Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:24-cv-00468
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2024
Terminated:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 5:22 AM EDT
Defendant
MERBELLA MED SPA LLC
Represented By
MATTHEW JOSEPH MODAFFERI
Frier Levitt Llc - New York Ny
contact info
Plaintiff
NOVO NORDISK A/S
Represented By
JORDAN SCOTT COHEN
Wicker Smith - Fort Lauderdale Fl
contact info
MICHELLE ALEXA JUAREZ
Wicker Smith - Fort Lauderdale Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
NOVO NORDISK INC
Represented By
JORDAN SCOTT COHEN
Wicker Smith - Fort Lauderdale Fl
contact info
MICHELLE ALEXA JUAREZ
Wicker Smith - Fort Lauderdale Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
23 23 order Judgment - Signed by Judge Tue 04/01 4:54 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION ON CONSENT. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 04/01/25. (jfj)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 03/17 9:21 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:22 Joint MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction and Notice of Settlement by NOVO NORDISK INC, NOVO NORDISK A/S.. (mb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
3 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re1 Complaint. The clerk will issue summons upon submission. You may obtain the 2 page summons form by visiting our website @ www.flnd.uscourts.gov. Click on Forms & Publications; national court forms; AO 440 Summons in a Civil Action (mb)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs AO 120 Patent and Trademark New Case Notification. Copy sent electronically to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mb)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
1 1 20 pgs COMPLAINT against Merbella Med Spa LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-9074250.), filed by NOVO NORDISK INC, NOVO NORDISK A/S. (COHEN, JORDAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet