California Southern District Court
Judge:Todd W Robinson
Referred: Daniel E Butcher
Case #: 3:24-cv-01746
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause28:1338pt Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2024
Terminated:Jan 08, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 3:51 AM PDT
Defendant
CannVerify LLC
Plaintiff
LooseLeaf International LLC
Represented By
Christopher Duane Bright
Snell & Wilmer L.L.P.
contact info
Christopher Mark Franich
Snell & Wilmer LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 01/08 9:56 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by LooseLeaf International LLC (Bright, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
9 9 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 01/06 5:16 PM
ORDER Setting Settlement Disposition Conference ("SDC") . In light of the Plaintiff's Notice of Settlement8 , the Court sets a telephonic SDC for 3/7/2025 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Counsel must place a joint call to Chambers, 619-446-3704, at the scheduled time. The Court will VACATE the SDC if appropriate dismissal documents are filed before the SDC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 1/6/2025.(no document attached) (smd)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 01/06 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by LooseLeaf International LLC (Bright, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 12/17 6:01 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LooseLeaf International LLC, as to CannVerify LLC. (Bright, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Tue 10/01 3:09 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by LooseLeaf International LLC . Identifying Other Affiliate Abdolhamid Hamid Khatibzadeh, Other Affiliate Max Ramaswami for LooseLeaf International LLC. (Bright, Christopher)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 10/01 12:52 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Looseleaf International LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Bright, Christopher) (sjt)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 10/01 10:22 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axi) (sjt)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Report Regarding Patent & Trademark FORM Tue 10/01 10:12 AM
***Docketed in error*** REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *11,405,194*, *11,736,287*, *12,034,842* cc:USPTO (axi)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
3 3 utility Report Regarding Patent & Trademark FORM Tue 10/01 10:15 AM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *11,405,194*, *11,736,287*, *12,034,842* cc:USPTO (axi) (sjt)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 10/01 10:06 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Cannverify LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19228211.), filed by Looseleaf International LLC. The new case number is 3:24-cv-1746-TWR-DEB. Judge Todd W. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case. (Bright, Christopher)(axi)(sjt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Table of Exhibits,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Exhibit F