Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:24-bk-02024

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Lori V Vaughan
Case #: 6:24-ap-00113
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
The Kidwell Group LLC
P.O. Box 162261
Altamonte Springs, FL 32716
Represented By
The Kidwell Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Insured Advocacy Group, LLC
Husch Blackwell LLP 1900 N. Pearl Street, Suite 1800
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Buffey E Klein
Husch Blackwell
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Saturday, April 05, 2025
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (AP) Sun 04/06 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 04/05/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #15 )
Thursday, April 03, 2025
15 15 court Notice Canceling and/or Rescheduling (AP) Thu 04/03 12:45 PM
Notice Rescheduling Hearing to coincide with the status conference in the main case . Hearing scheduled for 6/3/2025 at 03:15 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6C, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . (Aimee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
14 14 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Tue 04/01 1:34 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Lynn Butler: Plaintiff; William Porter: Defendant RULING: 1) Pretrial Conference - Continued to 6/3/2025 at 10:15am (AOCNFNG) 2) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Adversary (Doc #11) - Response (Doc #12) - Continued to 6/3/2025 at 10:15am (AOCNFNG) (aj) Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
13 13 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Tue 03/04 11:35 AM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Lynn Butler: Plaintiff; Justin Luna: Defendant RULING: 1) Pretrial Conference - Continued to 4/1/2025 at 10: 15am (AOCNFNG) 2) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Adversary (Doc #11) - Response (Doc #12) - Continued to 4/1/2025 at 10: 15am (AOCNFNG) (aj) Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
12 12 answer Response Thu 02/20 6:04 PM
Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Adversary Complaint Filed by Buffey E Klein on behalf of Plaintiff Insured Advocacy Group, LLC Related [+]. (Klein, Buffey)
Related: [-] 11
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
court Tue 02/11 4:13 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 03/04/2025 10:15 AM Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6C, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Re: Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Doc11 . This entry will serve as the official notification of hearing from the court. Related [+]. (Bill)
Related: [-] 11
Thursday, February 06, 2025
11 11 motion Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 02/06 3:24 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Justin M Luna on behalf of Defendant The Kidwell Group LLC Related [+]. (Luna, Justin)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, January 27, 2025
10 10 misc Proof of Service (AP) Mon 01/27 11:19 AM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to February 6, 2025, for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Filed by Justin M Luna on behalf of Defendant The Kidwell Group LLC Related [+]. (Luna, Justin)
Related: [-] 9
Friday, January 17, 2025
9 9 order Extend Time Fri 01/17 9:16 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to February 6, 2025, for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+]. Service Instructions: Justin Luna is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Nadia)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
8 8 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Tue 01/07 11:11 AM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Lynn Butler: Insured Advocacy Group; Justin Luna: Kidwell Group RULING: 1) Pretrial Conference - Continued to 3/4/2025 at 10:15am (AOCNFNG) (aj) Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Motion to Extend Time (AP) Tue 01/07 9:09 AM
Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Filed by Justin M Luna on behalf of Defendant The Kidwell Group LLC. (Luna, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Sat 10/05 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Related [+]. Notice Date 10/04/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #2 )
Thursday, October 03, 2024
5 5 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Thu 10/03 11:04 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Buffey E Klein on behalf of Plaintiff Insured Advocacy Group, LLC Related [+]. (Klein, Buffey)
Related: [-] 2
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed Thu 10/03 7:13 AM
Service Executed on The Kidwell Group LLC of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Buffey E Klein on behalf of Plaintiff Insured Advocacy Group, LLC Related [+]. (Klein, Buffey)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
3 3 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Wed 10/02 2:57 PM
Summons issued along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 11/01/2024. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A Pretrial/Status Conference will be held on January 7, 2025, at 10:15 AM. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Notice of Deficient Filing (AP) Wed 10/02 2:24 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Statement of Corporate Ownership. Compliance required no later than 10/21/2024. (Lisa P.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Mon 09/30 9:06 PM
Complaint by Insured Advocacy Group, LLC against The Kidwell Group LLC. (Fee Paid.) Nature of Suit: [68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)],[21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)]. (Klein, Buffey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet