg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice Form
Monday, April 14, 2025
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/14 3:53 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by United States of America.(Dupre, Brock)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 04/14 3:52 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Stewart Harman, III, United States of America. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/7/2025.(Dupre, Brock)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Notice of Submission
Thursday, April 03, 2025
12 12 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 04/03 3:14 PM
NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/15/2025 09:45 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(gla)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 03/24 1:01 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, as to United States of America answer due 4/14/2025. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 3/24/2025. (gla)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
10 10 motion Extension of Time to Answer Fri 03/21 3:12 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, by Stewart Harman, III, United States of America.Attorney Brock Darren Dupre added to party Stewart Harman, III(pty:dft), Attorney Brock Darren Dupre added to party United States of America(pty:dft).(Dupre, Brock)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
9 9 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Wed 02/12 3:57 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re8 Summons Returned Executed: Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Agency of USA. Clerk took corrective action to modify the event and correct answer due date. United States of America served on 1/23/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. (ko)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/12 2:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; United States of America served on 1/23/2025, answer due 3/24/2025.(Avin, John) Modified on 2/12/2025 (ko)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Returned Green Card
Monday, January 27, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order Terminate Hearings Mon 01/27 2:50 PM
ORDER: Call Docket for 1/28/25 - Passed for 30 days; on or before, 2/27/2025, plaintiffs counsel shall file into the record the return of proper legal service on the defendants Stewart Harman, III and the United States of America d/b/a U.S. Army Corps of Engineers. Failure to comply shall result in dismissal of the defendants. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/27/2025.(blg) Modified on 1/27/2025 - edit text (blg)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 01/13 11:05 AM
Summons Issued as to Stewart Harman, III, United States of America.(ko)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
Friday, January 10, 2025
5 5 service Request for Summons Issued Fri 01/10 11:59 AM
Request of Summons Issued as to Stewart Harman, III, United States of America filed by Ronald Evans re1 Complaint,.(Avin, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Summons Request #2,
Att: 2 Summons Summons Request #3
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 01/08 4:14 PM
ORDER: Docket Call set for 1/28/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 01/08/2025.(ko)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 10/01 10:04 AM
Summons Issued as to Stewart Harman, III, United States of America. (gla)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Mon 09/30 4:48 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (car)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/30 4:34 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10712484) filed by RONALD EVANS.Attorney John Benjamin Avin added to party RONALD EVANS(pty:pla).(Avin, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons