Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Thomas P Barber
Referred: Christopher P Tuite
Case #: 8:24-cv-02291
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2024
Terminated:Mar 14, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 5:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Institute of Vitality LLC
Represented By
Cristina Valencia Sawyer
Becker & Poliakoff, P.A.
contact info
Kevin Markow
Becker & Poliakoff, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Novo Nordisk A/S
Represented By
Jordan Scott Cohen
Wicker, Smith, O'Hara, Mccoy & Ford, P.A.
contact info
Michelle Alexa Juarez
Wicker Smith
contact info
Plaintiff
Novo Nordisk Inc.
Represented By
Jordan Scott Cohen
Wicker, Smith, O'Hara, Mccoy & Ford, P.A.
contact info
Michelle Alexa Juarez
Wicker Smith
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 17, 2025
23 23 misc Patent/Trademark Report Mon 03/17 10:39 AM
Trademark Report electronically sent to the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (JK)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 03/17 10:38 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
21 21 order Order Dismissing Case Fri 03/14 3:47 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines, and thereafter close this case. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 3/14/2025. (ANL)
Related: [-]
20 20 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 03/14 3:46 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 3/14/2025. (ANL)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 03/14 12:08 PM
JOINT MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Entry on Final Judgment by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc.(Juarez, Michelle) Modified on 3/14/2025 to edit text (ELA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction on Consent
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 03/12 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kevin Markow on behalf of Institute of Vitality LLC. Lead Counsel: Kevin Markow. (Markow, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
17 17 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 03/11 12:23 PM
NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/10 6:43 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Institute of Vitality LLC.(Valencia Sawyer, Cristina)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 01/10 11:30 AM
NOTICE of hearing: Initial Case Management Conference set for MARCH 26, 2025, at 09:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 A before Judge Thomas P. Barber. Parties are advised that should they consent to have this entire case heard by the assigned Magistrate Judge, this hearing will be cancelled, and parties will proceed as directed by the Magistrate Judge. Parties wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge shall file the attached form on or before the date of this hearing. (SRC)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 01/10 10:15 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: "Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint" (Doc. 13 ) is granted to the extent that Defendant's deadline to respond is extended to and includes March 10, 2025. If this case does not settle as a result of the parties' settlement negotiations, the parties are directed to file a case management report on or before March 14, 2025. This case will also be set for an in-person case management conference on March 26, 2025. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 1/10/2025. (ANL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Thu 01/09 5:58 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, 12 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, by Institute of Vitality LLC. (Markow, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 12/11 10:02 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: "Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint" (Doc. 11 is granted. Defendant may file its response to the complaint on or before January 10, 2025. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 12/11/2024. (ANL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Tue 12/10 5:23 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Institute of Vitality LLC. (Markow, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
10 10 service Summons returned executed Wed 10/23 12:51 PM
RETURN of service executed on 10/21/24 by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc. as to Institute of Vitality LLC. (Cohen, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
9 9 service Summons issued Tue 10/15 3:17 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Institute of Vitality LLC. (KME)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Thu 10/10 9:59 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Novo Nordisk A/S. (Juarez, Michelle)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Thu 10/10 9:59 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Novo Nordisk Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Novo Nordisk US Commercial Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Novo Nordisk US Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Novo Nordisk A/S ("NNAS") for Novo Nordisk Inc... (Juarez, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
6 6 service Proposed summons Wed 10/09 4:10 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc.. (Cohen, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 10/07 2:12 PM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 10/07 2:11 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to file promptly a Notice of a Related Action identifying and describing any related action either pending or closed in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
3 3 misc Patent/Trademark Report Wed 10/02 3:49 PM
Trademark Report electronically sent to the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (MGB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 10/01 1:57 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:24-cv-2291-TPB-CPT. (TNP)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 09/30 5:18 PM
COMPLAINT against Institute of Vitality LLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22570884) filed by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc..(Cohen, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet