New York Western District Court
Judge:John L Sinatra, Jr
Case #: 1:24-cv-00940
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2024
Terminated:Jan 16, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 5:41 AM EDT
Defendant
Forster & Garbus, LLP
Defendant
LVNV Funding LLC
Plaintiff
William Eskridge
Represented By
Seth Andrews
The Andrews Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, January 16, 2025
8 8 order Text Order Thu 01/16 3:26 PM
TEXT ORDER acknowledging7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. This action is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 1/16/2025. (KLH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 01/15 11:37 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by William Eskridge (Andrews, Seth)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
6 6 order Text Order Fri 01/03 5:07 PM
TEXT ORDER acknowledging the5 Notice of Settlement. Plaintiff shall notify the Court of dismissal or, alternatively, file a status report providing an update on settlement, by 3/3/2025. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 1/3/2025. (KLH)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 01/03 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by William Eskridge (Andrews, Seth)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 11/22 12:10 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Eskridge. LVNV Funding LLC waiver sent on 11/4/2024, answer due 1/3/2025. (Andrews, Seth)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 10/14 11:52 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Eskridge. Forster & Garbus, LLP waiver sent on 10/14/2024, answer due 12/13/2024. (Andrews, Seth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
utility Remark Tue 10/08 11:09 AM
ATTENTION ALL PLAINTIFFS OR INTERVENORS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1 and/or General Order No. 157. In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Disclosure Statements are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 10/01 3:13 PM
Summons Issued as to Forster & Garbus, LLP, LVNV Funding LLC. (TMK)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 10/01 3:04 PM
Case Assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
Related: [-]
adr Automatic Referral to Mediation Tue 10/01 3:08 PM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's[LINK:ADR webpage] and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at[LINK:adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov] . Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the [LINK:ADR Plan] and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan. (TMK)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Tue 10/01 3:09 PM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (TMK)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/30 9:40 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 405 receipt number ANYWDC-5294215, filed by William Eskridge.(Andrews, Seth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet